This case was last updated from PACER on 11/23/2020 at 10:37:50 (UTC).

Blackmon v. Tupelo-Lee County Jail

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 Blackmon filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Tupelo-Lee County Jail. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sharion Aycock, David A. Sanders and Glen H. Davidson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00196

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

David A. Sanders

Presiding Judges

Sharion Aycock

Glen H. Davidson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gerald Wayne Blackmon

Tupelo, MS 38804

Defendant

Tupelo-Lee County Jail

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) AMENDED / SUPPLEMENT TO DOCUMENT Amendment to #1 Complaint. (cb)

#24

(#24) Letter/Correspondence from Gerald W. Blackmon. (cb) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#23

(#23) SUPPLEMENT TO DOCUMENT #1 Complaint. (cb) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#22

(#22) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #19 ORDER DENYING #18 Motion to Receive Relief from Harrasment. (cb) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#21

(#21) Declaration of Gerald Blackmon. (jla)

#20

(#20) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #15 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel. (jla)

#19

(#19) ORDER denying #18 Motion to Receive Relief from Harrasment. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 10/26/20. (jla)

#18

(#18) MOTION to Receive Relief from Harrasment by Gerald Wayne Blackmon. (jla) (Main Document 18 replaced on 10/19/2020) (jla). (Entered: 10/19/2020)

#15

(#20) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #15 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel. (jla)

#9

(#9) Declination to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Case Reassigned to Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson. District Judge Sharion Aycock no longer assigned to the case. (cb)

#8

(#8) Supplement to Motion re #2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Gerald Wayne Blackmon. (cb)

#7

(#7) AMENDED / SUPPLEMENT TO #1 Complaint. (cb)

#6

(#6) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #5 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to Complete and Return In Forma Pauperis Application, Authorization and Certificate within 21 days re #2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Gerald Wayne Blackmon. (cb)

#5

(#6) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #5 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to Complete and Return In Forma Pauperis Application, Authorization and Certificate within 21 days re #2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Gerald Wayne Blackmon. (cb)

#4

(#10) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT, and NOTICE of Intent to Continue Lawsuit re #4 Order Setting PSP Deadline. (cb)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (cb)

#2

RESTRICTED

#1

(#23) SUPPLEMENT TO DOCUMENT #1 Complaint. (cb) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) AMENDED / SUPPLEMENT TO DOCUMENT Amendment to #1 Complaint. (cb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Letter/Correspondence from Gerald W. Blackmon. (cb) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) SUPPLEMENT TO DOCUMENT #1 Complaint. (cb) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #19 ORDER DENYING #18 Motion to Receive Relief from Harrasment. (cb) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Declaration of Gerald Blackmon. (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #15 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel. (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER denying #18 Motion to Receive Relief from Harrasment. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 10/26/20. (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION to Receive Relief from Harrasment by Gerald Wayne Blackmon. (jla) (Main Document 18 replaced on 10/19/2020) (jla). (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #11 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. (jla) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #12 Order Spears Hearing set. (jla) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT, and NOTICE of Intent to Continue Lawsuit re #4 Order Setting PSP Deadline. (cb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Declination to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Case Reassigned to Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson. District Judge Sharion Aycock no longer assigned to the case. (cb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Supplement to Motion re #2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Gerald Wayne Blackmon. (cb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED / SUPPLEMENT TO #1 Complaint. (cb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #5 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to Complete and Return In Forma Pauperis Application, Authorization and Certificate within 21 days re #2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Gerald Wayne Blackmon. (cb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to Complete and Return In Forma Pauperis Application, Authorization and Certificate within 21 days re #2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Gerald Wayne Blackmon. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 9/24/2020. (cb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER Setting PSP Deadline: PSP Forms due by 10/24/2020. Signed by Clerk on 9/24/2020. (cb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (cb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gerald Wayne Blackmon. (cb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PRISONER COMPLAINT challenging conditions of confinement, Jury Demand,, filed by Gerald Wayne Blackmon. (cb)

    Read MoreRead Less