This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/19/2022 at 08:01:27 (UTC).

Blackmon v. Lenawee County Health Department et al

Case Summary

On 02/18/2022 Blackmon filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Lenawee County Health Department. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephanie Dawkins Davis and Anthony P. Patti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-10364

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephanie Dawkins Davis

Referral Judge

Anthony P. Patti

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kimberly Blackmon

Defendants

Lenawee County Health Department

Martha Hall

Blissfield Community Schools

Scott Riley

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daren A. Wiseley

Attorney at Wiseley Law, PLLC

41 1/2 E. Bacon St.

Hillsdale, MI 49242

Defendant Attorneys

Alexandra Lee Page

Attorney at Rosati Schultz Joppich & Amtsbuechler, P.C.

822 Centennial Way, Suite 270

Lansing, MI 48917

Andrew J. Brege

Attorney at Johnson Rosati Schultz & Joppich, P.C.

822 Centennial Way, Suite 270

Lansing, MI 48917

Thomas David Beindit

Attorney at Rosati, Schultz, Joppich & Amtsbuechler

822 Centennial Way, Ste 270

Lansing, MI 48917

Travis M. Comstock

Attorney at Giarmarco, Mullins & Horton, P.C.

101 W Big Beaver Rd., Suite 1000

Troy, MI 48084

 

Court Documents

15 #6

Exhibit 6 - United States v Elias

15 #5

Exhibit 5 - Norris v Stanley

15 #4

Exhibit 4 - Midwest Inst. of Health, PLLC v Whitmer

15 #3

Exhibit 3 - Lewandowski on behalf of T.L. v Southgate Cmty. Sch. Bd. of Ed.

15 #2

Exhibit 2 - Kheriaty v Regents of Univ. of California

15 #1

Exhibit 1 - Bormuth v Whitmer

15 #15

Main Document

#14

(#14) REPLY to Response re #5 MOTION to Dismiss in Lieu of Answer with Proof of Service filed by Martha Hall, Lenawee County Health Department. (Beindit, Thomas) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

13 #2

Exhibit 7

13 #1

Index of Exhibits

7 #7

Exhibit 6.Aviles v. Blasio

7 #6

Exhibit 5.Oster v. Houghton Lake Community Schools

7 #3

Exhibit 2.Holland v DeWitt Public Schools

7 #2

Exhibit 1.Updated School Protocol 2.23.22

7 #1

Index of Exhibits

7 #7

Main Document

5 #1

Exhibit 1 - Updated Guidance

5 #5

Main Document

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) EXHIBIT Index of Unpublished Authorities re #14 Reply to Response to Motion by Martha Hall, Lenawee County Health Department (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Bormuth v Whitmer, #2 Exhibit 2 - Kheriaty v Regents of Univ. of California, #3 Exhibit 3 - Lewandowski on behalf of T.L. v Southgate Cmty. Sch. Bd. of Ed., #4 Exhibit 4 - Midwest Inst. of Health, PLLC v Whitmer, #5 Exhibit 5 - Norris v Stanley, #6 Exhibit 6 - United States v Elias) (Beindit, Thomas) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) REPLY to Response re #5 MOTION to Dismiss in Lieu of Answer with Proof of Service filed by Martha Hall, Lenawee County Health Department. (Beindit, Thomas) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) REPLY to Response re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Blissfield Community Schools, Scott Riley. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 7, #3 Exhibit 8) (Comstock, Travis) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Strike #11 Response to Motion with Proof of Service by Martha Hall, Lenawee County Health Department. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Correspondence to Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit 2 - Johnson v. Baptist Mem'l Health Care Corp, #3 Exhibit 3 - Dudek v Greektown Casino) (Beindit, Thomas) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE to #5 MOTION to Dismiss in Lieu of Answer with Proof of Service, #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Kimberly Blackmon. (Wiseley, Daren) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER Regarding Removal. Signed by District Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis. (RLou) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) EXHIBIT Index of Unpublished Authority re #8 MOTION to Provide Notice Pursuant to Rule 5.1 with Brief in Support and Proof of Service by Martha Hall, Lenawee County Health Department (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Bowens v Colubus Metro. Libr. Bd. of Trustees, #2 Exhibit 2 - Fangman v City of Cincinnati, #3 Exhibit 3 - Olivares v Ambrose, #4 Exhibit 4 - Williamson v Recovery Ltd.) (Beindit, Thomas) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Provide Notice Pursuant to Rule 5.1 with Brief in Support and Proof of Service by Martha Hall, Lenawee County Health Department. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice to Attorney General, #2 Exhibit 2 - Correspondence to Opposing Counsel) (Beindit, Thomas) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Dismiss by Blissfield Community Schools, Scott Riley. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1.Updated School Protocol 2.23.22, #3 Exhibit 2.Holland v DeWitt Public Schools, #4 Exhibit 3.Lewandowski v Southgate Community Schools, #5 Exhibit 4.P.M. by & Through Maras v. Mayfield City Sch. Dist., #6 Exhibit 5.Oster v. Houghton Lake Community Schools, #7 Exhibit 6.Aviles v. Blasio) (Comstock, Travis) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) EXHIBIT Index of Unpublished Authority re #5 MOTION to Dismiss in Lieu of Answer with Proof of Service by Martha Hall, Lenawee County Health Department (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Bormuth v Whitmer, #2 Exhibit 2 - City of Streetsboro v Fraternal Ord. of Police, #3 Exhibit 3 - Jones v Micigan Dep't of Corr., #4 Exhibit 4 - Jones-Bey v Michigan Dep't of Corr., #5 Exhibit 5 - Norris v Stanley, #6 Exhibit 6 - Ready for the World Inc. v Riley) (Beindit, Thomas) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Dismiss in Lieu of Answer with Proof of Service by Martha Hall, Lenawee County Health Department. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Updated Guidance) (Beindit, Thomas) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra Lee Page on behalf of Martha Hall, Lenawee County Health Department. (Page, Alexandra) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Brege on behalf of Martha Hall, Lenawee County Health Department. (Brege, Andrew) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas David Beindit on behalf of Martha Hall, Lenawee County Health Department. (Beindit, Thomas) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Blissfield Community Schools, Scott Riley from Lenawee County Circuit Court, case number 22-6845-CZ. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8800872 - Fee: $ 402 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1.Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2.Emergency Motion for TRO, #4 Exhibit 3.Order Denying TRO, #5 Exhibit 4.Civil Cover Sheet) (Comstock, Travis) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Travis M. Comstock

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas David Beindit

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew James Brege