This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/22/2019 at 07:28:42 (UTC).

Blackmon et al v. Triangle Plaza, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/24/2019 Blackmon filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Triangle Plaza, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Louise Wood Flanagan and Malcolm J. Howard. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:19-CV-00136

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Louise Wood Flanagan

Malcolm J. Howard

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Carolyn Morgan Blackmon, a trustee of The Carolyn Blackmon Revocable Trust dated December 22, 1977 and as amended and restated from time to time thereafter

Triangle Realty of Jacksonville, LLC

First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company, as Trustee of The Gail Morgan Butler Revocable Trust dated December 22, 1977 and as amended and restated from time to time thereafter

Carolyn Morgan Blackmon

Gail Morgan Butler

Defendants

Nautilus Insurance Company

Heather Thornburg

William Willis

Triangle Plaza, Inc.

Lancaster McAden, Willis Smith Company and The Insurance Center

Maurice Capps Investment Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kelly Margolis Dagger

Attorney at Ellis & Winters, LLP

P.O. Box 33550

Raleigh, NC 27636

Leslie C. Packer

Attorney at Ellis & Winters LLP

4131 Parklake Avenue, Suite 400

Raleigh, NC 27612

Thomas Hamilton Segars

Attorney at Ellis & Winters

P.O. Box 33550

Raleigh, NC 27636

Kerry Marie Boehm

Attorney at Ellis & Winters, LLP

P.O. Box 33550

Raleigh, NC 27636

Benjamin N. Thompson

Attorney at Wyrick Robbins Yates & Ponton, LLP

4101 Lake Boone Trail, Suite 300, Post Office Drawer 17803

Raleigh, NC 27607

Jenna Carroll Borders

Attorney at Wyrick Robbins Yates & Ponton, LLP

4101 Lake Boone Trail, Suite 300, Post Office Drawer 17803

Raleigh, NC 27607

Defendant Attorneys

Anna Pulliam Cathcart

Attorney at Phelps Dunbar, LLP

4140 Parklake Avenue, Suite 100

Raleigh, NC 27612-3723

Kevin Michael O'Brien

Attorney at Phelps Dunbar, LLP

4140 Parklake Avenue, Suite 100

Raleigh, NC 27612-3723

Amy Holbrook Wooten

Attorney at Brown Law LLP

555 Fayetteville Street, Suite 420

Raleigh, NC 27601

Gary H. Clemmons

Attorney at Chesnutt, Clemmons, Thomas & Peacock, P.A.

P. O. Box 12530

New Bern, NC 28561

 

Court Documents

#31

#30

29 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#29

#9

#8

7 #1

Exhibit A- Third Party Complaint of Defendant Maurice Capps Investment Company

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #6

Supplement Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet

1 #4

Exhibit Cont. Ex C- Answer and Counterclaim of Maurice Capps

1 #3

Exhibit C- Complaint for Declaratory Judgment

#1

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Carolyn Morgan Blackmon, Carolyn Morgan Blackmon, a trustee of The Carolyn Blackmon Revocable Trust dated December 22, 1977 and as amended and restated from time to time thereafter, Gail Morgan Butler, Triangle Realty of Jacksonville, LLC (Segars, Thomas) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) ORDER granting #29 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Nautilus Insurance Company answer due 9/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank on 8/13/2019. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank regarding #29 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Nautilus Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (O'Brien, Kevin) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) Notice of Appearance filed by Kerry Marie Boehm on behalf of Carolyn Morgan Blackmon, Carolyn Morgan Blackmon, a trustee of The Carolyn Blackmon Revocable Trust dated December 22, 1977 and as amended and restated from time to time thereafter, Gail Morgan Butler, Triangle Realty of Jacksonville, LLC. (Boehm, Kerry) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER granting the unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #27 filed by Defendants William Willis, Heather Thornburg, and Lancaster McAden, Willis Smith Company and The Insurance Center. For good cause shown, it is ordered that these Defendants have up to and including September 11, 2019, within which to answer or other respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/5/2019. (Hockaday, A.) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #27 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . (Edwards, S.) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Lancaster McAden, Willis Smith Company and The Insurance Center, Heather Thornburg, William Willis. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time) (Wooten, Amy) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) Financial Disclosure Statement by William Willis (Wooten, Amy) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) Financial Disclosure Statement by Heather Thornburg (Wooten, Amy) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Financial Disclosure Statement by Lancaster McAden, Willis Smith Company and The Insurance Center (Wooten, Amy) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Notice of Appearance filed by Amy Holbrook Wooten on behalf of Lancaster McAden, Willis Smith Company and The Insurance Center, Heather Thornburg, William Willis. (Wooten, Amy) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) REASSIGNMENT ORDER - At the direction of the Court, and for the continued efficient administration of justice, the above-captioned case is reassigned to the Honorable Malcolm J. Howard, Senior United States District Judge, for all further proceedings. United States District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan is no longer assigned to the case. All future documents shall reflect the revised case number of 7:19-CV-136-H. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/29/2019. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Memorandum in Support regarding #6 MOTION Nautilus's Motion to Realign the Parties by Nautilus Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Third Party Complaint of Defendant Maurice Capps Investment Company) (O'Brien, Kevin) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION Nautilus's Motion to Realign the Parties filed by Nautilus Insurance Company. (O'Brien, Kevin) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Counsel Gary H. Clemmons of Chesnutt & Clemmons at 225-C Broad Street, New Bern, NC 28560; Amy H. Wooten, Daniel Strong, Kristi Lyn Gavalier of Brown Law LLP at 555 Fayetteville Street, Suite 420, Raleigh, NC 27601; Thomas H. Segars, Leslie C. Parker, Kerry M. Boehm of Ellis & Winters, LLP at 4131 Parklake Ave., Suite 400, Raleigh, NC 27612 and Benjamin N. Thompson, Jenna C. Borders of Wyrick, Robbins, Yates & Ponton, LLP at 4101 Lake Boone Trail, Suite 300, Raleigh, NC 27607 mailed via US Mail on July 25, 2019. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice of Appearance filed by Anna Pulliam Cathcart on behalf of Nautilus Insurance Company. (Cathcart, Anna) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Appearance filed by Kevin Michael O'Brien on behalf of Nautilus Insurance Company. (O'Brien, Kevin) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Financial Disclosure Statement by Nautilus Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Admiral Insurance Company, Corporate Parent J/I Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent W.R. Berkley Corporation for Nautilus Insurance Company. (O'Brien, Kevin) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nautilus Insurance Company from Onslow County Superior Court, case number 19 CVS 2480. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5033323), filed by Nautilus Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Complaint 19 CVS 2480, #2 Exhibit B- Amended Complaint for Declaratory Judgment, #3 Exhibit C- Complaint for Declaratory Judgment, #4 Exhibit Cont. Ex C- Answer and Counterclaim of Maurice Capps, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet, #6 Supplement Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet) (O'Brien, Kevin) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where First Citizens Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where The Promotion Company, Inc. d/b/a WHR Motorsports is a litigant

Latest cases where NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant