This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 15:30:37 (UTC).

Blackley v. Spartanburg County et al

Case Summary

On 07/03/2019 Blackley filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Spartanburg County. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judge overseeing this case is Henry M Herlong, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:19-CV-01904

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Henry M Herlong, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hope Blackley

Defendants

Katherine O'Neil

David Britt

Asbestos Abatement Associates Inc

Bob Walker

Jeff Horton

Terry O Booker

John n McNamara

Mike Emory

Spartanburg County

JMAC Environmental LLC

Asbestos Abatement Associates Inc doing business as AAA Environmental

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph A Mooneyham

Attorney at Mooneyham Berry LLC

Po Box 8359, 1225 S Church Street

Greenville, SC 29604

Joseph Daniel Dickey, Jr

Attorney at Dickey Law Group

1817 Hampton Street

Columbia, SC 29201

Defendant Attorneys

Charles F Turner, Jr

Attorney at Willson Jones Carter and Baxley PA

872 S Pleasantburg Drive

Greenville, SC 29607

Anne R Culbreath

Attorney at Willson Jones Carter and Baxley PA

872 S Pleasantburg Drive

Greenville, SC 29607

Catherine Ava Kopiec

Attorney at Rogers Townsend and Thomas PC

Po Box 100200

Columbia, SC 29202

Robert Bryan Barnes

Attorney at Rogers Townsend and Thomas

Po Box 100200

Columbia, SC 29202-3200

 

Court Documents

#26

#25

#24

21 #1

Discovery plan

#21

#18

#13

12 #1

Exhibit Email with Consent to Extension

#12

#9

#8

#7

#6

#4

#3

1 #3

Certificate of Service

1 #2

letter

1 #1

State Court Documents

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 2/5/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 3/6/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 4/7/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 4/7/2020, Discovery due by 5/7/2020, Motion in Limine due by 7/21/2020, Motions due by 5/21/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 7/3/2020, Pretrial Briefs due by 7/28/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 8/4/2020. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 8/21/19. (sfla) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MEDIATION ORDER; Mediation Due by 5/14/2020. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 8/21/19. (sfla) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) ANSWER to Complaint by Asbestos Abatement Associates Inc.(Kopiec, Catherine) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Terry O Booker, David Britt, Mike Emory, Jeff Horton, Katherine O'Neil, Spartanburg County, Bob Walker.(Turner, Charles) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/21/2019: #1 Discovery plan) Modified on 8/21/2019 (to add joint report required by court and provided by filing user. (sfla). (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) TEXT ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to File Rule 26(f) Report no later than 8/21/2019. Entered by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on August 19, 2019. (bedw) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MOTION for Leave to File 26(f) Report by Hope Blackley. Response to Motion due by 8/30/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Dickey, Joseph) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) TEXT ORDER granting consent #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Asbestos Abatement Associates Inc answer due 8/29/2019. Entered by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on July 29, 2019. (bedw) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Asbestos Abatement Associates Inc.(Kopiec, Catherine) (Main Document 13 replaced on 7/30/2019 to correct Attorney Bar numbers) (sfla). (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Asbestos Abatement Associates Inc. Response to Motion due by 8/12/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email with Consent to Extension)No proposed order.(Kopiec, Catherine) (Main Document 12 replaced on 7/30/2019 to correct Attorney Bar numbers) (sfla). (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 7/29/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 8/12/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 8/12/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/18/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/17/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/18/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/18/2020, Discovery due by 3/19/2020, Motion in Limine due by 6/2/2020, Motions due by 4/2/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 5/15/2020, Pretrial Briefs due by 6/9/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 6/16/2020. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 7/8/19. (sfla) Modified on 7/9/2019 to correct year of Motions due date (sfla). (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff's Complaint by Terry O Booker, David Britt, Mike Emory, Jeff Horton, Katherine O'Neil, Spartanburg County, Bob Walker. (Turner, Charles) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Spartanburg County. (Turner, Charles) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Plaintiff's Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Hope Blackley.(Dickey, Joseph) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Terry O Booker, David Britt, Mike Emory, Jeff Horton, Katherine O'Neil, Spartanburg County, Bob Walker. (sfla) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Terry O Booker, David Britt, Mike Emory, Jeff Horton, Katherine O'Neil, Spartanburg County, Bob Walker.(sfla) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Spartanburg County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-42-2080. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8539630) filed by Terry O Booker, Bob Walker, Spartanburg County, David Britt, Mike Emory, Jeff Horton, Katherine O'Neil. (Attachments: #1 letter, #2 Certificate of Service)(sfla) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/3/2019: #1 State Court Documents, #2 letter, #3 Certificate of Service) (sfla, ). (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPARTANBURG COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph A Mooneyham

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph Daniel Dickey, Jr.