Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/11/2021 at 08:39:17 (UTC).

Blacker v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 06/10/2021 Blacker filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jacquelyn D Austin and Donald C Coggins, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-01720

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jacquelyn D Austin

Presiding Judge

Donald C Coggins, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Edgar E Blacker

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Interested Parties

US Attorney - Social Security Noticing

Social Security Administrative Record

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Timothy Allen Clardy

Attorney at McCravy Newton and Sturkie Law Firm

1629 Bypass 72 Ne

Greenwood, SC 29649

 

Court Documents

#3

RESTRICTED

#1

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2021
  • Docket(#6) TEXT ORDER: Directing the parties' attention to the Court's Standing Order on All 42 U.S.C. 405(g) Social Security Disability Appeals Assigned to Judge Donald C. Coggins, Jr., located on the District Court's website. Within 30 days of the date of this Text Order, Plaintiff's counsel is directed to file either a (1) signed and completed Notice, Consent, and Reference of Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form, or (2) status report informing the Court that Plaintiff does not consent to disposition of this action by Magistrate Judge. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 6/10/21. ( Status Report due by 7/10/2021.) (gpre, ) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • Docket(#5) Notice: Social Security Case Service. Pursuant to Standing Order 3:21-mc-00212-RBH signed by Chief Judge R. Bryan Harwell, the Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system, notifying the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration Office of the General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the case. No summonses shall issue. Set Answer Deadline - Social Security Complaint: Answer due from Commissioner of Social Security Administration on 12/7/2021 (gpre, ) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Edgar E Blacker. Response to Motion due by 6/24/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order. Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(gpre, ) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration Clerk's Note: See 28:636(b)(1)(C)(4)(c)(1) and Local Rule 83.VII.02 regarding Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge in Social Security cases. Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge forms are available on the Court's website., filed by Edgar E Blacker.(gpre, ) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Social Security Noticing is a litigant

Latest cases where Social Security Administrative Record is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy Allen Clardy