This case was last updated from PACER on 12/12/2019 at 05:52:38 (UTC).

Blackburn et al v. American Zurich Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 12/11/2019 Blackburn filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against American Zurich Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-04814

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Robert D. Burns

Robert Blackburn

Defendant

American Zurich Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

George Howard Arnold

Attorney at Thompson Coe et al

One Riverway, Suite 1400

Houston, TX 77056

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Return of Service on Defendant American Zurich Insurance Company by Robert Blackburn, Robert D. Burns, filed.(Klein, Hunter) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 3/5/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Charles Eskridge, filed. (jengonzalez, 4) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

6 #1

Proposed Order

#6

(#6) Joint MOTION for Continuance of February 6, 2020 Initial Pretrial Conference by American Zurich Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Arnold, George) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

5 #1

Proposed Scheduling and Docket Control Order

#5

(#5) JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by American Zurich Insurance Company, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling and Docket Control Order)(Arnold, George) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Robert Blackburn, Robert D. Burns, filed.(Klein, Hunter) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by American Zurich Insurance Company, filed.(Arnold, George) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#2

(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/6/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8A before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalezadi, 4) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 270th Judicial District Court of Harris County, Texas, case number 2019-81456 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23745619) filed by American Zurich Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Arnold, George) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Return of Service on Defendant American Zurich Insurance Company by Robert Blackburn, Robert D. Burns, filed.(Klein, Hunter) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 3/5/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Charles Eskridge, filed. (jengonzalez, 4) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Joint MOTION for Continuance of February 6, 2020 Initial Pretrial Conference by American Zurich Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Arnold, George) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by American Zurich Insurance Company, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling and Docket Control Order)(Arnold, George) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Robert Blackburn, Robert D. Burns, filed.(Klein, Hunter) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by American Zurich Insurance Company, filed.(Arnold, George) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/6/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8A before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalezadi, 4) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 270th Judicial District Court of Harris County, Texas, case number 2019-81456 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23745619) filed by American Zurich Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Arnold, George) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.