This case was last updated from PACER on 01/13/2020 at 08:20:47 (UTC).

Blackburn

Case Summary

On 11/14/2019 Blackburn was filed as a Personal Injury - Marine lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian Morris. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00057

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Marine

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Montana District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian Morris

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Garrett Blackburn

Claimants

Carol Bristle

Caleb Garrett

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ross Daniel Tillman

Attorney at BOONE KARLBERG, P.C.

201 West Main Street, Suite 300, Po Box 9199

Missoula, MT 59807-9199

Christopher Lee Decker

Attorney at BOONE KARLBERG, P.C.

201 West Main Street, Suite 300, Po Box 9199

Missoula, MT 59807-9199

Claimant Attorneys

Anthony F. Jackson

Attorney at BECK, AMSDEN & STALPES, PLLC

1946 Stadium Drive, Suite 1

Bozeman, MT 59715

Thomas A. Marra

Attorney at MARRA EVENSON & BELL P.C.

Po Box 1525

Great Falls, MT 59403-1525

David E. Russo

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH

333 Bush Street, Suite 1100

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

22 #2

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Ord

22 #1

Declaration Of Rhodes

#22

(#22) MOTION Randall L. Rhodes to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2425943.) Anthony F. Jackson appearing for Claimant Carol Bristle (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Rhodes, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Ord) (Jackson, Anthony) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#20

(#20) ORDER. Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 2/13/2020. Joint Discovery Plan due by 2/13/2020. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 2/13/2020. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 2/20/2020 at 2:30 PM. The Court will contact the parties with the call-in number. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 12/31/2019. (NOS) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony F. Jackson on behalf of Carol Bristle (Jackson, Anthony) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#18

(#18) CLAIM by Carol Bristle. (Jackson, Anthony) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#17

(#17) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Carol Bristle. (Jackson, Anthony) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Caleb Garrett (Marra, Thomas) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#15

(#15) Letter from Clerk of Court, Tyler P. Gilman regarding the requirements of CM/ECF Registration. Copy mailed to PHV counsel with order. (HEG) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER Directing Issuance of Monition and Special Restraining Order as to #1 Complaint filed by Garrett Blackburn. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/14/2019. (NOS) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

2 #2

Text of Proposed Order

2 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#2

(#2) Submission of Proposed Order re: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Tillman, Ross) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

1 #4

Security Check

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Ad Interim Stipulation of Value of the Vessel

1 #1

Exhibit A-Declaration

#1

(#17) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Carol Bristle. (Jackson, Anthony) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) MOTION Randall L. Rhodes to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2425943.) Anthony F. Jackson appearing for Claimant Carol Bristle (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Rhodes, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Ord) (Jackson, Anthony) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • (#21) Remark: Attorney David Russo is now a registered user. (MMS) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER. Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 2/13/2020. Joint Discovery Plan due by 2/13/2020. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 2/13/2020. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 2/20/2020 at 2:30 PM. The Court will contact the parties with the call-in number. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 12/31/2019. (NOS) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony F. Jackson on behalf of Carol Bristle (Jackson, Anthony) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) CLAIM by Carol Bristle. (Jackson, Anthony) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Carol Bristle. (Jackson, Anthony) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Caleb Garrett (Marra, Thomas) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Letter from Clerk of Court, Tyler P. Gilman regarding the requirements of CM/ECF Registration. Copy mailed to PHV counsel with order. (HEG) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David E. Russo for Caleb Garrett. Admission is not granted until Mr. Russo, within fifteen (15) days from the date of this Order has filed an acknowledgment and acceptance of his admission under the terms set forth above. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 12/13/2019. (HEG) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION David E. Russo to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2414414.) Thomas A. Marra appearing for Claimant Caleb Garrett (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Russo, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order re Admission of Russo) (Marra, Thomas) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Garrett Blackburn (Tillman, Ross) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • Registry Funds Received in Missoula Clerk of Court's Office from Boone Karlberg. Check #100908 in the amount of $10,388.00; receipt # MTX9-14428. (NOS) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Deposit Funds. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/15/2019. (NOS) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Deposit Funds Ross Daniel Tillman appearing for Plaintiff Garrett Blackburn (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Registry Deposit Form) (Tillman, Ross) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MONITION issued. (NOS) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Action Brought for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/14/2019. (NOS) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER Directing Issuance of Monition and Special Restraining Order as to #1 Complaint filed by Garrett Blackburn. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/14/2019. (NOS) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Submission of Proposed Order re: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Tillman, Ross) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • Filing fee paid: $ 400.00, receipt number 0977-2398792 (APP) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Garrett Blackburn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declaration, #2 Ad Interim Stipulation of Value of the Vessel, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (APP) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/14/2019: #4 Security Check) (APP). (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less