This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/11/2021 at 08:40:50 (UTC).

BLACKBIRD TECH LLC v. SIGNIFY NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 BLACKBIRD TECH LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against SIGNIFY NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Claire C. Cecchi and Michael A. Hammer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-18463

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Claire C. Cecchi

Referral Judge

Michael A. Hammer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BLACKBIRD TECH LLC doing business as BLACKBIRD TECHNOLOGIES

Defendant

SIGNIFY NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STAMATIOS STAMOULIS

Attorney at STAMOULIS & WEINBLATT LLC

800 N West Streetthird Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Defendant Attorney

THOMAS A. MARTIN

Attorney at BOND SCHOENECK & KING, PLLC

125 Half Mile Roadste 200

Red Bank, NJ 07701

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jeremy P. Oczek to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-13010797.) (MARTIN, THOMAS) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

#19

(#19) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by SIGNIFY NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION. (MARTIN, THOMAS) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

#18

(#18) ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jeremy P. Oczek. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 11/24/2021. (ams, ) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

17 #3

Text of Proposed Order

17 #2

Certification of Jeremy P. Oczek

17 #1

Certification of Thomas A. Martin

17 #17

Main Document

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS A. MARTIN on behalf of SIGNIFY NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION (MARTIN, THOMAS) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#15

(#15) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jeffrey D. Ahdoot to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12977145.) (STAMOULIS, STAMATIOS) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

#6

5 #1

Complaint and Exhibits

5 #5

Main Document

#4

#3

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketPro Hac Vice counsel, JEREMY P. OCZEK, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ams, ) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jeremy P. Oczek to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-13010797.) (MARTIN, THOMAS) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by SIGNIFY NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION. (MARTIN, THOMAS) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jeremy P. Oczek. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 11/24/2021. (ams, ) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jeremy P. Oczek. Motion set for 12/20/2021 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ams, ) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jeremy P. Oczek by SIGNIFY NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Thomas A. Martin, #2 Certification of Jeremy P. Oczek, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(MARTIN, THOMAS) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS A. MARTIN on behalf of SIGNIFY NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION (MARTIN, THOMAS) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketPro Hac Vice counsel, WENDY VERLANDER and JEFFREY D. AHDOOT, have been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ams, ) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jeffrey D. Ahdoot to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12977145.) (STAMOULIS, STAMATIOS) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Wendy Verlander to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12977143.) (STAMOULIS, STAMATIOS) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #8 Stipulation filed by BLACKBIRD TECH LLC on 11/9/2021 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion. For future filings of this nature, please select the event "Stipulation" found under Other Documents. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (ams, ) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, "Stipulation and Order for Extension of Time" by BLACKBIRD TECH LLC. (STAMOULIS, STAMATIOS) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by BLACKBIRD TECH LLC. SIGNIFY NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION served on 10/22/2021, answer due 11/12/2021. (STAMOULIS, STAMATIOS) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS ISSUED as to SIGNIFY NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, ) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Exhibits) (ams, ) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (ak, ) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE by BLACKBIRD TECH LLC d/b/a BLACKBIRD TECHNOLOGIES Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (STAMOULIS, STAMATIOS) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BLACKBIRD TECH LLC d/b/a BLACKBIRD TECHNOLOGIES. (STAMOULIS, STAMATIOS) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Summons to be Issued by BLACKBIRD TECH LLC d/b/a BLACKBIRD TECHNOLOGIES as to SIGNIFY NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION. (STAMOULIS, STAMATIOS) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against SIGNIFY NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12887107) with JURY DEMAND, filed by BLACKBIRD TECH LLC d/b/a BLACKBIRD TECHNOLOGIES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(STAMOULIS, STAMATIOS) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SIGNIFY NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Blackbird Tech LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas A. Martin