This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 18:15:17 (UTC).

Blackbird Tech, LLC v. DAMAR Worldwide 4 LLC

Case Summary

On 09/19/2019 Blackbird Tech, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against DAMAR Worldwide 4 LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephen R. Bough. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-05066

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen R. Bough

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Blackbird Tech, LLC doing business as Blackbird Technologies

Defendant

Damar Worldwide 4 LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stamatios Stamoulis

Wendy H. Verlander

Jeffrey D. Ahdoot

Scott R. Brown

Richard Charles Weinblatt

Defendant Attorneys

Frank A Bruno

Michael O. Kassak

Joseph J. Roper

Megan E McCullough

 

Court Documents

#60

#59

#58

#56

#54

#51

#50

#48

#47

#46

45 #1

MAP General Order

#45

44 #1

*Restricted*

#44

43 #1

Transfer Order

#43

66 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Megan E McCullough on behalf of Defendant Damar Worldwide 4 LLC.(McCullough, Megan) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) NOTICE of appearance by Megan E McCullough on behalf of Damar Worldwide 4 LLC (Attorney Megan E McCullough added to party Damar Worldwide 4 LLC(pty:dft))(McCullough, Megan) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketNOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 12/3/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 12/17/2019 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, Springfield (VJC) before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Signed on 10/28/19 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Diefenbach, Tracy) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) ORDER granting #56 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Michael O. Kassak for Damar Worldwide 4 LLC allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) Motion to allow Michael O. Kassak to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6549910) filed by Joseph J. Roper on behalf of Damar Worldwide 4 LLC. (Roper, Joseph) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • Docket(#55) Before the Court is Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel. (Doc. #54). For good cause stated the motion is granted. Attorney Marc Casarino is removed as counsel of record for Defendant Damar Worldwide 4, LLC. Signed on 10/18/19 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Diefenbach, Tracy) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) MOTION to withdraw as attorney (Marc Casarino) filed by Joseph J. Roper on behalf of Damar Worldwide 4 LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/1/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Roper, Joseph) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) ORDER denying #51 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. The court has denied your pro hac vice motion because, counsel wishing to seek admission must affirm good standing membership in any and all District Courts in which they are a member. If you still wish to proceed pro hac vice in this case, please refile your motion providing all information required under Rule 83.5(h). To avoid being charged a duplicate fee, please insert the receipt number issued for this motion in the receipt box on your new filing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) ORDER granting #50 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Wendy H. Verlander for Blackbird Tech, LLC allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Adam J. Eckstein - filed by DAMAR Worldwide 4 LLC. (Bennett, Blake) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.] (Entered: 11/02/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Richard M. Carter for DAMAR Worldwide 4 LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lmm) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.] (Entered: 11/02/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Richard M. Carter, filed by DAMAR Worldwide 4 LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/1/2016. (nms) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.] (Entered: 11/01/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Richard M. Carter - filed by DAMAR Worldwide 4 LLC. (Bennett, Blake) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.] (Entered: 11/01/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00965-RGA through 1:16-cv-00973-RGA (rjb) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.] (Entered: 10/26/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to DAMAR Worldwide 4 LLC on 10/20/2016. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (cna) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.] (Entered: 10/20/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Blackbird Tech, LLC. (cna) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.] (Entered: 10/20/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 7,086,747 B2. (cna) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.] (Entered: 10/20/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (cna) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.] (Entered: 10/20/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against DAMAR Worldwide 4 LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2016252.) - filed by Blackbird Tech, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(cna) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.] (Entered: 10/20/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less