This case was last updated from PACER on 10/18/2020 at 09:06:04 (UTC).

Blackacre Land Trust, LLC v. Chubb Group of Insurance Companies

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 Blackacre Land Trust, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Chubb Group of Insurance Companies. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Marcia G. Cooke and Jonathan Goodman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-23455

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marcia G. Cooke

Referral Judge

Jonathan Goodman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Blackacre Land Trust, LLC

Defendant

Chubb Group Of Insurance Companies doing business as Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert Ryan Goette

Attorney at Robert Goette, P.A.

11 Island Avenue, #1707

Miami Beach, FL 33139

Defendant Attorneys

John David Dickenson

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

One North Clematis Street, Suite 510

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Chad A. Pasternack

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

One North Clematis Street, Suite 510

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

 

Court Documents

16 #2

Text of Proposed Order

16 #1

Appendix A

#16

(#16) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Chubb Group Of Insurance Companies (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Dickenson, John) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

#15

(#15) Election to Jurisdiction for Final Disposition of Motions . Filed by Chubb Group Of Insurance Companies (Dickenson, John) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

#14

(#14) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chubb Group Of Insurance Companies identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, Corporate Parent Chubb Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Chubb US Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Chubb Limited, Other Affiliate ANTONIO BRYANT, Other Affiliate Black Acre LLC, Other Affiliate Nicon Contracting & Engineering, Inc., Other Affiliate Best Florida Roofers LLC, Other Affiliate Robert Goette, P.A., Other Affiliate Robert Goette, Other Affiliate Best Choice Public Adjusters Group, LLC for Chubb Group Of Insurance Companies (Dickenson, John) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

13 #3

Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit C

13 #2

Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit B

13 #1

Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit A

#13

(#13) RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Substitute Party (Proper Defendant) filed by Blackacre Land Trust, LLC. Replies due by 9/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit C)(Goette, Robert) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

12 #1

Exhibit A

#12

(#12) MOTION to Substitute Party (Proper Defendant) by Chubb Group Of Insurance Companies. Responses due by 9/18/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dickenson, John) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#11

(#11) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by Chubb Group Of Insurance Companies. (Dickenson, John) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by Chubb Group Of Insurance Companies re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Chubb Group Of Insurance Companies (Dickenson, John) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

7 #1

Exhibit A

#7

(#7) MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Chubb Group Of Insurance Companies. Responses due by 9/9/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dickenson, John) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number FLSDC-13376948, filed by Chubb Group of Insurance Companies d/b/a Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Dickenson, John) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Chubb Group Of Insurance Companies (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Dickenson, John) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Election to Jurisdiction for Final Disposition of Motions . Filed by Chubb Group Of Insurance Companies (Dickenson, John) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chubb Group Of Insurance Companies identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, Corporate Parent Chubb Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Chubb US Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Chubb Limited, Other Affiliate ANTONIO BRYANT, Other Affiliate Black Acre LLC, Other Affiliate Nicon Contracting & Engineering, Inc., Other Affiliate Best Florida Roofers LLC, Other Affiliate Robert Goette, P.A., Other Affiliate Robert Goette, Other Affiliate Best Choice Public Adjusters Group, LLC for Chubb Group Of Insurance Companies (Dickenson, John) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Substitute Party (Proper Defendant) filed by Blackacre Land Trust, LLC. Replies due by 9/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit C)(Goette, Robert) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Substitute Party (Proper Defendant) by Chubb Group Of Insurance Companies. Responses due by 9/18/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dickenson, John) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by Chubb Group Of Insurance Companies. (Dickenson, John) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by Chubb Group Of Insurance Companies re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Chubb Group Of Insurance Companies (Dickenson, John) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Blackacre Land Trust, LLC (Goette, Robert) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Clerks Notice to Filer re #6 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (pes) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Chubb Group Of Insurance Companies. Responses due by 9/9/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dickenson, John) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Blackacre Land Trust, LLC (Goette, Robert) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Ryan Goette on behalf of Blackacre Land Trust, LLC (Goette, Robert) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • Docket(#4) ENDORSED ORDER Regarding Phone Calls to Chambers. The following rules apply in this and all other civil matters pending before Judge Marcia G. Cooke: 1. Do not call Chambers to ask about the status of pending motions, including motions for extension of time. The Court is aware of all pending motions and will address each of them in due course. 2. Do not call Chambers if the information you seek, or seek to provide, can be conveyed through a filing on the docket. 3. Do not call Chambers if the information you seek is available from other sources, including Court Orders and the Local Rules. 4. If you call Chambers for a permissible purpose, counsel for all affected parties must be on the line. Calls from non-attorneys and ex parte calls will not be accepted. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 8/19/2020. (kou) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 8/19/2020. See attached document for full details. (kou) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • Docket(#2) Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke (yha) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number FLSDC-13376948, filed by Chubb Group of Insurance Companies d/b/a Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Dickenson, John) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less