This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2019 at 11:58:56 (UTC).

Black v. Simmons et al

Case Summary

On 03/28/2019 Black filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Simmons. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kimberly E. West. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-00101

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kimberly E. West

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kenneth Ray Black

Defendants

Jarad Forbes

Dillon Swaim

Bryan Wilkins

Dylan Simmons

James Hamlin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeremy Beaver

Attorney at Gotcher and Beaver

Po Box 160

Mcalester, OK 74502

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ALIAS SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Dylan Simmons (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

9 #1

Consent/Reassignment Form

#9

(#9) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference for 7/25/2019 at 10:45 AM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. The Court will initiate the conference call. Joint Status Report due by 7/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Reassignment Form)(adw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Jarad Forbes (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Bryan Wilkins (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Dillon Swaim (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to James Hamlin (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Dylan Simmons (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

#3

(#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 4/4/2019)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Jarad Forbes, James Hamlin, Dylan Simmons, Dillon Swaim, Bryan Wilkins by Kenneth Ray Black (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Kenneth Ray Black (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Main Document 1 replaced on 4/1/2019 to reflect correct case number) (jcb, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 03/28/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ALIAS SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Dylan Simmons (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • (#10) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West resetting hearing(s): Telephonic Scheduling Conference reset for 8/2/2019 10:45 AM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. The Court will initiate the conference call. (adw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference for 7/25/2019 at 10:45 AM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. The Court will initiate the conference call. Joint Status Report due by 7/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Reassignment Form)(adw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Jarad Forbes (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Bryan Wilkins (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Dillon Swaim (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to James Hamlin (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Dylan Simmons (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FILING FEES Paid in Full on 3/28/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number 1086-1254714 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Kenneth Ray Black (Beaver, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 4/4/2019)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Jarad Forbes, James Hamlin, Dylan Simmons, Dillon Swaim, Bryan Wilkins by Kenneth Ray Black (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Kenneth Ray Black (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Main Document 1 replaced on 4/1/2019 to reflect correct case number) (jcb, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.