This case was last updated from PACER on 10/18/2020 at 09:50:21 (UTC).

Black v. Jones et al

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 Black filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Jones. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are D. P. Marshall Jr. and J. Thomas Ray. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00999

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

D. P. Marshall Jr.

Referral Judge

J. Thomas Ray

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John Lee Black, Sr

Russellville, AR 72801

Defendants

Blake Wilson

Shane Jones

Rowdy Sweet

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER adopting #4 partial recommendation; allowing Black to proceed with his inadequate medical care and inhumane conditions of confinement claims against Sheriff Jones, Captain Sweet, and Chief Wilson; and dismissing all of Black's other claims without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/7/2020. (jbh) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

#4

(#4) PARTIAL RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending that Black be allowed to proceed with his inadequate medical care and inhumane conditions of confinement claims against Shane Jones, Rowdy Sweet and Blake Wilson, and that his #2 Complaint be served on them; Black's claims that he was fired from his trustee job and that his name was slandered be dismissed, without prejudice; and that Black's requests for release from incarceration and dismissal of his criminal charges be dismissed, without prejudice. Objections due within 14 days of the date of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 9/18/2020. (kdr) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#3

(#3) INITIAL PRO SE ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; directing plaintiff's custodian to collect an initial partial filing fee of $7.20 from plaintiff's institutional account and to send it to the Clerk; thereafter, plaintiff's custodian must collect monthly payments equal to 20% of the preceding month's income credited to his institutional account; provided that, at the time those payments are collected, the account has a balance which exceeds $10.00; the Clerk is directed to send a copy of this Order to the Administrator of the Pope County Detention Center. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 9/8/20. (tjb) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by John Lee Black, Sr.(kdr) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#1

(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John Lee Black, Sr. (kdr) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER adopting #4 partial recommendation; allowing Black to proceed with his inadequate medical care and inhumane conditions of confinement claims against Sheriff Jones, Captain Sweet, and Chief Wilson; and dismissing all of Black's other claims without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/7/2020. (jbh) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PARTIAL RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending that Black be allowed to proceed with his inadequate medical care and inhumane conditions of confinement claims against Shane Jones, Rowdy Sweet and Blake Wilson, and that his #2 Complaint be served on them; Black's claims that he was fired from his trustee job and that his name was slandered be dismissed, without prejudice; and that Black's requests for release from incarceration and dismissal of his criminal charges be dismissed, without prejudice. Objections due within 14 days of the date of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 9/18/2020. (kdr) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) INITIAL PRO SE ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; directing plaintiff's custodian to collect an initial partial filing fee of $7.20 from plaintiff's institutional account and to send it to the Clerk; thereafter, plaintiff's custodian must collect monthly payments equal to 20% of the preceding month's income credited to his institutional account; provided that, at the time those payments are collected, the account has a balance which exceeds $10.00; the Clerk is directed to send a copy of this Order to the Administrator of the Pope County Detention Center. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 9/8/20. (tjb) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by John Lee Black, Sr.(kdr) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John Lee Black, Sr. (kdr) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less