This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/25/2023 at 07:32:33 (UTC).

Black v. Ganieva et al

Case Summary

On October 28, 2021, Leon D. Black (“Plaintiff”), represented by John B. Quinn, Michael B. Carlinsky, Jennifer J. Barrett, and Ryan A. Rakower Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, and Susan Estrich of Estrich Goldin LLP, filed a civil action lawsuit against Guzel Ganieva, Wigdor LLP, and John Does 1-3 (collectively, “Defendants”), seeking punitive and treble damages for alleged violation of the Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations Act (“RICO”). This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York, with Judge Paul A. Engelmayer presiding. 

In the complaint, the plaintiff alleged, “This case arises out of the ‘regrettable’ (his word) and consensual sexual relationship between Plaintiff and Defendant Guzel Ganieva. The relationship began in 2008; was sporadic; and ended when she left the country in 2014, although she continued to profess her love for Mr. Black after she left through numerous text messages and other communications to him. Ms. Ganieva returned to the United States in 2015 and demanded $100 million, expressly threatening to disclose and distort their relationship to Mr. Black’s wife and the board of the public company he ran, as well as the press if he did not pay her this extraordinary sum.”

Plaintiff then alleged, “The Enterprise created to extort and destroy Mr. Black went public in March of 2021 when Ms. Ganieva took to Twitter for her first time to call him a sexual predator under the guise of the #MeToo movement.”

The plaintiff further alleged, “The Defendants have used and abused the resources of the New York courts not to redress legitimate grievances but to try to immunize an organized campaign of fraud, extortion, and public humiliation, all aimed at the personal and financial destruction of Mr. Black and the corrupt financial gain to Ms. Ganieva and her cohorts. Were it not for the fact that so many women have indeed been the victims and survivors of unlawful conduct, Defendants would never have been able to get the attention—and inflict the harm—that they have with accusations that are utterly fabricated.”

The plaintiff then alleged, “What is to stop such abuse of the system? Lawyers. Ethics. And the rule of law. Under these protections, defendants cannot immunize their criminal enterprise, including from RICO, by cloaking their predicate acts as litigation activities. That is why this is a RICO case brought in a federal court with the power to enforce federal laws. ‘RICO is to be read broadly’ and should ‘be liberally construed to effectuate its remedial purposes.’ Sedima, S.P.R.L. v. Imrex Co., 473 U.S. 479, 497–98 (1985) (quotation marks and citation omitted).”

Plaintiff presented five claims for relief, including claims for alleged violation of the civil RICO, violation of 18 U.S.C. § 1962(c), civil RICO Conspiracy, violation of 18 U.S.C. § 1962(d), defamation, and breach of contract. 

In the prayer for relief, the plaintiff requested an award of monetary and/or non-monetary losses suffered by him, including, but not limited to, loss of income, reputational harm, and harm to professional reputation. The plaintiff also requested an award for treble and punitive damages, along with attorneys’ fees, costs, and disbursements incurred.

This is a summary of a legal complaint. All statements, claims, and allegations listed herein reflect the position of the plaintiff only and do not represent the position of UniCourt. Additionally, this case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the current status of this case. To view the latest case updates and court documents, please sign up for a UniCourt account.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-08824

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul A. Engelmayer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Leon D. Black

Defendants

Guzel Ganieva

Wigdor LLP.

Josh Harris

Steven Rubenstein

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Anya Goldin

Michael K. Kellogg

Reid Mason Figel

Susan Rachel Estrich

Defendant Attorneys

Kevin Todd Mintzer

Jeanne-Marie Bates Christensen

Janice J. DiGennaro

Max S. Gershenoff

Yonatan Bernstein

Martine M. Beamon

Paul Spagnoletti

Lindsay Brooke Schare

Matthew Cormack

Evan K. Farber

Jacob W Buchdahl

7 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#123

(#123) MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to #122 Notice of Appeal, filed by Leon D. Black. USCA Case Number 22-1524-cv. UPON DUE CONSIDERATION, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the judgment of the district court is AFFIRMED.. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 03/23/2023..(nd) (Entered: 03/23/2023)

#122

(#122) NOTICE OF APPEAL from #120 Memorandum & Opinion,,,,, #108 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document,,. Document filed by Leon D. Black. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number BNYSDC-26408060. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit..(Figel, Reid) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

#121

(#121) OPINION AND ORDER re: #33 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 11. filed by Wigdor LLP. For the aforementioned reasons, the Court denies Wigdor' s motion for sanctions. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to close the motion pending at docket 33, and to close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/30/2022) (rro) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

#120

(#120) OPINION & ORDER re: #85 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Leon D. Blacks Third Cause of Action pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 9(b), filed by Wigdor LLP., #83 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint, filed by Guzel Ganieva, #41 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Leon D. Black's First, Second, and Third Causes of Action pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 9(b), filed by Wigdor LLP., #80 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint, filed by Josh Harris, #44 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Guzel Ganieva, #88 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint, filed by Steven Rubenstein. For the aforementioned reasons, the Court dismisses with prejudice the FAC's claims of substantive and conspiracy violations of RICO. The Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the remaining, state-law, claims in this case, and dismisses these, without prejudice to Black's right to timely pursue such claims in state court. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to close the motions pending at dockets 41, 44, 80, 83, 85, and 88. Upon the issuance of the Court's decision on Wigdor's motion for sanctions later today, the Clerk of the Court will be respectfully directed to close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/30/2022) (va) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

#108

(#122) NOTICE OF APPEAL from #120 Memorandum & Opinion,,,,, #108 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document,,. Document filed by Leon D. Black. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number BNYSDC-26408060. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit..(Figel, Reid) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

33 #4

Exhibit 2 - Engagement Agreement as produced by Plaintiff, Guzel Ganieva, in Gan

33 #3

Exhibit 1 - Guzel Ganieva's First Amended Complaint in Ganieva v Black, Ind

33 #1

Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant Wigdor LLP's Motion for Sanction

33 #33

Main Document

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Wigdor LLP, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Leon D. Black..(Quinn, John) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Guzel Genieva, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Leon D. Black..(Quinn, John) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Quinn, John) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Main Document

177 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTransmission of USCA Mandate to the District Judge re: #123 USCA Mandate..(nd) (Entered: 03/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#123) MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to #122 Notice of Appeal, filed by Leon D. Black. USCA Case Number 22-1524-cv. UPON DUE CONSIDERATION, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the judgment of the district court is AFFIRMED.. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 03/23/2023..(nd) (Entered: 03/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for #122 Notice of Appeal, filed by Leon D. Black were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTransmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #122 Notice of Appeal. (tp) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#122) NOTICE OF APPEAL from #120 Memorandum & Opinion,,,,, #108 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document,,. Document filed by Leon D. Black. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number BNYSDC-26408060. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit..(Figel, Reid) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#121) OPINION AND ORDER re: #33 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 11. filed by Wigdor LLP. For the aforementioned reasons, the Court denies Wigdor' s motion for sanctions. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to close the motion pending at docket 33, and to close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/30/2022) (rro) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#120) OPINION & ORDER re: #85 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Leon D. Blacks Third Cause of Action pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 9(b), filed by Wigdor LLP., #83 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint, filed by Guzel Ganieva, #41 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Leon D. Black's First, Second, and Third Causes of Action pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 9(b), filed by Wigdor LLP., #80 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint, filed by Josh Harris, #44 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Guzel Ganieva, #88 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint, filed by Steven Rubenstein. For the aforementioned reasons, the Court dismisses with prejudice the FAC's claims of substantive and conspiracy violations of RICO. The Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the remaining, state-law, claims in this case, and dismisses these, without prejudice to Black's right to timely pursue such claims in state court. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to close the motions pending at dockets 41, 44, 80, 83, 85, and 88. Upon the issuance of the Court's decision on Wigdor's motion for sanctions later today, the Clerk of the Court will be respectfully directed to close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/30/2022) (va) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#119) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #118 Letter, filed by Guzel Ganieva. ENDORSEMENT: The Court thanks the parties for this update. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/2/2022) (va) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#118) JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Kevin Mintzer dated June 1, 2022 re: Update on state court action per Court's Order. Document filed by Guzel Ganieva. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation in Ganieva v. Black state court action).(Mintzer, Kevin) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#117) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #116 Letter filed by Guzel Ganieva. ENDORSEMENT: The Court thanks counsel for this update. Within one week of the May 25, 2022 status conference, the parties are to submit a joint letter to the Court describing the topics discussed and any ruling made or deadlines set by Justice Cohen at that conference. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 5/16/2022) (ate) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
121 More Docket Entries
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney John B. Quinn. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York;. (jgo) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer J. Barrett on behalf of Leon D. Black..(Barrett, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ryan Adam Rakower on behalf of Leon D. Black..(Rakower, Ryan) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Barry Carlinsky on behalf of Leon D. Black..(Carlinsky, Michael) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John B. Quinn on behalf of Leon D. Black..(Quinn, John) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Wigdor LLP, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Leon D. Black..(Quinn, John) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Guzel Genieva, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Leon D. Black..(Quinn, John) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Quinn, John) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against John Does 1-3, Guzel Ganieva, Wigdor LLP.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25259177)Document filed by Leon D. Black. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5).(Quinn, John) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less