This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/06/2020 at 08:24:39 (UTC).

BLACK-MEADOWS et al v. DEPTFORD TOWNSHIP et al

Case Summary

On 06/07/2020 BLACK-MEADOWS filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against DEPTFORD TOWNSHIP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ann Marie Donio and Joseph H. Rodriguez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-06951

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Ann Marie Donio

Presiding Judge

Joseph H. Rodriguez

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NORMA JOHNSON

RAZAYIA ROGERS

GLORIA BLACK-MEADOWS

LAKEIMA SAVAGE

Defendants

JOHN DOES 1 THROUGH 10

MARMAXX

WILLIAM BITTNER

DEPTFORD TOWNSHIP

KEVIN CLEMENTS

WILLIAM HANSTEIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHARON A. KING

Attorney at KING & KING, ESQS.

231 South Broad Street

Woodbury, NJ 08096

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by GLORIA BLACK-MEADOWS. WILLIAM HANSTEIN waiver sent on 6/19/2020, answer due 8/18/2020. (KING, SHARON) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by GLORIA BLACK-MEADOWS. DEPTFORD TOWNSHIP waiver sent on 6/19/2020, answer due 8/18/2020. (KING, SHARON) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by GLORIA BLACK-MEADOWS. KEVIN CLEMENTS waiver sent on 6/19/2020, answer due 8/18/2020. (KING, SHARON) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by GLORIA BLACK-MEADOWS. WILLIAM BITTNER waiver sent on 6/19/2020, answer due 8/18/2020. (KING, SHARON) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to WILLIAM BITTNER, KEVIN CLEMENTS, DEPTFORD TOWNSHIP, WILLIAM HANSTEIN, MARMAXX. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cry, ) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against DEPTFORD TOWNSHIP, WILLIAM HANSTEIN, KEVIN CLEMENTS, WILLIAM BITTNER, MARMAXX OPERATING CORP. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10909799) with JURY DEMAND, filed by RAZAYIA ROGERS, GLORIA BLACK-MEADOWS, ESTATE OF LASHANDA ANDERSON, LAKEIMA SAVAGE, R.R. a minor, by NORMA JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KING, SHARON) (Entered: 06/07/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by GLORIA BLACK-MEADOWS. WILLIAM HANSTEIN waiver sent on 6/19/2020, answer due 8/18/2020. (KING, SHARON) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by GLORIA BLACK-MEADOWS. DEPTFORD TOWNSHIP waiver sent on 6/19/2020, answer due 8/18/2020. (KING, SHARON) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by GLORIA BLACK-MEADOWS. KEVIN CLEMENTS waiver sent on 6/19/2020, answer due 8/18/2020. (KING, SHARON) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by GLORIA BLACK-MEADOWS. WILLIAM BITTNER waiver sent on 6/19/2020, answer due 8/18/2020. (KING, SHARON) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (cry, ) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to WILLIAM BITTNER, KEVIN CLEMENTS, DEPTFORD TOWNSHIP, WILLIAM HANSTEIN, MARMAXX. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cry, ) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketJudge Joseph H. Rodriguez and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dd, ) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against DEPTFORD TOWNSHIP, WILLIAM HANSTEIN, KEVIN CLEMENTS, WILLIAM BITTNER, MARMAXX OPERATING CORP. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10909799) with JURY DEMAND, filed by RAZAYIA ROGERS, GLORIA BLACK-MEADOWS, ESTATE OF LASHANDA ANDERSON, LAKEIMA SAVAGE, R.R. a minor, by NORMA JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KING, SHARON) (Entered: 06/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Marmaxx Group is a litigant