This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/18/2020 at 14:28:26 (UTC).

Black et al v. Boston Scientific Corporation

Case Summary

On 03/19/2020 Black filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Boston Scientific Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Tu M. Pham and Sheryl H. Lipman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02202

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Tu M. Pham

Presiding Judge

Sheryl H. Lipman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cathleen J. Black

James L. Black

Defendant

Boston Scientific Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bruce M. Smith

Attorney at APPERSON CRUMP, PLC

6070 Poplar Ave., Sixth Floor

Memphis, TN 38119-3954

Andrew N Faes

Attorney at WAGSTAFF & CARTMELL

4740 Grand Ave, Ste 300

Kansas City, MO 64112

Jeffrey Kuntz

Attorney at WAGSTAFF & CARTMELL

4740 Grand Avenue, Suite 300

Kansas City, MO 64112

Defendant Attorneys

Alana Kim Bassin

Attorney at BOWMAN AND BROOKE LLP

150 South Fifth St., Ste. 2600

Minneapolis, MN 55402-4244

Robert F. Tom

Attorney at BAKER DONELSON-Memphis

165 Madison Avenue, Suite 2000

Memphis, TN 38103

Locke Houston Waldrop

Attorney at BAKER DONELSON BEARMAN CALDWELL & BERKOWITZ

165 Madison Avenue, Suite 2000

Memphis, TN 38103

Rachelle V Anderson

Attorney at BOWMAN AND BROOKE LLP

150 South Fifth Street, Ste 3000

Minneapolis, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

#22

#20

#18

17 #1

Exhibit A

#17

#15

#14

#13

#11

#10

9 #1

Memorandum

#9

#8

#7

#2

#6

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2020
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE OF SETTING: (TEXT ONLY - NO IMAGE ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY): The parties are hereby notified that the Scheduling Conference currently set for Thursday, May 28, 2020 at 9:00 AM will be held via Skype Video before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. The Court will send, via email, to each attorney, an invitation for the conference. Parties shall consult the # Skype for Business webpage for instructions on downloading the proper extensions for their computer.(smm) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) RESPONSE in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation's Reply Brief in Support of its Partial Motion to Dismiss filed by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Waldrop, Locke) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER granting #20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO IMAGE ATTACHED.**] Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 4/24/20. (Lipman, Sheryl) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $150 receipt number TNWDC-3333907) by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Bassin, Alana) Receipt info added on 4/24/2020 (cbs). (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO IMAGE ATTACHED.**] Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 4/24/20. (Lipman, Sheryl) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (proposed order submitted) (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3333797) by Cathleen J. Black, James L. Black. (Kuntz, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) filed by Cathleen J. Black, James L. Black. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Faes, Andrew) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO IMAGE ATTACHED.**] Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 4/17/20. (Lipman, Sheryl) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3329454) by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Anderson, Rachelle) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by James L. Black as to Boston Scientific Corporation. (Smith, Bruce) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Tom, Robert) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Dismiss by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(Tom, Robert) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Locke Houston Waldrop on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation (Waldrop, Locke) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert F. Tom on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation (Tom, Robert) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Boston Scientific Corporation. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jld) (csf). (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Boston Scientific Corporation (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3312145), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for Boston Scientific Corporation)(Smith, Bruce) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Boston Scientific Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bruce M. Smith

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew N. Faes

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey Kuntz