This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:39:39 (UTC).

Black Crown Inc. v. Anheuser-Busch Companies LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Black Crown Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Anheuser-Busch Companies LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Autumn D. Spaeth and Josephine L. Staton. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-00023

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Autumn D. Spaeth

Presiding Judge

Josephine L. Staton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Black Crown Inc.

Defendants

www.blackcrown.com

Anheuser-Busch Companies LLC

Does 1-50, Inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher M Naghibi

Attorney at Black Crown Law

23276 South Pointe Drive Suite 208

Laguna Hills, CA 92653

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton. The parties hereby stipulate as follows: 1.Plaintiff's entire complaint against Defendants, as captioned above, including all causes of action alleged therein, is hereby dismissed with prejudice; and 2.All parties shall bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#10

(#10) First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case with Prejudice filed by Plaintiff Black Crown Inc.. (Naghibi, Christopher) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#9

(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Anheuser-Busch Companies LLC. (jp) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#8

(#8) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (tg) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#7

(#7) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Black Crown Inc.. (Naghibi, Christopher) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, (Naghibi, Christopher) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

1 #10

Exhibit Exhibit J

1 #9

Exhibit Exhibit I

1 #8

Exhibit Exhibit H

1 #7

Exhibit Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25068778 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Black Crown Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J) (Attorney Christopher M Naghibi added to party Black Crown Inc.(pty:pla))(Naghibi, Christopher) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton. The parties hereby stipulate as follows: 1.Plaintiff's entire complaint against Defendants, as captioned above, including all causes of action alleged therein, is hereby dismissed with prejudice; and 2.All parties shall bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case with Prejudice filed by Plaintiff Black Crown Inc.. (Naghibi, Christopher) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Anheuser-Busch Companies LLC. (jp) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (tg) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Black Crown Inc.. (Naghibi, Christopher) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, (Naghibi, Christopher) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (ghap) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Black Crown Inc.. (Naghibi, Christopher) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25068778 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Black Crown Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J) (Attorney Christopher M Naghibi added to party Black Crown Inc.(pty:pla))(Naghibi, Christopher) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less