This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:38:45 (UTC).

(BK) Taggart et al v. Roberts et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 BK Taggart filed a Bankruptcy - Withdrawal lawsuit against Roberts. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kimberly J. Mueller and Edmund F. Brennan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02470

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Withdrawal

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kimberly J. Mueller

Referral Judge

Edmund F. Brennan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Yu Fang Taggart

Melissa Bolton

Defendants

Pamela Jean Hall

Richard Leon Roberts

Trustee

Office of the U.S. Trustee (Sac)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard John Morin

Attorney at Law Office of Rick Morin, PC

555 Capitol Mall, Suite 750

Sacramento, CA 95814

Defendant Attorneys

Aron Mark Oliner

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

1 Market, Spear Tower, Suite 2200

San Francisco, CA 94105-1127

Geoffrey A. Heaton

One Market Plaza, Spear Street Tower, Suite 2200

San Francisco, CA 94105

Aron M. Oliner

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

One Market Plaza, Spear Street Tower, Suite 2200

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) MOTION to WITHDRAW REFERENCE by Pamela Jean Hall, Richard Leon Roberts.(Donati, J) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION: Motion Hearing on Defendants' #1 Motion to Withdraw Reference was erroneously set for 1/17/2020 at 09:00 AM (ECF No. 2). On the court's own motion, the Motion Hearing is RESET for 1/17/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. The briefing schedule remains the same. (Michel, G.) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

5 #1

Certificate of Service

#5

(#5) REPLY by Pamela Jean Hall, Richard Leon Roberts re #4 Opposition to Motion. Attorney Heaton, Geoffrey A. added. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Heaton, Geoffrey) Modified on 1/14/2020 (Benson, A.). (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#4

(#4) OPPOSITION by Melissa Bolton, Yu Fang Taggart to #1 Motion to Withdraw Reference. (Morin, Richard) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: On the court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), Defendants' Motion to Withdraw Reference (ECF No. #1 ) is SUBMITTED without oral argument. The motion is submitted on the briefs as provided by Local Rule 230(d). Accordingly, the hearing date of 2/7/2020 is VACATED. If the court determines that oral argument is needed, it will be scheduled at a later date. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE ORDER issued by Relief Courtroom Deputy G. Michel for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/10/2020: On the court's own motion, the hearing on Defendants' Motion to Withdraw Reference (ECF No. #1 ) set for 1/17/2020 is VACATED and RESET for 2/7/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Motion briefing deadlines are reset as provided by Local Rule 230. (Text Only Entry) (Michel, G.) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REPLY by Pamela Jean Hall, Richard Leon Roberts re #4 Opposition to Motion. Attorney Heaton, Geoffrey A. added. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Heaton, Geoffrey) Modified on 1/14/2020 (Benson, A.). (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) OPPOSITION by Melissa Bolton, Yu Fang Taggart to #1 Motion to Withdraw Reference. (Morin, Richard) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION: Motion Hearing on Defendants' #1 Motion to Withdraw Reference was erroneously set for 1/17/2020 at 09:00 AM (ECF No. 2). On the court's own motion, the Motion Hearing is RESET for 1/17/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. The briefing schedule remains the same. (Michel, G.) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MINUTE ORDER issued by Relief Courtroom Deputy G. Michel for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/12/2019 ORDERING that the #1 Motion to Withdraw Reference is SET for hearing on 1/17/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Responses should be filed no less than 14 days prior to the hearing, and replies 7 days prior to the hearing as provided by Local Rule 230. (Text Only Entry) (Michel, G.) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION to WITHDRAW REFERENCE by Pamela Jean Hall, Richard Leon Roberts.(Donati, J) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.