This case was last updated from PACER on 01/18/2020 at 07:53:41 (UTC).

(BK) In Re: Tarajit & Rajpal Chatha

Case Summary

On 11/19/2019 BK In Re Tarajit Rajpal Chatha was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kimberly J. Mueller and William B. Shubb. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02341

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Kimberly J. Mueller

William B. Shubb

 

Party Details

Appellant

Simranjit Chatha

Mansfield, TX 76063

Debtors

Taranjit Kaur Chatha

Rajpal Singh Chatha

Appellee

Douglas Whatley

Trustee

Office of the U.S. Trustee (Sac)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Richard John Morin

Attorney at Law Office of Rick Morin, PC

555 Capitol Mall, Suite 750

Sacramento, CA 95814

Debtor Attorney

William Steven Shumway

Attorney at Law Office of W. Steven Shumway

2140 Professional Dr., Suite 250

Roseville, CA 95661

Appellee Attorneys

Christopher D. Hughes

Attorney at Nossaman LLP

621 Capitol Mall, Suite 2500

Sacramento, CA 95814

Gregory Joseph Hughes

Attorney at Hughes Law Corporation

3017 Douglas Blvd., Suite 300

Roseville, CA 95661

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Douglas Whatley re #3 Notice of Related Case(s). (Hughes, Christopher) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#2

(#2) OPENING LETTER in BANKRUPTCY APPEAL in re Debtor: *Rajpal & Taranjit Chatha*, Appellant: *Simranjit Chatha*, Appellee: *Douglas Whatley*, USBC #: *17-25335-B-7*, ADV #: *18-2102-B*, BAP #: *EC-19-1264*, Bankruptcy Judge: *Jaime*; (Attachments: #1 Notice) (Donati, J) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE of BANKRUPTCY APPEAL, Bankruptcy Court case number 17-25335, AP # 18-2102, BAP # EC-19-1264 by Simranjit Chatha. 30-Day Filing Deadline for Bankruptcy Certificate of Record due by 12/23/2019.(Donati, J) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 2:19-CV-02129-WBS by Douglas Whatley. (Hughes, Christopher) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#7

(#7) AMENDED MOTION for Leave to Appeal by Simranjit Chatha. [INITIALLY FILED IN THE BK COURT] (Donati, J) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of incomplete or delayed record, re #2 Bankruptcy New Case Documents for KJM. (Reader, L) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

2 #1

Notice

#5

(#5) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/25/19 DEEMING actions 2:19-cv-2129 WBS and 2:19-cv-2341 KJM to be RELATED; REASSIGNING Case 2:19-cv-2341 KJM to Senior Judge William B. Shubb for all further proceedings; and VACATING any dates currently set in the reassigned case. District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller no longer assigned to case. New Case Number: 2:19-cv-2341 WBS. (Coll, A) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AMENDED MOTION for Leave to Appeal by Simranjit Chatha. [INITIALLY FILED IN THE BK COURT] (Donati, J) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of incomplete or delayed record, re #2 Bankruptcy New Case Documents for KJM. (Reader, L) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order Reassigning Case served on Simranjit Chatha. (Coll, A) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/25/19 DEEMING actions 2:19-cv-2129 WBS and 2:19-cv-2341 KJM to be RELATED; REASSIGNING Case 2:19-cv-2341 KJM to Senior Judge William B. Shubb for all further proceedings; and VACATING any dates currently set in the reassigned case. District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller no longer assigned to case. New Case Number: 2:19-cv-2341 WBS. (Coll, A) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Douglas Whatley re #3 Notice of Related Case(s). (Hughes, Christopher) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 2:19-CV-02129-WBS by Douglas Whatley. (Hughes, Christopher) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Bankruptcy New Case Documents for KJM, served on Simranjit Chatha. (Donati, J) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) OPENING LETTER in BANKRUPTCY APPEAL in re Debtor: *Rajpal & Taranjit Chatha*, Appellant: *Simranjit Chatha*, Appellee: *Douglas Whatley*, USBC #: *17-25335-B-7*, ADV #: *18-2102-B*, BAP #: *EC-19-1264*, Bankruptcy Judge: *Jaime*; (Attachments: #1 Notice) (Donati, J) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE of BANKRUPTCY APPEAL, Bankruptcy Court case number 17-25335, AP # 18-2102, BAP # EC-19-1264 by Simranjit Chatha. 30-Day Filing Deadline for Bankruptcy Certificate of Record due by 12/23/2019.(Donati, J) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.