BJ ENERGY SOLUTIONS, LLC v. EVOLUTION WELL SERVICES, LLC

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14962532), filed by BJ ENERGY SOLUTIONS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ExhA, #2 Exhibit ExhB, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Shield, Christopher) (Attachment 3 replaced on 6/29/2021) (lad). (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by BJ ENERGY SOLUTIONS, LLC. (Shield, Christopher) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Shield, Christopher) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to EVOLUTION WELL SERVICES, LLC. (lad) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph S. Grinstein on behalf of BJ ENERGY SOLUTIONS, LLC (Grinstein, Joseph) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Max L. Tribble, Jr on behalf of BJ ENERGY SOLUTIONS, LLC (Tribble, Max) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by BJ ENERGY SOLUTIONS, LLC. EVOLUTION WELL SERVICES, LLC served on 7/9/2021, answer due 7/30/2021. (Shield, Christopher) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Max L. Tribble, Jr on behalf of Beatrice C. Franklin ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15006863) by on behalf of BJ ENERGY SOLUTIONS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by BJ ENERGY SOLUTIONS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grinstein, Joseph) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Beatrice C. Franklin for BJ ENERGY SOLUTIONS, LLC. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jc5) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Plaintiff's Motion to extend the time for Defendant to Answer. The Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including September 17, 2021 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JGlc) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketReset Deadlines: EVOLUTION WELL SERVICES, LLC answer due 9/17/2021. (ir) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond by EVOLUTION WELL SERVICES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mason, Dwayne) Modified on 9/21/2021 (ir). (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dwayne L. Mason on behalf of BJ ENERGY SOLUTIONS, LLC. Attorney Dwayne L. Mason added to party BJ ENERGY SOLUTIONS, LLC(pty:pla) (Mason, Dwayne) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketReset Deadlines: EVOLUTION WELL SERVICES, LLC answer due 10/18/2021. (ir) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending, filed by BJ ENERGY SOLUTIONS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ExhA, #2 Exhibit ExhB)(Shield, Christopher) (Main Document 12 replaced on 9/28/2021) (ir). (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by BJ ENERGY SOLUTIONS, LLC. (Shield, Christopher) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Summons Issued as to EVOLUTION WELL SERVICES OPERATIONS, LLC. (ir) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION to Substitute (Docket Entry #12) by BJ ENERGY SOLUTIONS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Amended Complaint)(Shield, Christopher) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #15 Motion to Substitute entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for Consideration Plaintiff's Motion to Substitute. After review, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion and instructs the Clerk of the Court to substitute the Amended Complaint attached as an exhibit to ECF No. 15 for ECF No. 12. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JGlc) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by BJ ENERGY SOLUTIONS, LLC. (Shield, Christopher) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Summons Issued as to EVOLUTION WELL SERVICES OPERATING, LLC. (ir) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) SUMMONS Returned Executed by BJ ENERGY SOLUTIONS, LLC. EVOLUTION WELL SERVICES OPERATING, LLC served on 9/28/2021, answer due 10/19/2021. (Shield, Christopher) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Evolution Well Services, LLC's and Evolution Well Services Operating, LLC's Opposed Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Claims of Indirect Infringement by EVOLUTION WELL SERVICES OPERATING, LLC, EVOLUTION WELL SERVICES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mason, Dwayne) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Sealed Motion Evolution Well Services, LLC's and Evolution Well Services Operating, LLC's Motion to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) by EVOLUTION WELL SERVICES OPERATING, LLC, EVOLUTION WELL SERVICES, LLC (Attachments: #1 Sealed Document Declaration of Steven W. Anderson) (Mason, Dwayne) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ATTACHMENT Declaration of Dwayne L. Mason to #21 Sealed Motion Evolution Well Services, LLC's and Evolution Well Services Operating, LLC's Motion to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) by EVOLUTION WELL SERVICES OPERATING, LLC, EVOLUTION WELL SERVICES, LLC by EVOLUTION WELL SERVICES OPERATING, LLC, EVOLUTION WELL SERVICES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Proposed Order)(Mason, Dwayne) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Pro Hac Vice Letter for Ira R. Hatton. (ir) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MOTION to Stay Case Defendants Evolution Well Services, LLC's and Evolution Well Services Operating, LLC's Motion to Stay Pending Resolution of the Motion to Transfer by EVOLUTION WELL SERVICES OPERATING, LLC, EVOLUTION WELL SERVICES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mason, Dwayne) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Redacted Copy of Evolution Well Services, LLC's and Evolution Well Services Operating, LLC's Opposed Motion to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) of #21 Sealed Motion Evolution Well Services, LLC's and Evolution Well Services Operating, LLC's Motion to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) by EVOLUTION WELL SERVICES OPERATING, LLC, EVOLUTION WELL SERVICES, LLC by EVOLUTION WELL SERVICES OPERATING, LLC, EVOLUTION WELL SERVICES, LLC. (Mason, Dwayne) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Redacted Copy of Declaration of Steven W. Anderson of #21 Sealed Motion Evolution Well Services, LLC's and Evolution Well Services Operating, LLC's Motion to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) by EVOLUTION WELL SERVICES OPERATING, LLC, EVOLUTION WELL SERVICES, LLC by EVOLUTION WELL SERVICES OPERATING, LLC, EVOLUTION WELL SERVICES, LLC. (Mason, Dwayne) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) STATUS REPORT Case Readiness Status Report by BJ ENERGY SOLUTIONS, LLC. (Grinstein, Joseph) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) NOTICE Notice Regarding Venue Discovery by BJ ENERGY SOLUTIONS, LLC (Grinstein, Joseph) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE Notice Regarding Unopposed Request to Extend Deadline for Motion to Dismiss Opposition by BJ ENERGY SOLUTIONS, LLC (Grinstein, Joseph) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) NOTICE of Service re Plaintiff's Preliminary Infringement Contentions by BJ ENERGY SOLUTIONS, LLC (Grinstein, Joseph) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Beatrice C. Franklin on behalf of BJ ENERGY SOLUTIONS, LLC (Franklin, Beatrice) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by BJ ENERGY SOLUTIONS, LLC, re #24 MOTION to Stay Case Defendants Evolution Well Services, LLC's and Evolution Well Services Operating, LLC's Motion to Stay Pending Resolution of the Motion to Transfer filed by Defendant EVOLUTION WELL SERVICES, LLC, Defendant EVOLUTION WELL SERVICES OPERATING, LLC (Grinstein, Joseph) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by EVOLUTION WELL SERVICES OPERATING, LLC, EVOLUTION WELL SERVICES, LLC, re #24 MOTION to Stay Case Defendants Evolution Well Services, LLC's and Evolution Well Services Operating, LLC's Motion to Stay Pending Resolution of the Motion to Transfer filed by Defendant EVOLUTION WELL SERVICES, LLC, Defendant EVOLUTION WELL SERVICES OPERATING, LLC (Mason, Dwayne) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Joint MOTION for Entry of Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Evolution's Motion to Dismiss re #20 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Evolution Well Services, LLC's and Evolution Well Services Operating, LLC's Opposed Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Claims of Indirect Infringement by BJ ENERGY SOLUTIONS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grinstein, Joseph) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ORDER GRANTING #34 Motion for Entry of Order re #20 ; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #20 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Joint MOTION for Entry of a Scheduling Order by BJ ENERGY SOLUTIONS, LLC. (Grinstein, Joseph) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) SCHEDULING ORDER:Markman Hearing set for 4/18/2022 09:00 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Joinder of Parties due by 5/30/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 8/8/2022. Dispositive and Daubert Motions due by 1/23/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 3/2/2023 before Judge Alan D Albright. Jury Selection set for 4/17/2023 before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Jury Trial set for 4/17/2023 before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (ir) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less