This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/11/2023 at 20:41:50 (UTC).

BJ Energy Solutions, LLC v. Evolution Well Services, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/22/2022 BJ Energy Solutions, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Evolution Well Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew S Hanen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-02017

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrew S Hanen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

BJ Energy Solutions, LLC

Defendants and Counter Claimants

EVOLUTION WELL SERVICES, LLC

EVOLUTION WELL SERVICES OPERATING, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Beatrice C. Franklin

Joseph S Grinstein

Max L. Tribble, Jr.

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Dwayne L Mason

Roland Garcia

 

Court Documents

#86

(#86) ORDER FOR STAY PENDING INTER PARTES REVIEW.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon) Parties notified.(sjones, 4) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

85 #1

Proposed Order

85 #85

Main Document

#84

(#84) ORDER granting #79 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christopher Aaron Shield terminated.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(kpicota, 4) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

#83

(#83) ORDER granting #81 Motion for Beatrice C. Franklin to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

82 #2

Exhibit B

#81

(#81) MOTION for Beatrice C. Franklin to Appear Pro Hac Vice by BJ Energy Solutions, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/28/2022. (Franklin, Beatrice) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

79 #1

Proposed Order

79 #79

Main Document

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Max L. Tribble, Jr on behalf of BJ ENERGY SOLUTIONS, LLC (Tribble, Max) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph S. Grinstein on behalf of BJ ENERGY SOLUTIONS, LLC (Grinstein, Joseph) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to EVOLUTION WELL SERVICES, LLC. (lad) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Shield, Christopher) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by BJ ENERGY SOLUTIONS, LLC. (Shield, Christopher) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit ExhB

1 #1

Exhibit ExhA

1 #1

Main Document

134 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketInitial Conference set for 9/22/22 is terminated. (sjones, 4) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#86) ORDER FOR STAY PENDING INTER PARTES REVIEW.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon) Parties notified.(sjones, 4) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#85) Joint MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review by BJ Energy Solutions, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grinstein, Joseph) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#84) ORDER granting #79 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christopher Aaron Shield terminated.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(kpicota, 4) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#83) ORDER granting #81 Motion for Beatrice C. Franklin to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#82) JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by BJ Energy Solutions, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Grinstein, Joseph) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#81) MOTION for Beatrice C. Franklin to Appear Pro Hac Vice by BJ Energy Solutions, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/28/2022. (Franklin, Beatrice) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#80) NOTICE of Resetting re: #72 Order for Initial Conference - FORM,. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 9/22/2022 at 10:40 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon, filed. (JessicaVillarreal, 3) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#79) Unopposed MOTION for Christopher A. Shield to Withdraw as Attorney by BJ Energy Solutions, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/10/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shield, Christopher) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#78) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by BJ Energy Solutions, LLC, filed.(Grinstein, Joseph) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
76 More Docket Entries
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Max L. Tribble, Jr on behalf of Beatrice C. Franklin ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15006863) by on behalf of BJ ENERGY SOLUTIONS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by BJ ENERGY SOLUTIONS, LLC. EVOLUTION WELL SERVICES, LLC served on 7/9/2021, answer due 7/30/2021. (Shield, Christopher) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Max L. Tribble, Jr on behalf of BJ ENERGY SOLUTIONS, LLC (Tribble, Max) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph S. Grinstein on behalf of BJ ENERGY SOLUTIONS, LLC (Grinstein, Joseph) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to EVOLUTION WELL SERVICES, LLC. (lad) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Shield, Christopher) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by BJ ENERGY SOLUTIONS, LLC. (Shield, Christopher) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14962532), filed by BJ ENERGY SOLUTIONS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ExhA, #2 Exhibit ExhB, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Shield, Christopher) (Attachment 3 replaced on 6/29/2021) (lad). (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less