This case was last updated from PACER on 11/03/2019 at 07:52:09 (UTC).

Bittner v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Company

Case Summary

On 09/04/2019 Bittner filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Fire Casualty Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kelly K.E. Mahoney and Leonard T Strand. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-03045

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kelly K.E. Mahoney

Presiding Judge

Leonard T Strand

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Judith A Bittner

Defendant

State Farm Fire & Casualty Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Judith M O'Donohoe

Attorney at Elwood O'Donohoe O'Connor & Stochl

116 North Main Street, Po Box 307, ***Ecf

Charles City, IA 50616

Defendant Attorneys

Benjamin M Weston

Attorney at Lederer Weston & Craig PLC

4401 Westown Parkway, Suite 212, ***Ecf

West Des Moines, IA 50266

J Michael Weston

Attorney at Lederer Weston & Craig PLC

118 3Rd Ave Se Ste 700, Po Box 1927, ***Ecf

Cedar Rapids, IA 52406-1927

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Appendix

1 #3

State Court Pleadings

1 #4

LR 81.a Statement

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (Weston, J) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney pursuant to potential related case 3:19-cv-3008-LTS-KEM and verification from LTS. Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts no longer assigned to the case. (des) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Defendant's ANSWER jury demand to Complaint by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company.(Weston, J) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • Set Deadline: Defendant's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 9/25/2019. (pac) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DOCKET Annotation: Attached is the case packet used in removal cases. (pac) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STATE Court Petition with Jury Demand by Judith A Bittner. (pac) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 10/5/2019. (pac) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added (no conflicts identified). (pac) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE of Removal from Cerro Gordo County, case number LACV071807. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-3012771), filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. Scheduling Report due by 11/4/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix, #3 State Court Pleadings, #4 LR 81.a Statement) (Weston, J) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Fire & Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer J Michael Weston

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin Michael Weston