This case was last updated from PACER on 11/08/2020 at 09:28:08 (UTC).

Bittleston v. Wyoming Attorney General

Case Summary

On 09/09/2020 Bittleston filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Wyoming Attorney General. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wyoming District. The Judges overseeing this case are Scott W Skavdahl and Kelly H Rankin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00171

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wyoming District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Scott W Skavdahl

Referral Judge

Kelly H Rankin

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Justin Wade Bittleston

Riverton, WY 82501

Respondent

Wyoming Attorney General

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) ORDER Dismissing #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by the Honorable Scott W. Skavdahl. Case terminated. Petitioner served via US Mail on October 13, 2020.(Court Staff, szf) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $5 receipt #CAS002474.), filed by Justin Wade Bittleston. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Court Staff, scat) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER Dismissing #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by the Honorable Scott W. Skavdahl. Case terminated. Petitioner served via US Mail on October 13, 2020.(Court Staff, szf) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $5 receipt #CAS002474.), filed by Justin Wade Bittleston. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Court Staff, scat) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less