This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/27/2022 at 08:48:37 (UTC).

Bittinger et al v. DNF Associates, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/28/2022 Bittinger filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against DNF Associates, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Theodore D. Chuang. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:22-CV-02461

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Theodore D. Chuang

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sheryl Bittinger

Susan Rhodes

Tiffany Johnson

Renee Burge

Defendants

DNF Associates, LLC

Second Round Sub, LLC

Klima, Peters & Daly, PA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard S Gordon

Attorney at Gordon, Wolf & Carney, Chtd

100 W Pennsylvania Ave Ste 100

Towson, MD 21204

Benjamin Howard Carney

Attorney at Gordon, Wolf & Carney, Chtd

100 W Pennsylvania Ave Ste 100

Towson, MD 21204

Defendant Attorneys

James M Brault

Attorney at Brault Graham LLC

101 S Washington St

Rockville, MD 20850

Brendan H Little

Attorney at Lippes Mathias Wexler Friedman LLP

50 Fountain Plaza Suite 1700

Buffalo, NY 14202

Patrick K Burns

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP

1101 King Street, Suite 520

Alexandria, VA 22314

Malcolm Brooks Savage, III

Attorney at Gordon & Rees, LLP

1101 King Street, Suite 520

Alexandria, VA 22314

Lauren M Burnette

Attorney at Messer Strickler Burnette, Ltd.

12276 San Jose Blvd., Suite 718

Jacksonville, FL 32223

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) ORDER granting Defendants leave to file the proposed Motions and a single, joint brief and a single, joint reply brief by December 2, 2022. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 11/4/2022. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

#23

RESTRICTED

#21

(#21) NOTICE by Klima, Peters & Daly, PA of Intent to File Motion to Dismiss (Burnette, Lauren) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

#20

(#20) NOTICE by DNF Associates, LLC of intent to make a Motion to Dismiss (Little, Brendan) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

#19

(#19) NOTICE by Second Round Sub, LLC re #16 Case Management Order Notice of Intent to File a Moiton to Dismiss (Burns, Patrick) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

#18

(#18) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Sheryl Bittinger, Renee Burge, Tiffany Johnson, Susan Rhodes (Carney, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Howard Carney on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Carney, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

#16

(#16) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 10/11/2022. (ds2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

#6

(#15) NOTICE by DNF Associates, LLC re #6 Notice of Standing Order 2021-13 Concerning Removal Actions (Little, Brendan) (Entered: 10/10/2022)

1 #30

Attachment

1 #28

Attachment

1 #24

Attachment

1 #17

Attachment

1 #14

Attachment

1 #11

Attachment

1 #9

Attachment

1 #7

Attachment

1 #1

Main Document

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER granting Defendants leave to file the proposed Motions and a single, joint brief and a single, joint reply brief by December 2, 2022. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 11/4/2022. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Case Management Conference held on 11/4/2022 before Judge Theodore D. Chuang.(Court Reporter: FTR Recording\2B) (ds2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) PAPERLESS NOTICE. A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE is scheduled for November 4, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. to discuss #19 , #20 , and #21 NOTICES OF INTENT TO FILE A MOTION TO DISMISS. To join the call at the scheduled time: (1) Dial 1-888-557-8511. (2) Enter access code 3008173, followed by the # key. You will then be placed on hold until Chambers dials into the call, at which point you will be prompted to enter a security code. (3) When prompted, enter security code 11041000 followed by the # key. The call will be recorded, so please do not use speakerphones as they compromise sound quality. Also, we ask that parties not remain on the conference line after the Judge has left the call, to ensure that the line is free for other calls that may be on the Judge's calendar. The parties should also be prepared to address whether they consent to have all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge and whether they wish to participate in a mediation session with a Magistrate Judge, whether before, during, or after discovery. Parties are expected to consult with their clients and confer with each other on these issues in advance of the Case Management Conference and, if possible, present joint views to the Court. (ds2s, Deputy Clerk) Modified to edit text on 11/4/2022 (ds2s, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 10/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE by Klima, Peters & Daly, PA of Intent to File Motion to Dismiss (Burnette, Lauren) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE by DNF Associates, LLC of intent to make a Motion to Dismiss (Little, Brendan) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE by Second Round Sub, LLC re #16 Case Management Order Notice of Intent to File a Moiton to Dismiss (Burns, Patrick) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Sheryl Bittinger, Renee Burge, Tiffany Johnson, Susan Rhodes (Carney, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Howard Carney on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Carney, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 10/11/2022. (ds2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE by DNF Associates, LLC re #6 Notice of Standing Order 2021-13 Concerning Removal Actions (Little, Brendan) (Entered: 10/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Complaint by DNF Associates, LLC, Klima, Peters & Daly, PA, Second Round Sub, LLC(Burns, Patrick) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick K Burns on behalf of Second Round Sub, LLC (Burns, Patrick) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Clerk's Notice of Standing Order concerning removal actions filed in this Court, which can be downloaded #here. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketTHE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2-5) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR MONTGOMERY COUNTY. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STATE COURT THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against DNF Associates, LLC, Klima, Peters & Daly, PA, Second Round Sub, LLC, filed by Renee Burge, Sheryl Bittinger, Tiffany Johnson, Susan Rhodes. (Attachments: #1 Redline Version)(mg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STATE COURT SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against DNF Associates, LLC, Klima, Peters & Daly, PA, Second Round Sub, LLC, filed by Renee Burge, Sheryl Bittinger, Tiffany Johnson, Susan Rhodes.(mg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STATE COURT FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against DNF Associates, LLC, Klima, Peters & Daly, PA, Second Round Sub, LLC, filed by Renee Burge, Sheryl Bittinger, Tiffany Johnson, Susan Rhodes.(mg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STATE COURT COMPLAINT against DNF Associates, LLC, Klima, Peters & Daly, PA, Second Round Sub, LLC, filed by Renee Burge, Sheryl Bittinger, Tiffany Johnson, Susan Rhodes.(mg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketCIVIL CASE FILING FEE: $ 402, receipt number AMDDC-10179027(Brault, James) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Montgomery County, case number C-15-CV-22-001358., filed by DNF Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex, A-Third Amended Party Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Ex. B-Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Attachment, #4 Attachment, #5 Attachment, #6 Attachment, #7 Attachment, #8 Attachment, #9 Attachment, #10 Attachment, #11 Attachment, #12 Attachment, #13 Attachment, #14 Attachment, #15 Attachment, #16 Attachment, #17 Attachment, #18 Attachment, #19 Attachment, #20 Attachment, #21 Attachment, #22 Attachment, #23 Attachment, #24 Attachment, #25 Attachment, #26 Attachment, #27 Attachment, #28 Attachment, #29 Attachment, #30 Attachment, #31 Attachment, #32 Attachment)(Brault, James) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less