This case was last updated from PACER on 03/28/2021 at 07:02:35 (UTC).

Bitmouni v. Paysafe Limited

Case Summary

On 01/27/2021 Bitmouni filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Paysafe Limited. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph C. Spero. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00641

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph C. Spero

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kamal Bitmouni

Defendant

Paysafe Limited a Bermuda limited company formerly doing business as Paysafe Group Holdings Limited

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Leslie Sindelar Guillon

Attorney at Clayeo C. Arnold, A Professional Law Corporation

865 Howe Avenue

Sacramento, CA 95825

Michael Anderson Berry

Attorney at Clayeo C. Arnold, A Professional Law Corp.

865 Howe Avenue

Sacramento, CA 95825

John A. Yanchunis

Attorney at Morgan and Morgan, P.A.

201 N. Franklin Street, 7Th Floor

Tampa, FL 33602

Ryan D. Maxey

Attorney at Morgan and Morgan Complex LItigation Group

201 N. Franklin Street, 7Th Fl

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorney

William David Sarratt

Attorney at Debevoise and Plimpton LLP

919 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) Order. Signed 3/23/2021 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #17 Stipulation Extending Time for Defendant's Time to Respond.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2021) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

17 #1

Declaration of David Sarratt

#17

(#17) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Defendant's Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Paysafe Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Sarratt)(Sarratt, William) (Filed on 3/22/2021) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

#16

(#16) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Paysafe Limited.. (Sarratt, William) (Filed on 3/3/2021) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

#15

(#15) ORDER GRANTING re #14 Stipulation to Extend Time filed by Paysafe Limited. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/19/2021. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2021) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

#14

(#14) STIPULATION Extending Defendant's Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond Pursuant to Civil L.R. 6-1(a) filed by Paysafe Limited. (Sarratt, William) (Filed on 2/18/2021) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

#13

(#13) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 3/3/2021. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2021) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by William David Sarratt on Behalf of Defendant (Sarratt, William) (Filed on 2/12/2021) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

#11

(#11) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kamal Bitmouni.. (Berry, Michael) (Filed on 2/5/2021) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Kamal Bitmouni. Paysafe Limited served on 2/4/21, answer due 2/25/21. (Berry, Michael) (Filed on 2/5/2021) Modified on 2/5/2021 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/05/2021)

#9

(#9) ORDER, signed 2/4/2021 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Maxey. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2021) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

#8

(#8) Order, signed 2/4/2021, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Yanchunis.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2021) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

7 #1

Exhibit

#7

(#7) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15528440.) filed by Kamal Bitmouni. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Maxey, Ryan) (Filed on 2/3/2021) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

6 #1

Exhibit

#6

(#6) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15528022.) filed by Kamal Bitmouni. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Yanchunis, John) (Filed on 2/3/2021) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Paysafe Limited. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2021) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/23/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/30/2021 02:00 PM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2021) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Order. Signed 3/23/2021 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #17 Stipulation Extending Time for Defendant's Time to Respond.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2021) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Defendant's Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Paysafe Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Sarratt)(Sarratt, William) (Filed on 3/22/2021) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Paysafe Limited.. (Sarratt, William) (Filed on 3/3/2021) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER GRANTING re #14 Stipulation to Extend Time filed by Paysafe Limited. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/19/2021. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2021) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION Extending Defendant's Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond Pursuant to Civil L.R. 6-1(a) filed by Paysafe Limited. (Sarratt, William) (Filed on 2/18/2021) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 3/3/2021. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2021) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by William David Sarratt on Behalf of Defendant (Sarratt, William) (Filed on 2/12/2021) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. The correct event is SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #10 Certificate of Service filed by Kamal Bitmouni. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2021) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kamal Bitmouni.. (Berry, Michael) (Filed on 2/5/2021) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Kamal Bitmouni. Paysafe Limited served on 2/4/21, answer due 2/25/21. (Berry, Michael) (Filed on 2/5/2021) Modified on 2/5/2021 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER, signed 2/4/2021 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Maxey. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2021) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Order, signed 2/4/2021, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Yanchunis.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2021) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15528440.) filed by Kamal Bitmouni. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Maxey, Ryan) (Filed on 2/3/2021) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15528022.) filed by Kamal Bitmouni. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Yanchunis, John) (Filed on 2/3/2021) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Paysafe Limited. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2021) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/23/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/30/2021 02:00 PM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2021) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/10/2021. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2021) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Berry, Michael) (Filed on 1/27/2021) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Paysafe Limited ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15497614.). Filed byKamal Bitmouni. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Errata 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Michael) (Filed on 1/27/2021) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Paysafe is a litigant