This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/16/2022 at 08:05:00 (UTC).

Bissey v. AG-Pro Companies, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/15/2022 Bissey filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against AG-Pro Companies, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gregory A. Presnell and Philip R. Lammens. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-00092

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gregory A. Presnell

Referral Judge

Philip R. Lammens

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff

DALTON BISSEY

Counter Claimant and Defendant

AG-PRO COMPANIES, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew W. Birk

Attorney at Matthew Birk, Esq., Law Office

309 Ne 1St St.

Gainesville, FL 32601

Counter Claimant and Defendant Attorney

Jeffrey E. Mandel

Attorney at Fisher & Phillips, LLP

Suite 1100, 200 S Orange Ave

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against AG-PRO COMPANIES, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-19239978) filed by DALTON BISSEY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Birk, Matthew) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Summons

#3

(#3) Initial ORDER re Case Management and Deadlines Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 2/17/2022. (HAI) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS issued as to AG-PRO COMPANIES, LLC. (LAB) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Order by Dalton Bissey. (Birk, Matthew) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Dalton Bissey. Related case(s): No. (Birk, Matthew) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#7

(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by AG-Pro Companies, LLC. (Mandel, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#9

(#9) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER to Defendant. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 4/5/2022. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/22/2022. (LAM) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

#10

(#10) FLSA SCHEDULING ORDER: By 04/12/2022 parties shall serve copies upon each other as stated in the order; By 05/31/2022 parties are to meet and confer; Answer to court interrogatories due by 5/3/2022 Settlement Report due by 6/20/2022. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/22/2022. (HAI) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Interested persons order by AG-Pro Companies, LLC. (Mandel, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

#12

(#12) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Dalton Bissey by AG-Pro Companies, LLC.(Mandel, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Dalton Bissey by AG-Pro Companies, LLC.(Mandel, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Interested persons order by AG-Pro Companies, LLC. (Mandel, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) FLSA SCHEDULING ORDER: By 04/12/2022 parties shall serve copies upon each other as stated in the order; By 05/31/2022 parties are to meet and confer; Answer to court interrogatories due by 5/3/2022 Settlement Report due by 6/20/2022. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/22/2022. (HAI) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER to Defendant. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 4/5/2022. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/22/2022. (LAM) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Motion for extension of time to respond to Complaint. AG-Pro Companies, LLC answer or response due 4/4/2022. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/22/2022. (LAM) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by AG-Pro Companies, LLC. (Mandel, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Dalton Bissey. Related case(s): No. (Birk, Matthew) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Order by Dalton Bissey. (Birk, Matthew) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS issued as to AG-PRO COMPANIES, LLC. (LAB) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Initial ORDER re Case Management and Deadlines Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 2/17/2022. (HAI) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Gregory A. Presnell and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 5:22-cv-0092-GAP-PRL. (SJB) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against AG-PRO COMPANIES, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-19239978) filed by DALTON BISSEY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Birk, Matthew) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less