Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 03/30/2020 at 12:01:22 (UTC).

Bishop v. United States

Case Summary

On 01/29/2020 Bishop filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against United States. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are William P. Johnson and Gregory J. Fouratt. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00087

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Mexico District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William P. Johnson

Referral Judge

Gregory J. Fouratt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LeMyron Bishop

Carlsbad, NM 88220

Defendant

United States

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) JUDGMENT by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson in favor of Defendant against Plaintiff. (mag) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

#12

(#12) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson DISMISSING #1 Complaint. (mag) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

#11

(#11) NOTICE re: Release Order by LeMyron Bishop (meq) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE by LeMyron Bishop (meq) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by LeMyron Bishop. (meq) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

#8

(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against United States., filed by LeMyron Bishop. (meq) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

#7

(#7) Letter by LeMyron Bishop (meq) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE by LeMyron Bishop (meq) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE by LeMyron Bishop (meq) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE by LeMyron Bishop (meq) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE by LeMyron Bishop (meq) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

#2

(#2) ORDER TO CURE DEFICIENCIES by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. (mm) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

1 #1

Affidavit Indigency

#1

(#1) 1983 PRISONER'S CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against United States, filed by LeMyron Bishop. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Indigency)(jg) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) JUDGMENT by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson in favor of Defendant against Plaintiff. (mag) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson DISMISSING #1 Complaint. (mag) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE re: Release Order by LeMyron Bishop (meq) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE by LeMyron Bishop (meq) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by LeMyron Bishop. (meq) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against United States., filed by LeMyron Bishop. (meq) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Letter by LeMyron Bishop (meq) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE by LeMyron Bishop (meq) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE by LeMyron Bishop (meq) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE by LeMyron Bishop (meq) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by LeMyron Bishop (meq) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER TO CURE DEFICIENCIES by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. (mm) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketChief United States District Judge William P. Johnson and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt assigned. (jg) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) 1983 PRISONER'S CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against United States, filed by LeMyron Bishop. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Indigency)(jg) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant