This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:47:55 (UTC).

Bishop v. Bureau of Prisons

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Bishop filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Bureau of Prisons. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John R. Adams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-01113

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John R. Adams

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Andrew Brian Bishop

Youngstown, OH 44507

Respondent

Bureau of Prisons

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Christian J. Grostic

Attorney at Office of the Federal Public Defender - Cleveland

750 Skylight Office Tower, 1660 West Second Street

Cleveland, OH 44113

Jeffrey B. Lazarus

Attorney at Office of the Federal Public Defender - Cleveland

750 Skylight Office Tower, 1660 West Second Street

Cleveland, OH 44113

Respondent Attorney

Edward F. Feran

Attorney at Office of the U.S. Attorney - Cleveland

801 Superior Avenue, W

Cleveland, OH 44113

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Attorney Appearance by Edward F. Feran filed by on behalf of Bureau of Prisons. (Feran, Edward) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

#3

(#3) Order directing the United States Attorney to respond to the motion no later than 14 days from receipt of this Order. Judge John R. Adams on 5/23/19. (K,C) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#5

(#5) Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim for Writ of Habeas Corpus under 18 U.S.C. 2241 and Opposition to Habeas Petition filed by Respondent Bureau of Prisons. Related document(s) #1 , #2 . (Feran, Edward) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

#1

(#1) Petition under 28 USC 2241 for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a person in federal custody pursuant to First Step Act of 2018. Filing fee paid, $5.00. Receipt # 14660114308. Filed by Andrew Brian Bishop. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Y,A) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#2

(#2) Memorandum in Support of Motion for Good-Time Credits Under 28 U.S.C. 2241, filed by Andrew Brian Bishop. Related document(s) #1 . (Lazarus, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim for Writ of Habeas Corpus under 18 U.S.C. 2241 and Opposition to Habeas Petition filed by Respondent Bureau of Prisons. Related document(s) #1 , #2 . (Feran, Edward) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Attorney Appearance by Edward F. Feran filed by on behalf of Bureau of Prisons. (Feran, Edward) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) and #3 Order mailed to Christopher LaRose, Warden of N.E.O.C.C, 2240 Hubbard Rd., Youngstown, OH 44505, the US Attorney for the NDOH, Carl B. Stokes US Courthouse, 801 W. Superior Ave., Cleveland, OH 44113-1852 and to the US Attorney General, Department of Justice, 950 Pennsylvania Ave. NW, Washington, DC 20530 on 5/24/19. (M,TL) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order directing the United States Attorney to respond to the motion no later than 14 days from receipt of this Order. Judge John R. Adams on 5/23/19. (K,C) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Memorandum in Support of Motion for Good-Time Credits Under 28 U.S.C. 2241, filed by Andrew Brian Bishop. Related document(s) #1 . (Lazarus, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (Y,A) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • Judge John R. Adams assigned to case, (Y,A) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Petition under 28 USC 2241 for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a person in federal custody pursuant to First Step Act of 2018. Filing fee paid, $5.00. Receipt # 14660114308. Filed by Andrew Brian Bishop. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Y,A) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.