This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/13/2021 at 14:56:06 (UTC).

Bishop of Charleston et al v. Adams et al

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 Bishop of Charleston filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against Adams. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Bruce Howe Hendricks. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01093

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Bruce Howe Hendricks

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Bishop of Charleston a Corporation Sole doing business as The Roman Catholic Dioces of Charleston

South Carolina Independent Colleges and Universities Inc

Defendants

Marcia Adams

Henry McMaster

Brian Gaines

Amicus Curiae

South Carolina Association of Christian Schools for Excellence, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard S Dukes, Jr

Attorney at Turner Padget Graham and Laney

Po Box 22129, 40 Calhoun Street, Suite 200

Charleston, SC 29413-2129

Daniel Robert Suhr

Attorney at Liberty Justice Center

209 S Lasalle Street, Suite 1690

Chicago, IL 60604

Jeffrey Daniel Jennings

Attorney at Liberty Justice Center

208 S Lasalle Street, Suite 1690

Chicago, IL 60604

Defendant Attorneys

Eugene H Matthews

Attorney at Richardson Plowden and Robinson (Cola)

Po Drawer 7788

Columbia, SC 29202

Anita Smith Fair

Attorney at SC Governors Office

1100 Gervais Street

Columbia, SC 29201

William Grayson Lambert

Attorney at Office of the Governor

1100 Gervais Street

Columbia, SC 29201

Vordman Carlisle Traywick

Attorney at Robinson Gray Stepp and Laffitte LLC

1310 Gadsden Street

Columbia, SC 29201

Thomas Ashley Limehouse, Jr

Attorney at Office of the Governor

1100 Gervais Street

Columbia, SC 29201

Christopher Ernest Mills

Attorney at Spero Law LLC

1050 Johnnie Dodds Blvd, #83

Mt Pleasant, SC 29465

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

Adam Miles Crain

Attorney at Sweeny Wingate and Barrow PA

1515 Lady Street, Po Box 12129

Columbia, SC 29201

Richard Edward McLawhorn, Jr

Attorney at Sweeny Wingate and Barrow

115 Cargill Way, Suite B

Hartsville, SC 29550

Brandon Gottschall

Attorney at Sweeny Wingate and Barrow PA

1515 Lady Street, Po Box 12129

Columbia, SC 29201

 

Court Documents

39 #2

Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting PHV - Jeffrey Daniel Jennings

39 #1

Affidavit Application / Affidavit for PHV - Jeffrey Daniel Jennings

#39

#38

#37

#36

#26

#12

#9

7 #2

Supporting Documents WI SC Certificate of Good Standing

7 #1

Supporting Documents Application for PHV

#7

6 #2

Affidavit Declaration of William Ryan

6 #1

Memo in Support of Plaintffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction

#4

#3

#2

#1

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) TEXT ORDER granting #39 Motion by Jeffrey Daniel Jennings to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 6/10/2021.(jbry, ) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey Daniel Jennings ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-9894737) by Bishop of Charleston, South Carolina Independent Colleges and Universities Inc. Response to Motion due by 6/23/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Application / Affidavit for PHV - Jeffrey Daniel Jennings, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting PHV - Jeffrey Daniel Jennings)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Dukes, Richard) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) MEDIATION ORDER: Mediation Due by 11/19/2021. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 5/26/2021. (vdru, ) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 6/16/2021, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 6/30/2021, Rule 26 Report due by 6/30/2021, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 7/21/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 8/20/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 9/20/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 9/20/2021, Discovery due by 11/19/2021, Motions due by 12/20/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 3/21/2022, Mediation Due by 11/19/2021. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 5/26/2021. (vdru, ) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) ANSWER to #26 Amended Complaint, by Henry McMaster.(Mills, Christopher) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ORDER denying #6 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Bishop of Charleston, South Carolina Independent Colleges and Universities Inc. Details set forth in Order. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 5/11/2021. (vdru, ) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER Henry McMaster answer due 5/25/2021. (Mills, Christopher) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Marcia Adams, Brian Gaines. (Matthews, Eugene). Attachment from entry #31 removed and filed separately as a main document by clerk. (vdru, ) Modified on 5/11/2021 to edit text. (vdru, ). (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) TEXT ORDER denying Plaintiffs Bishop of Charleston and South Carolina Independent Colleges and Universities Inc.'s #6 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. Written order to follow. IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of The Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 5/10/2021.(vdru, ) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ANSWER to #26 Amended Complaint, by Marcia Adams, Brian Gaines. (Matthews, Eugene) Modified on 5/11/2021 to remove attachment and file separately as entry #35. (vdru, ). (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by South Carolina Independent Colleges and Universities Inc, Bishop of Charleston. Service of Complaint All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Service of Complaint on Marcia Adams, #2 Affidavit Service of Complaint on Brian Gaines, #3 Affidavit Service of Complaint on Henry McMaster, #4 Affidavit Service of Complaint on SC Atty General Alan Wilson)(Dukes, Richard) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Eugene H Matthews on behalf of Marcia Adams, Brian Gaines (Matthews, Eugene) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #6 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction: VIDEO Motion Hearing set for 5/3/2021 10:00 AM before Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks. NOTE: The Court will send video conferencing instructions prior to the hearing. (ssam, ) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER re #6 Request to Set an expedited Briefing and Argument Schedule filed by Bishop of Charleston, South Carolina Independent Colleges and Universities Inc. The Defendants are to submit briefing on Plaintiffs Motion by Wednesday April 21, 2021. The Plaintiffs are to file any reply brief by Friday April 23, 2021. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 4/19/2021. (vdru, ) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel R. Suhr ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-9780008) by Bishop of Charleston, South Carolina Independent Colleges and Universities Inc. Response to Motion due by 4/30/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Application for PHV, #2 Supporting Documents WI SC Certificate of Good Standing)No proposed order.(Dukes, Richard) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/20/2021) (vdru, ). Modified on 4/20/2021 to replace attachment 1 with corrected document as provided by the filer. (vdru, ). (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Motion to Set a Briefing and Argument Schedule by Bishop of Charleston, South Carolina Independent Colleges and Universities Inc. Response to Motion due by 4/30/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support of Plaintffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Affidavit Declaration of William Ryan, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Jeff Perez, #4 Exhibit Perez Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit Perez Exhibit B)No proposed order.(Dukes, Richard) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (vdru, ) Modified on 4/16/2021 to correct filing date. (vdru, ). (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by South Carolina Independent Colleges and Universities Inc.(vdru, ) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Bishop of Charleston.(vdru, ) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9772957.)., filed by South Carolina Independent Colleges and Universities Inc, Bishop of Charleston. Service due by 7/13/2021.(vdru, ) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bishop of Charleston, The is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard Edward McLawhorn, Jr

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brandon Gottschall

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adam Miles Crain