This case was last updated from PACER on 07/05/2019 at 09:09:33 (UTC).

Bishop et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al

Case Summary

On 04/22/2019 Bishop filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Purdue Pharma L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are J. Phil Gilbert and Gilbert C. Sison. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00442

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Phil Gilbert

Referral Judge

Gilbert C. Sison

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Dean Colman

Joel Bishop

Defendants

McKesson Corporation

Endo Health Solutions, Inc.

Purdue Pharma L.P.

Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc..

Purdue Pharma, Inc.

Actavis PLC

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Endo International PLC

Actavis LLC

Allergan PLC

Cardinal Health, Inc.

Actavis Pharma, Inc.

Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.

Watson Laboratories, Inc.

Rhodes Pharmaceuticals

Walgreen Co.

Cephalon, Inc.

15 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joshua R. Evans

Attorney at Unsell Law Firm, P.C.

69 S. 9Th Street

East Alton, IL 62024

Defendant Attorneys

Troy A. Bozarth

Attorney at HeplerBroom LLC - Edwardsville

130 North Main Street, P.O. Box 510

Edwardsville, IL 62025

Erik W. Snapp

Attorney at Dechert LLP

35 W. Wacker Drive, Suite 3400

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Transferred case opened in Northern District of Ohio as case 19-op-45330, filed 5/17/19. (rah) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#8

(#8) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-91) TRANSFERRING CASE TO OTHER DISTRICT: Case transferred to Northern District of Ohio in regard to MDL 2804/In Re: National Prescription Opiate Litigation.(rah) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

#7

(#7) Preliminary Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-91) as assigned by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation.(rah) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Erik W. Snapp on behalf of Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc. (Snapp, Erik) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel recused. Case reassigned to Judge J. Phil Gilbert for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 4/24/2019. (drb) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

4 #1

Consent Brochure

#4

(#4) Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel and Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-442-NJR-GCS. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(lmb) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc.. (Bozarth, Troy) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Troy A. Bozarth on behalf of Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc. (Bozarth, Troy) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Madison County Circuit Court, case number 19-L-444 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3863505), filed by Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bozarth, Troy) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Transferred case opened in Northern District of Ohio as case 19-op-45330, filed 5/17/19. (rah) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • (#9) Case electronically transferred to Northern District of Ohio (rah) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-91) TRANSFERRING CASE TO OTHER DISTRICT: Case transferred to Northern District of Ohio in regard to MDL 2804/In Re: National Prescription Opiate Litigation.(rah) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Preliminary Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-91) as assigned by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation.(rah) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Erik W. Snapp on behalf of Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc. (Snapp, Erik) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel recused. Case reassigned to Judge J. Phil Gilbert for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 4/24/2019. (drb) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel and Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-442-NJR-GCS. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(lmb) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc.. (Bozarth, Troy) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Troy A. Bozarth on behalf of Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc. (Bozarth, Troy) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Madison County Circuit Court, case number 19-L-444 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3863505), filed by Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bozarth, Troy) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.