Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/19/2021 at 12:24:09 (UTC).

Bishop Display Tech LLC v. SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. et al

Case Summary

On April 20, 2021, Plaintiff Bishop Display Tech LLC (“Bishop” or “Plaintiff”), represented by Jonathan Hart Rastegar of Nelson Bumgardner Albritton PC, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (“SEC”), Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (“SEA”), and Samsung Display Co., Ltd. (“SDC”) (collectively, “Samsung” or “Defendants”), seeking compensatory damages and royalty for alleged infringement of one or more claims of Patents owned by the Plaintiff. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the Western District of Texas with Judge Rodney Gilstrap presiding.

 

The Plaintiff filed this action against Defendant’s alleged infringement of U.S. Patent No. 6,819,377 (the “377 patent”), U.S. Patent No. 6,822,706 (the “’706 patent”), U.S. Patent No. 7,583,347 (the “’347 patent”), U.S. Patent No. 7,995,047 (the “’047 patent”), U.S. Patent No. 8,093,830 (the “’830 patent”), and U.S. Patent No. 8,016,449 (the “’449 patent”) (collectively, the “Asserted Patents”), owned by the Plaintiff with all substantial rights to the patent including the exclusive right to enforce, sue, and recover damages for past infringement.

 

In the complaint, Bishop alleged that “Defendants, either by themselves (individually and/or in concert) and/or via an agent, infringed literally, and/or under the Doctrine of Equivalents, infringed at patent by, among other things, making, using, selling, offering for sale, or importing products, such as televisions. Further, SEC is vicariously liable for this infringing conduct of SDC and/or SEA, as well as other related Samsung entities, and affiliates, (under both the alter ego and agency theories) because, as an example, SEC, SDC, and SEA are essentially the same company, and SEC has the right and ability to control SDC’s and SEA’s infringing acts and receives a direct financial benefit from SEA’s and SDC’s infringement.”

 

Bishop further alleged that “Defendants have also indirectly infringed one or more claims of the patent by inducing infringement, including, at least, the importation and sale of products that, as set forth above, infringe the patent. For example, Defendants induce and have induced the importation and sale of products accused of infringing the ʼ706 patent (e.g., QN55) by retailers. Further, SEC and/or SDC also induce and have induced the importation and sale of products accused of infringing the ʼ706 patent (e.g., QN55) by SEA.”

 

There are six counts for relief laid down by the Plaintiff, one for the alleged direct infringement of one or more claims of each of the Asserted Patents pursuant to 35 U.S.C. §271(a) and indirect infringement pursuant to 35 U.S.C. §271(b), wherein the Plaintiff has claimed that despite having knowledge of the Asserted Patents and knowledge that it is directly and/or indirectly infringing one or more claims of the Asserted Patents, Defendants have nevertheless continued its infringing conduct and disregarded an objectively high likelihood of infringement.

 

In the prayer for relief, the Plaintiff has requested the court to adjudge that the claims of Asserted patents have been infringed, and award compensatory damages, royalty and other costs, interests and any other equitable relief as the Court may deem fit. 

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents. 



Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00139

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bishop Display Tech LLC

Defendants

Samsung Display Co., Ltd.

SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC.

SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jonathan Hart Rastegar

Attorney at Nelson Bumgardner Albritton PC - Fort Worth

3131 W 7Th Street, Suite 300

Fort Worth, TX 76107

Justin Bryce Kimble

Attorney at Nelson Bumgardner Albritton PC - Fort Worth

3131 W 7Th Street, Suite 300

Fort Worth, TX 76107

Thomas William Kennedy, Jr

Attorney at Nelson Bumgardner Albritton PC - Fort Worth

3131 W 7Th Street, Suite 300

Fort Worth, TX 76107

Patrick Joseph Conroy

Attorney at Nelson Bumgardner Albritton PC - Fort Worth

3131 W 7Th Street, Suite 300

Fort Worth, TX 76107

Ryan P Griffin

Attorney at Nelson Bumgardner Albritton PC - Fort Worth

3131 W 7Th Street, Suite 300

Fort Worth, TX 76107

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) ORDER granting #16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead in Response to Plaintiff's Complaint and Waiver. SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC. answer due 9/2/2021; SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. answer due 9/2/2021; Samsung Display Co., Ltd. answer due 9/2/2021.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/8/2021. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

16 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#16

(#16) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead in Response to Plaintiff's Complaint and Waiver of Foreign Service Requirement by Bishop Display Tech LLC. (Conroy, Patrick) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/7/2021: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (nkl, ). (Entered: 06/04/2021)

#15

(#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bishop Display Tech LLC. SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. served on 5/14/2021, answer due 6/4/2021. (Rastegar, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

#14

(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bishop Display Tech LLC. SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC. served on 5/14/2021, answer due 6/4/2021. (Rastegar, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

#13

(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bishop Display Tech LLC. Samsung Display Co., Ltd. served on 5/14/2021, answer due 6/4/2021. (Rastegar, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

12 #2

Summons(es)

12 #1

Summons(es)

#12

(#12) SUMMONS Issued as to SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC., SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD., Samsung Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es))(ch, ) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin Bryce Kimble on behalf of Bishop Display Tech LLC (Kimble, Justin) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

#7

(#7) ***FILED IN ERROR***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Hart Rastegar on behalf of Bishop Display Tech LLC (Rastegar, Jonathan) Modified on 4/21/2021 (ch, ). (Entered: 04/20/2021)

#6

(#6) ***FILED IN ERROR***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Hart Rastegar on behalf of Bishop Display Tech LLC (Rastegar, Jonathan) Modified on 4/21/2021 (ch, ). (Entered: 04/20/2021)

#5

(#5) ***FILED IN ERROR***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Hart Rastegar on behalf of Bishop Display Tech LLC (Rastegar, Jonathan) Modified on 4/21/2021 (ch, ). (Entered: 04/20/2021)

#4

(#4) ***FILED IN ERROR***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Hart Rastegar on behalf of Bishop Display Tech LLC (Rastegar, Jonathan) Modified on 4/21/2021 (ch, ). (Entered: 04/20/2021)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bishop Display Tech LLC (Rastegar, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rastegar, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8368307.), filed by Bishop Display Tech LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rastegar, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

12 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting #16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead in Response to Plaintiff's Complaint and Waiver. SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC. answer due 9/2/2021; SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. answer due 9/2/2021; Samsung Display Co., Ltd. answer due 9/2/2021.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/8/2021. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead in Response to Plaintiff's Complaint and Waiver of Foreign Service Requirement by Bishop Display Tech LLC. (Conroy, Patrick) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/7/2021: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (nkl, ). (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bishop Display Tech LLC. SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. served on 5/14/2021, answer due 6/4/2021. (Rastegar, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bishop Display Tech LLC. SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC. served on 5/14/2021, answer due 6/4/2021. (Rastegar, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bishop Display Tech LLC. Samsung Display Co., Ltd. served on 5/14/2021, answer due 6/4/2021. (Rastegar, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS Issued as to SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC., SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD., Samsung Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es))(ch, ) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin Bryce Kimble on behalf of Bishop Display Tech LLC (Kimble, Justin) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan P Griffin on behalf of Bishop Display Tech LLC (Griffin, Ryan) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas William Kennedy, Jr on behalf of Bishop Display Tech LLC (Kennedy, Thomas) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick Joseph Conroy on behalf of Bishop Display Tech LLC (Conroy, Patrick) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2021
  • Docket***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 4, Notice of Appearance for Ryan Griffin. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, ) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ***FILED IN ERROR***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Hart Rastegar on behalf of Bishop Display Tech LLC (Rastegar, Jonathan) Modified on 4/21/2021 (ch, ). (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ***FILED IN ERROR***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Hart Rastegar on behalf of Bishop Display Tech LLC (Rastegar, Jonathan) Modified on 4/21/2021 (ch, ). (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ***FILED IN ERROR***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Hart Rastegar on behalf of Bishop Display Tech LLC (Rastegar, Jonathan) Modified on 4/21/2021 (ch, ). (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ***FILED IN ERROR***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Hart Rastegar on behalf of Bishop Display Tech LLC (Rastegar, Jonathan) Modified on 4/21/2021 (ch, ). (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bishop Display Tech LLC (Rastegar, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rastegar, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8368307.), filed by Bishop Display Tech LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rastegar, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Samsung Display Co., Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where Samsung Electronics America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Justin Bryce Kimble

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan P Griffin