Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/18/2021 at 14:23:21 (UTC).

Bishop Display Tech LLC v. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 04/19/2021 Bishop Display Tech LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Samsung Electronics Co , Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00136

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bishop Display Tech LLC

Claimant

Bishop Display LLC

Defendants

Samsung Display Co., Ltd.

SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC.

SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Claimant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Jonathan Hart Rastegar

Attorney at Nelson Bumgardner Albritton PC - Fort Worth

3131 W 7Th Street, Suite 300

Fort Worth, TX 76107

Justin Bryce Kimble

Attorney at Nelson Bumgardner Albritton PC - Fort Worth

3131 W 7Th Street, Suite 300

Fort Worth, TX 76107

Thomas William Kennedy, Jr

Attorney at Nelson Bumgardner Albritton PC - Fort Worth

3131 W 7Th Street, Suite 300

Fort Worth, TX 76107

Patrick Joseph Conroy

Attorney at Nelson Bumgardner Albritton PC - Fort Worth

3131 W 7Th Street, Suite 300

Fort Worth, TX 76107

Ryan P Griffin

Attorney at Nelson Bumgardner Albritton PC - Fort Worth

3131 W 7Th Street, Suite 300

Fort Worth, TX 76107

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) ORDER granting #18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead in Response to Plaintiff's Complaint and Waiver of Foreign Service Requirement. SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC. answer due 9/2/2021; SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. answer due 9/2/2021; Samsung Display Co., Ltd. answer due 9/2/2021.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/8/2021. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

18 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#18

(#18) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead in Response to Plaintiff's Complaint and Waiver of Foreign Service Requirement by Bishop Display Tech LLC. (Conroy, Patrick) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/7/2021: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (nkl, ). (Entered: 06/04/2021)

#17

(#17) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bishop Display Tech LLC. SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. served on 5/14/2021, answer due 6/4/2021. (Rastegar, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

#16

(#16) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bishop Display Tech LLC. Samsung Display Co., Ltd. served on 5/14/2021, answer due 6/4/2021. (Rastegar, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

#15

(#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bishop Display Tech LLC. SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC. served on 5/14/2021, answer due 6/4/2021. (Rastegar, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

#14

(#14) FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bishop Display Tech LLC. Samsung Display Co., Ltd. served on 5/4/2021, answer due 5/25/2021. (Rastegar, Jonathan) Modified on 5/19/2021 (nkl, ). (Entered: 05/19/2021)

13 #2

Summons(es)

#13

(#13) SUMMONS Issued as to SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC., SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD., Samsung Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es))(ch, ) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

#8

(#8) FILED IN ERROR NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Hart Rastegar on behalf of Bishop Display Tech LLC (Rastegar, Jonathan) Modified on 4/21/2021 (nkl, ). (Entered: 04/20/2021)

#7

(#7) FILED IN ERROR NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Hart Rastegar on behalf of Bishop Display Tech LLC (Rastegar, Jonathan) Modified on 4/21/2021 (nkl, ). (Entered: 04/20/2021)

#6

(#6) FILED IN ERROR NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Hart Rastegar on behalf of Bishop Display Tech LLC (Rastegar, Jonathan) Modified on 4/21/2021 (nkl, ). (Entered: 04/20/2021)

#5

(#5) FILED IN ERROR NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Hart Rastegar on behalf of Bishop Display Tech LLC (Rastegar, Jonathan) Modified on 4/21/2021 (nkl, ). (Entered: 04/20/2021)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bishop Display LLC (Rastegar, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rastegar, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

#2

(#2) AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against All Defendants, filed by Bishop Display LLC.(Rastegar, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC., SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD., Samsung Display Co., Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8364714.), filed by Bishop Display LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rastegar, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER granting #18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead in Response to Plaintiff's Complaint and Waiver of Foreign Service Requirement. SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC. answer due 9/2/2021; SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. answer due 9/2/2021; Samsung Display Co., Ltd. answer due 9/2/2021.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/8/2021. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead in Response to Plaintiff's Complaint and Waiver of Foreign Service Requirement by Bishop Display Tech LLC. (Conroy, Patrick) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/7/2021: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (nkl, ). (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bishop Display Tech LLC. SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. served on 5/14/2021, answer due 6/4/2021. (Rastegar, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • Docket***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. Document # 14, SUMMONS Returned Executed. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, ) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bishop Display Tech LLC. Samsung Display Co., Ltd. served on 5/14/2021, answer due 6/4/2021. (Rastegar, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bishop Display Tech LLC. SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC. served on 5/14/2021, answer due 6/4/2021. (Rastegar, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bishop Display Tech LLC. Samsung Display Co., Ltd. served on 5/4/2021, answer due 5/25/2021. (Rastegar, Jonathan) Modified on 5/19/2021 (nkl, ). (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUMMONS Issued as to SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC., SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD., Samsung Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es))(ch, ) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin Bryce Kimble on behalf of Bishop Display Tech LLC (Kimble, Justin) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan P Griffin on behalf of Bishop Display Tech LLC (Griffin, Ryan) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) FILED IN ERROR NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Hart Rastegar on behalf of Bishop Display Tech LLC (Rastegar, Jonathan) Modified on 4/21/2021 (nkl, ). (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) FILED IN ERROR NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Hart Rastegar on behalf of Bishop Display Tech LLC (Rastegar, Jonathan) Modified on 4/21/2021 (nkl, ). (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) FILED IN ERROR NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Hart Rastegar on behalf of Bishop Display Tech LLC (Rastegar, Jonathan) Modified on 4/21/2021 (nkl, ). (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) FILED IN ERROR NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Hart Rastegar on behalf of Bishop Display Tech LLC (Rastegar, Jonathan) Modified on 4/21/2021 (nkl, ). (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bishop Display LLC (Rastegar, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rastegar, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against All Defendants, filed by Bishop Display LLC.(Rastegar, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, ) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, ) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC., SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD., Samsung Display Co., Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8364714.), filed by Bishop Display LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rastegar, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Samsung Display Co., Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where Samsung Electronics America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Justin Bryce Kimble

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan P Griffin