This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/22/2021 at 07:18:14 (UTC).

Birdsill v. Smith & Nephew Inc

Case Summary

On 06/23/2021 Birdsill filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Smith Nephew Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jodi W. Dishman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00644

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jodi W. Dishman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lawrence Birdsill

Defendant

Smith & Nephew Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Patricia A Podolec

Attorney at Patricia A Podolec Attorney at Law

10601 S Western, Suite 119

Oklahoma City, OK 73170

Defendant Attorneys

Eva C Madison

Attorney at Littler Mendelson - FAYETTEVILLE

217 E Dickson St, Suite 204

Fayetteville, AR 72701

Jessica L. Craft

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

1301 Mckinney Street, Suite 1400

Houston, TX 77010

 

Court Documents

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

8 #1

Exhibit Ex. 1 - Oklahoma v. Birdsill - OSCN Case Details Docket Sheet

8 #8

Main Document

7 #1

Exhibit Ex. A - Oklahoma v. Birdsill - OSCN Case Details Docket Sheet

7 #7

Main Document

#6

#5

#4

#3

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to Dismiss 12(B)(6) Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and Brief in Support by Smith & Nephew Inc. (Craft, Jessica) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER denying as moot #8 Motion to Dismiss, without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 08/03/2021. (nv) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs.(Podolec, Patricia) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ENTRY of Appearance by Eva C Madison on behalf of Smith & Nephew Inc (Madison, Eva) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ENTRY of Appearance by Jessica L. Craft on behalf of Smith & Nephew Inc (Craft, Jessica) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ENTER ORDER. The Status/Scheduling Conference set for July 29, 2021, at 1:00 p.m. and joint status report and discovery plan deadline of July 21, 2021, as set forth in [Doc. No. 3], are hereby STRICKEN to be reset at a later date. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 07/01/2021. (nv) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Relief from Local Counsel Requirement. Counsel shall promptly file an entry of appearance consistent with LCvR83.4. Signed by Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 07/01/2021. (nv) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER re #8 MOTION to Dismiss 12(B)(6) and Brief in Support filed by Smith & Nephew Inc. Without expressing any view on the merits of the Motion, the Court affords Plaintiff an opportunity to cure the purported pleading defects by filing an amended complaint in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(1)(B). See Order for all details. Signed by Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 07/01/2021. (nv) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Dismiss 12(B)(6) and Brief in Support by Smith & Nephew Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Oklahoma v. Birdsill - OSCN Case Details Docket Sheet)(Craft, Jessica) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE from the Court #7 MOTION to Dismiss 12(B)(6) and Brief in Support STRICKEN due to counsel's inadvertent failure to comply with this Court's CM-ECF Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(A)(4)(a). Specifically the use of alphabetical exhibit(s) is not allowed. Counsel to refile using numerical exhibit(s) only. (nv) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STRICKEN MOTION to Dismiss 12(B)(6) and Brief in Support by Smith & Nephew Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Oklahoma v. Birdsill - OSCN Case Details Docket Sheet)(Craft, Jessica) Modified on 6/30/2021 (nv). (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Order (Relief from Local Counsel Requirement) by Smith & Nephew Inc. (Madison, Eva) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Patricia A Podolec on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Podolec, Patricia) (Entered: 06/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENTER ORDER. The Local Rules of this Court require nonresident attorneys who do not maintain an office in Oklahoma to associate with local counsel. LCvR83.3(a). Accordingly, counsel for Defendant is directed to comply with this rule or move the Court for relief under LCvR83.3(c) no later than July 8, 2021. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 06/24/2021. (nv) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL SCHEDULING/STATUS DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 7/29/2021 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 502 before the Honorable Jodi W. Dishman. Status Report due by 7/21/2021. (nv) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Smith & Nephew Inc . (Craft, Jessica) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE 21-644 Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3708209. (Craft, Jessica) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oklahoma County District Court, case number CJ-2021-1972 filed by Smith & Nephew Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - EOA of Counsel, #3 Exhibit 3 - Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit 4 - Notice to State Court of Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(knt) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Smith & Nephew Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patricia A Podolec