Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/11/2020 at 14:57:31 (UTC).

Bird v. Ocwen Federal Bank, FSB et al

Case Summary

On 02/15/2019 Bird filed an Other lawsuit against Ocwen Federal Bank, FSB. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is George Levi Russell, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00464

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George Levi Russell, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Paul Charles Bird, Sr.

Halethorpe, MD 21227

Defendants

Specialized Loan Servicing LLC

Fairbanks Capital Management, Inc.

The Huntington National Bank

Homecomings Financial LLC

Ocwen Federal Bank, FSB

JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.

Residential Funding Company, LLC

Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A.

Homecomings Financial, LLC

J.P. Morgan Chase Bank

Huntington National Bank

Ocwen Federal Bank

Residential Funding Co. LLC

Union Federal Savings Bank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Aaron Drew Neal

Attorney at McNamee Hosea

6411 Ivy Lane, Suite 200

Greenbelt, MD 20770

Michael Evan Blumenfeld

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP

100 S. Charles Street, 12Th Floor

Baltimore, MD 21201

Thomas Troost

Attorney at Stradley, Ronon Stevens & Young LLP

1250 Connecticut Ave. Nw Suite 500

Washington D.C., DC 20036

 

Court Documents

#33

(#33) REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #32 MOTION to Strike #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION for Summary Judgment , RESPONSE in Opposition filed by J.P. Morgan Chase Bank.(Neal, Aaron) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

#32

(#32) MOTION to Strike #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and MOTION for Summary Judgment by Paul Charles Bird, Sr (jnls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

#31

(#31) MARGINAL ORDER Approving #30 LINE OF DISMISSAL with prejudice as to Defendant Fairbanks Capital Management, Inc. filed by Paul Charles Bird, Sr. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 4/1/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

#30

(#30) LINE OF DISMISSAL with prejudice as to Defendant Fairbanks Capital Management, Inc. by Paul Charles Bird, Sr. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

27 #2

Exhibit O

27 #1

Exhibit N

23 #2

Proposed Order

23 #1

Memorandum

#23

(#32) MOTION to Strike #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and MOTION for Summary Judgment by Paul Charles Bird, Sr (jnls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

5 #15

Exhibit M

5 #13

Exhibit K

5 #12

Exhibit J

5 #1

Summons

#3

(#3) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC identifying Corporate Parent Computershare Limited, Corporate Parent Specialized Loan Servicing Holdings LLC for Specialized Loan Servicing LLC.(Neal, Aaron) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

#2

(#2) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation for Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A..(Neal, Aaron) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#5) Supplemental to #1 Notice of Removal filed by Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A., Specialized Loan Servicing LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M)(Neal, Aaron) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

82 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #32 MOTION to Strike #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION for Summary Judgment , RESPONSE in Opposition filed by J.P. Morgan Chase Bank.(Neal, Aaron) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) MOTION to Strike #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and MOTION for Summary Judgment by Paul Charles Bird, Sr (jnls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) MARGINAL ORDER Approving #30 LINE OF DISMISSAL with prejudice as to Defendant Fairbanks Capital Management, Inc. filed by Paul Charles Bird, Sr. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 4/1/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) LINE OF DISMISSAL with prejudice as to Defendant Fairbanks Capital Management, Inc. by Paul Charles Bird, Sr. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) RESPONSE in Opposition re #27 MOTION to Strike #12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Ocwen Federal Bank.(Troost, Thomas) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 MOTION to Strike #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION for Summary Judgment , #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION for Summary Judgment , RESPONSE in Opposition filed by Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A., Specialized Loan Servicing LLC.(Neal, Aaron) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) MOTION to Strike #12 MOTION of Ocwen Federal Bank to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Paul Charles Bird, Sr (Attachments: #1 Exhibit N, #2 Exhibit O) (jnls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) ORDER granting #22 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael Evan Blumenfeld terminated. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 3/12/2019. (c/m 3/13/19 jnls, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 3/13/2019 (jnls, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) Rule 12/56 letter mailed to Paul Charles Bird, Sr (c/m 3/12/19 jnls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) ORDER denying #20 Motion of plaintiff for Judgment by Default construed as a Request for Clerk's Entry of Default. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 3/12/2019. (c/m 3/12/19 jnls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION for Summary Judgment by Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A., Specialized Loan Servicing LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Appendix of Exhibits, #22 Memorandum, #23 Proposed Order)(Neal, Aaron) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Correspondence from Clerk to Plaintiff re: Removal Notification (c/m 2/21/19)(ds3, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Correspondence re: Standing Order Concerning Removal (Neal, Aaron) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 2/19/2019. (ds3, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Supplemental to #1 Notice of Removal filed by Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A., Specialized Loan Servicing LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M)(Neal, Aaron) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) QC NOTICE: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Paul Charles Bird, Sr. was filed incorrectly. *Each state court document must be a separate attachment and must be specifically labeled (i.e. complaint, summons, etc). Please refile each attachment selecting Other Documents > Supplemental and link filing to 1 Notice of Removal. The first labeled attachment can be the main document and the other labeled documents as separate attachments. File any pending motions as separate docket entries. (ds3, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC identifying Corporate Parent Computershare Limited, Corporate Parent Specialized Loan Servicing Holdings LLC for Specialized Loan Servicing LLC.(Neal, Aaron) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation for Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A..(Neal, Aaron) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • Case assigned to Judge George Levi Russell, III. (cags, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7844039), filed by Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association FKA The Bank of New York Trust Company, N.A and Specialized Loan Servicing LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Neal, Aaron) Modified on 2/21/2019 (ds3, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ocwen Federal Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where HOMECOMINGS FINANCIAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where RESIDENTIAL FUNDING COMPANY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Huntington National Bank is a litigant