This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 09:17:12 (UTC).

BioNebicine Corp. et al v. Smiths Medical ASD, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/25/2020 BioNebicine Corp filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Smiths Medical ASD, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Nancy E. Brasel and Becky R. Thorson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-00595

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nancy E. Brasel

Referral Judge

Becky R. Thorson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

BioNebicine Corp.

BN Intellectual Properties, Inc.

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Smiths Medical ASD, Inc. doing business as Smiths Medical

Counter Claimants

Smiths Medical ASD, Inc.

Smiths Medical ASD, Inc. doing business as Smiths Medical

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Michael A. Siem

Attorney at Goldberg Segalla LLP

711 Third Avenue, Ste 1900

New York, NY 10017

Richard Juang

Attorney at Goldberg Segalla LLP

8000 Maryland Ave, Ste 640

St. Louis, MO 63105

Chandran Iyer

Attorney at Goldberg Segalla LLP

711 Third Avenue, Suite 1900

New York, NY 10017

Oded Burger

Attorney at Goldberg Segalla LLP

711 Third Avenue, Suite #1900

New York, NY 10017-4014

Samuel T Lockner

Attorney at Carlson Caspers Vandenburgh Lindquist & Schuman PA

225 S 6Th St Ste 4200

Mpls, MN 55402

Ronald Marc Daignault

Attorney at Goldberg Segalla LLP

711 Third Avenue, Suite 1900

New York, NY 10017

Gary J Speier

Attorney at Carlson Caspers

225 South 6Th St, #4200

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Counter Claimant and Defendant Attorneys

Christopher Robert Kinkade

Attorney at Fox Rothschild LLP

997 Lenox Drive, Ste Building 3

Lawrenceville, NJ 08648

Katherine Marie Geneser

Attorney at Fox Rothschild LLP

222 South Ninth Street, Suite 2000

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Andrew S Hansen

Attorney at Fox Rothschild LLP

222 South Ninth Street, Campbell Mithun Tower, Ste 2000

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Lukas Dustin Jonathon Toft

Attorney at Fox Rothschild LLP

222 South Ninth Street, Campbell Mithun Tower - Suite 2000

Minneapolis, MN 55402-3338

 

Court Documents

#23

#22

#21

20 #1

Consent Form

#20

#19

#18

#16

#15

#9

#8

#7

#6

#4

#2

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit(s) 1

#1

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) REPLY to Counterclaim filed by BN Intellectual Properties, Inc., BioNebicine Corp.. (Speier, Gary) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel T Lockner on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Lockner, Samuel) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Defendant's First Amended ANSWER to Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM S against All Plaintiffs. filed by Smiths Medical ASD, Inc.. (Toft, Lukas) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 5/21/2020 at 01:00 PM via telephone before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 4/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MSK) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 20-cv-595 NEB/BRT. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 4/1/2020. (MMG) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew S Hansen on behalf of Smiths Medical ASD, Inc.. (Hansen, Andrew) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #16 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Christopher Robert Kinkade for Smiths Medical ASD, Inc. Ordered by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 3/23/2020. (NAH) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christopher R. Kinkade. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7580696 filed by Smiths Medical ASD, Inc., Smiths Medical ASD, Inc.. (Geneser, Katherine) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Smiths Group, PLC is a corporate parent of Counter Claimant Smiths Medical ASD, Inc., Defendant Smiths Medical ASD, Inc.. (Toft, Lukas) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Defendant Smiths Medical ASD, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs. filed by Smiths Medical ASD, Inc.. (Toft, Lukas) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ronald M. Daignault. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7533862 filed by BN Intellectual Properties, Inc., BioNebicine Corp.. (Speier, Gary) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Oded Burger. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7533845 filed by BN Intellectual Properties, Inc., BioNebicine Corp.. (Speier, Gary) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael A. Siem. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7533832 filed by BN Intellectual Properties, Inc., BioNebicine Corp.. (Speier, Gary) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Chandran B. Iyer. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7533797 filed by BN Intellectual Properties, Inc., BioNebicine Corp.. (Speier, Gary) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by BioNebicine Corp., BN Intellectual Properties, Inc.. Smiths Medical ASD, Inc. served on 2/27/2020, answer due 3/19/2020. (Speier, Gary) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • Docket(#5) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Ronald M. Daignault, Chandran B. Iyer, Michael A. Siem, Oded Burger, Richard Juang as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (kt) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Smiths Medical ASD, Inc.. (kt) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • Docket(#3) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd/4th Patent list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 20-cv-595 NEB/DTS. (kt) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiffs BN Intellectual Properties, Inc., BioNebicine. (Speier, Gary) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Smiths Medical ASD, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7509291) filed by BioNebicine, BN Intellectual Properties, Inc.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Speier, Gary) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less