This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/23/2019 at 07:45:01 (UTC).

BioClinica Incorporated v. Imaging Endpointes II LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/25/2019 BioClinica Incorporated filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Imaging Endpointes II LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Susan M Brnovich. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-04815

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan M Brnovich

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BioClinica Incorporated

Defendants

Imaging Endpointes II LLC

Ami Marano

Catalina Ocolisan

Imaging Endpoints II LLC

Jenny Treiber

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nicole Maroulakos Goodwin

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP - Phoenix

2375 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 700

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Aaron Thomas Lloyd

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP - Phoenix

2375 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 700

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Justin K Victor

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP - Philadelphia, PA

1717 Arch St., Ste. 400

Philadelphia, PA 19103

James N Boudreau

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP - Philadelphia, PA

2700 Two Commerce Sq., 2001 Market St.

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant Attorneys

Kent S Brockelman

Attorney at Coppersmith Brockelman PLC

2800 N Central Ave., Ste. 1900

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Jill Johnson Chasson

Attorney at Coppersmith Brockelman PLC

2800 N Central Ave., Ste. 1900

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Shelley Tolman

Attorney at Coppersmith Brockelman PLC

2800 N Central Ave., Ste. 1900

Phoenix, AZ 85004

John Neil Stuart

Attorney at Cohen Dowd Quigley PC

2425 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 1100

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Kevin Christopher Moyer

Attorney at Cohen Dowd Quigley PC

2425 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 1100

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Daniel P Quigley

Attorney at Cohen Dowd Quigley PC

2425 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 1100

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Cynthia Christine Albracht-Crogan

Attorney at Cohen Dowd Quigley PC

2425 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 1100

Phoenix, AZ 85016

 

Court Documents

#64

#63

#61

#60

#59

#58

#57

#56

#55

#4

3 #2

Summons

3 #1

Summons

#3

2 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#2

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

77 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#64) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Directing the Clerk of Court to reassign this case back to the Honorable Susan M. Brnovich, United States District Judge. All future pleadings and papers submitted for filing shall bear the following complete case number: CV-19-04815-PHX-SMB. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 9/19/19. (MAP) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#63) NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Imaging Endpoints II LLC, Ami Marano, Catalina Ocolisan, Jenny Treiber. (Quigley, Daniel) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • (#62) MINUTE ORDER: This case is reassigned to Judge Michael T. Liburdi. All future filings shall reflect the following case number: CV 19-4815-PHX-MTL. All pending hearings and/or deadlines are AFFIRMED unless reset by separate order. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAR) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#61) NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Ami Marano, Jenny Treiber. (Chasson, Jill) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#60) NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by BioClinica Incorporated. (Boudreau, James) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#59) NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by BioClinica Incorporated. (Boudreau, James) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#58) NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Imaging Endpoints II LLC, Ami Marano, Catalina Ocolisan, Jenny Treiber. (Quigley, Daniel) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#57) NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by BioClinica Incorporated. (Boudreau, James) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#56) NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Imaging Endpoints II LLC, Ami Marano, Catalina Ocolisan, Jenny Treiber. (Quigley, Daniel) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#55) NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by BioClinica Incorporated. (Boudreau, James) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER: Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on October 23, 2019. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 7/26/2019. (TCA) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Imaging Endpointes II LLC. (MCO) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to BioClinica Incorporated. (MCO) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to Catalina Ocolisan, Imaging Endpointes II LLC, Ami Marano. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Expedite Discovery Re: Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by BioClinica Incorporated. (Lloyd, Aaron) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MCO) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17202445. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-4815-PHX-SMB. (MCO) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Submitted by BioClinica Incorporated. (Lloyd, Aaron) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MCO) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by BioClinica Incorporated. (Lloyd, Aaron) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MCO) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT (TRO Requested). Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17202445 filed by BioClinica Incorporated. (Lloyd, Aaron) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(MCO) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Neil Stuart

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel P Quigley

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin C Mayer

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jill Johnson Chasson