This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/21/2022 at 05:49:16 (UTC).

Biniek v. PA Health Management

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 Biniek filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against PA Health Management. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-00217

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ashley Biniek

Defendant

PA Health Management

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mary Elizabeth LeMieux-Fillery

Attorney at The Law Offices of Eric A. Shore

1500 Jfk Blvdsuite 1240

Philadelphia, PA 19102

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit(s)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

Summons Packet

#3

(#3) ORDER - Pltf to show cause within 10 days of this order being issued as to why the captioned action should not be transferred to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 1/11/22. (ma) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/20/2022.] (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#4

(#4) Letter from Plaintiff's Counsel Re: ECF #3. (LeMieux-Fillery, Mary) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/20/2022.] (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#5

(#5) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to th ED of PA. Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 1/18/22. (ma) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/20/2022.] (Entered: 01/18/2022)

6 #6

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

6 #1

*Restricted*

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Middle; Case Number 1:22-cv-00047. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to th ED of PA. Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 1/18/22. (ma) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/20/2022.] (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Letter from Plaintiff's Counsel Re: ECF #3. (LeMieux-Fillery, Mary) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/20/2022.] (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER - Pltf to show cause within 10 days of this order being issued as to why the captioned action should not be transferred to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 1/11/22. (ma) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/20/2022.] (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to PA Health Management and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ibr) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/20/2022.] (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against PA Health Management ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5809618), filed by Ashley Biniek. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (ibr) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/20/2022.] (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARY E. LEMIEUX-FILLERY