This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/11/2022 at 08:07:32 (UTC).

Biniek v. PA Health Management

Case Summary

On 01/10/2022 Biniek filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against PA Health Management. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sylvia H. Rambo. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00047

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sylvia H. Rambo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ashley Biniek

Defendant

PA Health Management

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mary Elizabeth LeMieux-Fillery

Attorney at The Law Offices of Eric A. Shore

1500 Jfk Blvd, Suite 1240

Philadelphia, PA 19102

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against PA Health Management ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5809618), filed by Ashley Biniek. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (ibr) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit(s)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to PA Health Management and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ibr) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

2 #1

Summons Packet

#3

(#3) ORDER - Pltf to show cause within 10 days of this order being issued as to why the captioned action should not be transferred to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 1/11/22. (ma) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#4

(#4) Letter from Plaintiff's Counsel Re: ECF #3. (LeMieux-Fillery, Mary) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#5

(#5) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to th ED of PA. Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 1/18/22. (ma) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION: Case transferred from Pennsylvania Middle has been opened in Eastern District of Pennsylvania as case 5:22-cv-00217, filed 01/18/2022. (jw) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to th ED of PA. Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 1/18/22. (ma) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Letter from Plaintiff's Counsel Re: ECF #3. (LeMieux-Fillery, Mary) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER - Pltf to show cause within 10 days of this order being issued as to why the captioned action should not be transferred to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 1/11/22. (ma) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to PA Health Management and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ibr) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against PA Health Management ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5809618), filed by Ashley Biniek. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (ibr) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARY E. LEMIEUX-FILLERY