This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/13/2023 at 09:49:12 (UTC).

Binh Thanh Import Export Production & Trade Joint Stock Co. v. Amazon.com Services LLC

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 Binh Thanh Import Export Production Trade Joint Stock Co filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Amazon com Services LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Lorna G. Schofield. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00292

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lorna G. Schofield

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Binh Thanh Import Export Production & Trade Joint Stock Co. doing business as Gilimex

Defendant

Amazon.com Services LLC doing business as Amazon Robotics

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Marc E. Kasowitz

Attorney at Kasowitz, Benson, Torres LLP (NYC)

1633 Broadway

New York, NY 10019

Edward Elliott Filusch

Attorney at Kasowitz, Benson, Torres and Friedman

1633 Broadway

New York, NY 10019

Jonathan Pryor

Attorney at Kasowitz Benson Torres LLP

1633 Broadway

New York, NY 10019

Victor J Brienza

Attorney at Kasowitz, Benson, Torres LLP (NYC)

1633 Broadway

New York, NY 10019

Defendant Attorneys

Adam Ross Mandelsberg

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

1155 Avenue Of The Americas, 22Nd Floor

New York, NY 10036

Evelyn Yue Pang

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

1155 Avenue Of The Americas, 22Nd Floor

New York, NY 10036

Margaret Winterkorn Meyers

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

1155 Avenue Of The Americas, 22Nd Floor

New York, NY 10036

Alan B. Howard

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

1155 Avenue Of The Americas, 22Nd Floor

New York, NY 10036

 

Court Documents

#31

(#31) STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY PROTOCOL: Plaintiff Binh Thanh Import Export Production & Trade Joint Stock Co., d/b/a Gilimex, Inc. ("Gilimex") and defendant Amazon.com Services LLC ("Amazon;" together with Gilimex, the "Parties"), by their respective counsel, hereby agree to this stipulated agreement regarding protocol for electronically stored information and respectfully request that the Court enter an Order approving the same. As further set forth by this Order. As stated in the Order denying a stay of discovery at Dkt. No. 30, the parties shall meet and confer in an effort to agree on a reasonable scope of discovery and to narrow or resolve any disputes before seeking court intervention on individual discovery requests. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/6/2023) (tg) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

#30

(#30) ORDER denying #28 Letter Motion for Conference re: #28 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Alan B. Howard dated March 2, 2023. Defendant's request for a stay of discovery is DENIED. The parties shall meet and confer in an effort to agree on a reasonable scope of discovery and to narrow or resolve any disputes before seeking court intervention on individual discovery requests.. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/3/2023) (ks) (Entered: 03/03/2023)

#29

(#29) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Binh Thanh Import Export Production & Trade Joint Stock Co...(Filusch, Edward) (Entered: 03/03/2023)

#28

(#28) LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Alan B. Howard dated March 2, 2023. Document filed by Amazon.com Services LLC..(Howard, Alan) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

#27

(#27) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #26 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. . Document filed by Amazon.com Services LLC..(Howard, Alan) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

#26

(#26) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Document filed by Amazon.com Services LLC..(Howard, Alan) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

#25

(#25) STIPULATION AND CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/21/2023) (rro) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

#24

(#24) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Binh Thanh Import Export Production & Trade Joint Stock Co...(Filusch, Edward) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

#23

(#23) CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. See 28 U.S.C. 636(c). This case is to be tried to a jury. Amended Pleadings due by 3/31/2023. Joinder of Parties due by 3/31/2023. Deposition due by 9/6/2023. Expert Discovery due by 10/20/2023. Fact Discovery due by 9/6/2023. Telephone Conference set for 11/8/2023 at 04:20 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. The motion will be discussed at the conference. To join the conference, the parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and use Access Code 558-3333. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trialis two weeks. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/3/2023) (ks) Modified on 3/2/2023 (ks). (Entered: 02/03/2023)

#22

No Description Available

#21

No Description Available

20 #1

Exhibit - Proposed Civil Case Management Plan & Scheduling Order

20 #20

Main Document

#19

No Description Available

#18

No Description Available

#17

No Description Available

#16

No Description Available

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY PROTOCOL: Plaintiff Binh Thanh Import Export Production & Trade Joint Stock Co., d/b/a Gilimex, Inc. ("Gilimex") and defendant Amazon.com Services LLC ("Amazon;" together with Gilimex, the "Parties"), by their respective counsel, hereby agree to this stipulated agreement regarding protocol for electronically stored information and respectfully request that the Court enter an Order approving the same. As further set forth by this Order. As stated in the Order denying a stay of discovery at Dkt. No. 30, the parties shall meet and confer in an effort to agree on a reasonable scope of discovery and to narrow or resolve any disputes before seeking court intervention on individual discovery requests. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/6/2023) (tg) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ORDER denying #28 Letter Motion for Conference re: #28 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Alan B. Howard dated March 2, 2023. Defendant's request for a stay of discovery is DENIED. The parties shall meet and confer in an effort to agree on a reasonable scope of discovery and to narrow or resolve any disputes before seeking court intervention on individual discovery requests.. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/3/2023) (ks) (Entered: 03/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Binh Thanh Import Export Production & Trade Joint Stock Co...(Filusch, Edward) (Entered: 03/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Alan B. Howard dated March 2, 2023. Document filed by Amazon.com Services LLC..(Howard, Alan) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #26 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. . Document filed by Amazon.com Services LLC..(Howard, Alan) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Document filed by Amazon.com Services LLC..(Howard, Alan) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) STIPULATION AND CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/21/2023) (rro) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Binh Thanh Import Export Production & Trade Joint Stock Co...(Filusch, Edward) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Expert Discovery due by 10/20/2023. (ks) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. See 28 U.S.C. 636(c). This case is to be tried to a jury. Amended Pleadings due by 3/31/2023. Joinder of Parties due by 3/31/2023. Deposition due by 9/6/2023. Expert Discovery due by 10/20/2023. Fact Discovery due by 9/6/2023. Telephone Conference set for 11/8/2023 at 04:20 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. The motion will be discussed at the conference. To join the conference, the parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and use Access Code 558-3333. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trialis two weeks. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/3/2023) (ks) Modified on 3/2/2023 (ks). (Entered: 02/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Ross Mandelsberg on behalf of Amazon.com Services LLC..(Mandelsberg, Adam) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Judge Analisa Torres is no longer assigned to the case. (vba) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Notice of Removal with Exhibits A and B, Civil Cover Sheet, Individual Practices in Civil Cases of Analisa Torres, United States District Judge and SDNY Electronic Filing Rules served on Plaintiff on January 13, 2023. Service was made by Overnight Mail. Document filed by Amazon.com Services LLC..(Howard, Alan) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Alan B. Howard. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Alan B. Howard. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC, D/B/A AMAZON ROBOTICS, BINH THANH IMPORT EXPORT PRODUCTION & TRADE JOINT STOCK CO., D/B/A GILIMEX, INC.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; alias party name was omitted; DO NOT TYPE ALL PARTY NAMES IN ALL CAPS. (pc) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Howard, Alan) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Case Number: 654794/2022. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27197481).Document filed by AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC, D/B/A AMAZON ROBOTICS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint filed in the New York Supreme Court, New York County, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service of the Summons and Complaint filed in the New York Supreme Court, New York County).(Howard, Alan) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less