This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2020 at 08:03:50 (UTC).

Bingham v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 Bingham filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephanie K. Bowman and Michael R. Barrett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00636

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Stephanie K. Bowman

Presiding Judge

Michael R. Barrett

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Diane S. Bingham

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard F Brian

Attorney at Brian, Zwick, Marchisio & Assoc.

81 Maplecrest Street Sw

Canton, OH 44702

Kiywhanna LaChic Kellup

Attorney at Office of the Regional Chief Counsel

600 West Madison Street, 6Thfloor

Chicago, IL 60661-2474

John J. Stark

Attorney at US Attorney Office

303 Marconi Boulevard, Suite 200

Columbus, OH 43215

 

Court Documents

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTATION ORDER granting #6 Defendant's First Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time Until 12/15/2020 in Which to File the Electronic Certified Administrative Record and Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 10/7/2020. (km) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer New date requested 12/15/2020. by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Kellup, Kiywhanna) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER OF CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge; Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 9/1/20. (ba) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) JOINT CONSENT OF THE PARTIES TO PROCEED BEFORE THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE . (Kellup, Kiywhanna) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Kiywhanna LaChic Kellup for Defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Kellup, Kiywhanna) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketSet Deadlines: Commissioner of Social Security answer due 10/19/2020. (eh) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7611194), filed by Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Brian, Richard) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less