This case was last updated from PACER on 03/18/2019 at 07:57:41 (UTC).

Bille et al v. Coverall North America, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/17/2019 Bille filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Coverall North America, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Janet C. Hall. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00092

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Janet C. Hall

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Quincy Reeves

Caribe Bille

Defendant

Coverall North America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard Eugene Hayber

Attorney at The Hayber Law Firm, LLC

750 Main Street, Suite 904

Hartford, CT 06103

Michael T. Petela, Jr

Attorney at The Hayber Law Firm, LLC

900 Chapel Street, Floor 11

New Haven, CT 06510

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew Iverson

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP

33 Arch Street, 26Th Floor

Boston, MA 02110

James Ross Smart

Attorney at McElroy, Deutsch, Mulvaney & Carpenter, LLP-Southport

30 Jelliff Lane

Southport, CT 06890-1436

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #18 MOTION for Attorney(s) Matthew J. Iverson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5170478) by Coverall North America, Inc.. (Smart, James) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

#20

(#20) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Iverson on behalf of Coverall North America, Inc. (Iverson, Matthew) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

#18

(#18) MOTION for Attorney(s) Matthew J. Iverson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5170478) by Coverall North America, Inc.. (Smart, James) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

#16

(#17) ORDER granting #16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until March 20, 2019 to Respond to #1 Complaint by Coverall North America, Inc. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 2/19/2019. (DeRubeis, B.) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

#15

No Description Available

9 #1

Affidavit

8 #1

Affidavit

#8

(#8) MOTION for Attorney(s) Shannon Liss-Riordan to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5128635) by Caribe Bille, Quincy Reeves. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Hayber, Richard) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

#7

(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Coverall North America, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Richard Eugene Hayber* *The Hayber Law Firm, LLC* *750 Main Street, Suite 904* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Quincy Reeves, Caribe Bille, #5 Order Signed by Clerk on 1/17/2019.(Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

#5

(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Quincy Reeves, Caribe Bille, #5 Order Signed by Clerk on 1/17/2019.(Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

#4

(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Quincy Reeves, Caribe Bille, #5 Order Signed by Clerk on 1/17/2019.(Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

#3

(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Quincy Reeves, Caribe Bille, #5 Order Signed by Clerk on 1/17/2019.(Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

#2

(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Quincy Reeves, Caribe Bille, #5 Order Signed by Clerk on 1/17/2019.(Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#17) ORDER granting #16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until March 20, 2019 to Respond to #1 Complaint by Coverall North America, Inc. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 2/19/2019. (DeRubeis, B.) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #21 MOTION for Attorney(s) Norman Leon to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5177139) by Coverall North America, Inc.. (Smart, James) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #18 MOTION for Attorney(s) Matthew J. Iverson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5170478) by Coverall North America, Inc.. (Smart, James) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ORDER granting #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 5/3/2019. Signed by Clerk on 3/4/2019. (Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) MOTION for Attorney(s) Norman Leon to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5177139) by Coverall North America, Inc.. (Smart, James) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Iverson on behalf of Coverall North America, Inc. (Iverson, Matthew) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER granting #18 Motion to Appear pro hac vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 4/26/2019. Signed by Clerk on 2/25/2019. (Lewis, D) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MOTION for Attorney(s) Matthew J. Iverson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5170478) by Coverall North America, Inc.. (Smart, James) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Answer deadline updated for Coverall North America, Inc. to 3/20/2019. (DeRubeis, B.) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER granting #16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until March 20, 2019 to Respond to #1 Complaint by Coverall North America, Inc. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 2/19/2019. (DeRubeis, B.) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/29/2019 (DeRubeis, B.) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Attorney(s) Shannon Liss-Riordan to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5128635) by Caribe Bille, Quincy Reeves. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Hayber, Richard) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Coverall North America, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Richard Eugene Hayber* *The Hayber Law Firm, LLC* *750 Main Street, Suite 904* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Quincy Reeves, Caribe Bille, #5 Order Signed by Clerk on 1/17/2019.(Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/17/2019.(Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/17/2019.(Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/17/2019.(Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/18/2019 Discovery due by 7/19/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 8/23/2019 Signed by Clerk on 1/17/2019.(Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Hayber, Richard) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Class Action against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5124979.), filed by Caribe Bille, Quincy Reeves. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hayber, Richard) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COVERALL NORTH AMERICA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael T Petela, Jr

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard Eugene Hayber