This case was last updated from PACER on 07/20/2019 at 07:12:58 (UTC).

Bilhimer v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 05/21/2019 Bilhimer filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kenneth G. Gale, Julie A. Robinson and Carlos Murguia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02248

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kansas District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kenneth G. Gale

Presiding Judges

Julie A. Robinson

Carlos Murguia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joe Bilhimer

Defendants

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Solera Holdings, Inc.

Explore Information Services, LLC

Audatex North America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sarah S. Ruane

Attorney at Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP

4740 Grand Avenue, Suite 300

Kansas City, MO 64112

Eric D. Barton

Attorney at Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP

4740 Grand Avenue, Suite 300

Kansas City, MO 64112

Tyler W. Hudson

Attorney at Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP

4740 Grand Avenue, Suite 300

Kansas City, MO 64112

Thomas A. Rottinghaus

Attorney at Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP

4740 Grand Avenue, Suite 300

Kansas City, MO 64112

Defendant Attorneys

Jeremy A. Moseley

Attorney at Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell, LLP - Denver

370 17Th Street, Suite 4500

Denver, CO 80202

Paul T. Fox

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP - Chicago

77 W. Wacker Drive, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60601

Alexandra J. Block

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP - Chicago

77 W. Wacker Drive, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60601

William P. Denning

Attorney at Sanders Warren Russell & Scheer, LLP - OP

9401 Indian Creek Parkway, Suite 1250

Overland Park, KS 66210

 

Court Documents

12 #2

ECF Registration Form Pro Hac Vice E-Filing Registration Form

12 #1

Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice

#12

(#12) MOTION for attorney Alexandra Block to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4842547.) by Defendants Audatex North America, Inc., Explore Information Services, LLC, Solera Holdings, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 ECF Registration Form Pro Hac Vice E-Filing Registration Form)(Denning, William) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

11 #2

ECF Registration Form Pro Hac Vice E-Filing Registration Form

11 #1

Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice

#11

(#11) MOTION for attorney Paul T. Fox to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4842534.) by Defendants Audatex North America, Inc., Explore Information Services, LLC, Solera Holdings, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 ECF Registration Form Pro Hac Vice E-Filing Registration Form)(Denning, William) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#10

(#10) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by William P. Denning on behalf of Audatex North America, Inc., Explore Information Services, LLC, Solera Holdings, Inc. (Denning, William) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#8

(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney) by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Moseley, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Joe Bilhimer upon State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company served on 5/23/2019, answer due 6/13/2019 (Barton, Eric) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#6

(#6) Solera Holdings, Inc. SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Joe Bilhimer upon Solera Holdings, Inc. served on 5/22/2019, answer due 6/12/2019 (Barton, Eric) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#5

(#5) Explore Information Services, LLC SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Joe Bilhimer upon Explore Information Services, LLC served on 5/22/2019, answer due 6/12/2019 (Barton, Eric) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#4

(#4) Audatex North America, Inc. SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Joe Bilhimer upon Audatex North America, Inc. served on 5/22/2019, answer due 6/12/2019 (Barton, Eric) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Joe Bilhimer. (Barton, Eric) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4812077.), filed by Joe Bilhimer.(Barton, Eric) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Paul T. Fox and #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Alexandra J. Block as counsel for Audatex North America, Inc., Explore Information Services, LLC, and Solera Holdings, Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 6/20/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION for attorney Alexandra Block to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4842547.) by Defendants Audatex North America, Inc., Explore Information Services, LLC, Solera Holdings, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 ECF Registration Form Pro Hac Vice E-Filing Registration Form)(Denning, William) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION for attorney Paul T. Fox to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4842534.) by Defendants Audatex North America, Inc., Explore Information Services, LLC, Solera Holdings, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 ECF Registration Form Pro Hac Vice E-Filing Registration Form)(Denning, William) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by William P. Denning on behalf of Audatex North America, Inc., Explore Information Services, LLC, Solera Holdings, Inc. (Denning, William) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company shall answer or otherwise respond on or before 7/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 6/14/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney) by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Moseley, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Joe Bilhimer upon State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company served on 5/23/2019, answer due 6/13/2019 (Barton, Eric) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Solera Holdings, Inc. SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Joe Bilhimer upon Solera Holdings, Inc. served on 5/22/2019, answer due 6/12/2019 (Barton, Eric) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Explore Information Services, LLC SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Joe Bilhimer upon Explore Information Services, LLC served on 5/22/2019, answer due 6/12/2019 (Barton, Eric) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Audatex North America, Inc. SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Joe Bilhimer upon Audatex North America, Inc. served on 5/22/2019, answer due 6/12/2019 (Barton, Eric) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • (#3) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia for all further proceedings. Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson no longer assigned to case Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 6/3/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(bw) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED as to Audatex North America, Inc., Explore Information Services, LLC, Solera Holdings, Inc., State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Joe Bilhimer. (Barton, Eric) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4812077.), filed by Joe Bilhimer.(Barton, Eric) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less