This case was last updated from PACER on 01/17/2020 at 07:24:43 (UTC).

Bilal v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 Bilal filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Life Insurance Company of North America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alfred V. Covello. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01843

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alfred V. Covello

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Murad Bilal

Defendants

Fairfield University Long Term Disability Plan

Life Insurance Company of North America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Skinner Rintoul

Attorney at Zeldes, Needle & Cooper, LLC

1000 Lafayette Boulevard, P.O. Box 1740

Bridgeport, CT 06604

Defendant Attorneys

Gregory J. Bennici

Attorney at Robinson & Cole LLP, Stamford

1055 Washington Boulevard 9Th Floor

Stamford, CT 06901-2249

Patrick Walter Begos

Attorney at Robinson & Cole LLP, Stamford

1055 Washington Boulevard 9Th Floor

Stamford, CT 06901-2249

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until February 17, 2020 to File Rule 26 Report by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Begos, Patrick) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Fairfield University Long Term Disability Plan by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Bennici, Gregory) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Life Insurance Company of North America waiver sent on 12/11/2019, answer due 2/9/2020 filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Bennici, Gregory) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Walter Begos on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America (Begos, Patrick) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory J. Bennici on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America (Bennici, Gregory) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#5

(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Fairfield University Long Term Disability Plan, Life Insurance Company of North America* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *David Skinner Rintoul* *Zeldes, Needle & Cooper, LLC* *1000 Lafayette Boulevard,P.O. Box 1740* *Bridgeport, CT 06604*. (Bozek, M.) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, and #1 Complaint filed by Murad Bilal. Signed by Clerk on 11/19/2019.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

#3

(#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 11/18/2019.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

#2

(#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/17/2020. Discovery due by 5/19/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 6/23/2020. Signed by Clerk on 11/18/2019.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5548815.), filed by Murad Bilal.(Rintoul, David) Modified on 11/18/2019 to correct party (Hushin, Z.). (Entered: 11/18/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until February 17, 2020 to File Rule 26 Report by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Begos, Patrick) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting the voluntary dismissal of defendant, Fairfield University Long Term Disability Plan, in accordance with the #9 stipulation of dismissal. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 12/13/2019. (Sondergeld, C.) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Fairfield University Long Term Disability Plan by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Bennici, Gregory) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Life Insurance Company of North America waiver sent on 12/11/2019, answer due 2/9/2020 filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Bennici, Gregory) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Walter Begos on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America (Begos, Patrick) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory J. Bennici on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America (Bennici, Gregory) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Fairfield University Long Term Disability Plan, Life Insurance Company of North America* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *David Skinner Rintoul* *Zeldes, Needle & Cooper, LLC* *1000 Lafayette Boulevard,P.O. Box 1740* *Bridgeport, CT 06604*. (Bozek, M.) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, and #1 Complaint filed by Murad Bilal. Signed by Clerk on 11/19/2019.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 11/18/2019.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/17/2020. Discovery due by 5/19/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 6/23/2020. Signed by Clerk on 11/18/2019.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • Judge Alfred V. Covello added. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Rintoul, David) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5548815.), filed by Murad Bilal.(Rintoul, David) Modified on 11/18/2019 to correct party (Hushin, Z.). (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.