This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/23/2022 at 06:27:45 (UTC).

BIGSBY v. EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS et al

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 BIGSBY filed an Other lawsuit against EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are ALLEN C WINSOR and MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00035

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ALLEN C WINSOR

Referral Judge

MARTIN A FITZPATRICK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joseph Bigsby

Defendants

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Equifax Information Services, LLC

Trans Union, LLC

Quality Asset Recovery, LLC

EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC

EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC

TRANS UNION LLC

QUALITY ASSET RECOVERY LLC doing business as QUAL AST REC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THOMAS JOHN PATTI, III

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JIBRAEL S HINDI - FORT LAUDERDALE FL

110 Se 6Th Street, Suite 1700

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Defendant Attorneys

GRAZIELLA MICHELLE PASTOR

Attorney at JONES DAY - MIAMI FL

600 Brickell Ave, Suite 3300

Miami, FL 33131

AMANDA ELIZABETH PRESTON

Attorney at SQUIRE PATTON BOGGS (US) LLP - MIAMI FL

200 S Biscayne Blvd

Miami, FL 33131

ALEXANDRIA N EPPS

Attorney at QUILLING SELANDER LOWNDS ETC - PLANO TX

6900 N Dallas Parkway, Suite 800

Plano, TX 75024

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER GRANTING #14 MOTION FOR EXTENSION. (Response/ Answer due by 4/4/2022). Signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 3/22/2022. (kdm) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

14 #1

Text of Proposed Order

14 #14

Main Document

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS JOHN PATTI, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs (PATTI, THOMAS) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

#12

(#12) ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION re: #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 2/17/22. Answer/Response due by 3/21/2022. (bkp) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

#11

(#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by TRANS UNION LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion, Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. for TRANS UNION LLC.. (EPPS, ALEXANDRIA) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

10 #1

Text of Proposed Order

10 #10

Main Document

#9

(#9) ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION #4 , #8 MOTIONS. (Experian's response is extended to 3/28/2022)., Equifax's respond is extended to 4/4/2022). Signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 2/15/2022. (kdm) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

8 #1

Proposed Order

8 #8

Main Document

#4

(#4) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC. (PRESTON, AMANDA) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

1 #5

Supplement

1 #4

Supplement

1 #3

Supplement

1 #2

Supplement

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6638025.), filed by Joseph Bigsby. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement, #4 Supplement, #5 Supplement) (PATTI, THOMAS) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER GRANTING #14 MOTION FOR EXTENSION. (Response/ Answer due by 4/4/2022). Signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 3/22/2022. (kdm) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by TRANS UNION LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (EPPS, ALEXANDRIA) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS JOHN PATTI, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs (PATTI, THOMAS) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION re: #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 2/17/22. Answer/Response due by 3/21/2022. (bkp) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by TRANS UNION LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion, Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. for TRANS UNION LLC.. (EPPS, ALEXANDRIA) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by TRANS UNION LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (EPPS, ALEXANDRIA) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION #4 , #8 MOTIONS. (Experian's response is extended to 3/28/2022)., Equifax's respond is extended to 4/4/2022). Signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 2/15/2022. (kdm) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (PASTOR, GRAZIELLA) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC identifying Corporate Parent EXPERIAN PLC, Other Affiliate CENTRAL SOURCE LLC, Other Affiliate ONLINE DATA EXCHANGE LLC, Other Affiliate NEW MANAGEMENT SERVICES LLC, Other Affiliate VANTAGESCORE SOLUTIONS LLC, Other Affiliate OPT-OUT SERVICES LLC for EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC.. (PASTOR, GRAZIELLA) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by GRAZIELLA MICHELLE PASTOR on behalf of EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC (PASTOR, GRAZIELLA) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC identifying Corporate Parent EQUIFAX INC for EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC.. (PRESTON, AMANDA) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC. (PRESTON, AMANDA) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (kdm) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc, Quality Asset Recovery, LLC, Trans Union, LLC. (kdm) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6638025.), filed by Joseph Bigsby. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement, #4 Supplement, #5 Supplement) (PATTI, THOMAS) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where QUALITY ASSET RECOVERY, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Trans Union Corp is a litigant