This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/25/2023 at 10:56:50 (UTC).

Bigfoot 4x4, Inc. v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto

Case Summary

On 02/24/2023 Bigfoot 4x4, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Edmond E. Chang. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-01136

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edmond E. Chang

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bigfoot 4x4, Inc.

Defendants

The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto

The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Amended Schedule A Hereto

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael A. Hierl

Robert Payton Mcmurray

William Benjamin Kalbac

 

Court Documents

#32

(#32) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: In light of the continued applicability of the circumstances that justified entry of the initial TRO, the Plaintiff's extension motion on the TRO #31 is granted through 05/03/2023. The tracking status hearing of 04/21/2023 is reset to 05/05/2023 at 8:30 a.m., but to track the case only (no appearance is required, the case will not be called). Instead, the Plaintiff shall file a status report and the motion for preliminary injunction (if appropriate) by 04/28/2023. Emailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 04/19/2023)

#31

(#31) MOTION by Plaintiff Bigfoot 4x4, Inc. for extension of time Plaintiff's Ex Parte motion to Extend the Temporary Restraining Order (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

#30

(#30) SURETY BOND in the amount of $ 10,000 posted by Bigfoot 4x4, Inc. (Document not scanned.) (lw, ) (Entered: 04/11/2023)

#29

RESTRICTED

#28

(#28) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: (1.) On review of the memorandum on joinder and the accompanying exhibit, R. 26, 27, although it remains a close question on whether the limits on joinder are satisfied by the Amended Schedule A, it is a sufficiently close question that adversarial presentation would be needed before requiring another narrowing of the Defendants. It is true that the narrower set of Defendants are accused of infringing the same trademark, but of course that alone would be insufficient. The narrowed Defendants do appear to use the same advertising image, and the advertising image apparently is somewhat unique, and some of the words used in the advertising text are unique enough to warrant a further inference of proper joinder. As noted earlier, the question is close enough that adversarial presentation would be needed before requiring further amendment. So joinder is satisfied for purposes of the early stage of the case. (2.) The Plaintiff's motion #10 for temporary restraining order and other relief is granted. An order will be entered under seal separately. Although the Court again expresses its concern about restraining assets before judgment, Grupo Mexicano de Desarrollo v. Alliance Bond Fund, 527 U.S. 308, 331 (1999), the Plaintiff does invoke a statutory remedy, namely, an accounting of profits (that is, disgorgement of profits) under 15 U.S.C. 1117(a), which is not a mere common-law equitable claim and thus could allow for pre-judgment restraint. Indeed, trademark owners need only "prove defendant's sales only; defendant must prove all elements of costs or deduction claimed." 15 U.S.C. 1117(a). To the extent that the restraint might be too broad, the Defendants may appear and file challenges to the scope of the TRO. The balance of factors tips in favor of Plaintiff being able to freeze the assets without advance warning to the Defendants, who likely would seek to transfer the money elsewhere. The Plaintiff's motion #6 for leave to file under seal is granted in light of the asset-restraint goal, and the extra-pages motion #9 is also granted. By 04/12/2023, The Plaintiff shall email a redacted version of the TRO that can be entered publicly (redacting the names of Defendants and omitting Amended Schedule A). To track the case only (no appearance is required, the case will not be called), a status hearing is set for 04/21/2023 at 8:30 a.m. The Plaintiff shall file the TRO extension motion (or a preliminary injunction motion) no later than 04/14/2023. Emailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 04/05/2023)

#27

RESTRICTED

#26

(#26) MEMORANDUM by Bigfoot 4x4, Inc. Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Joinder (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

#10

(#28) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: (1.) On review of the memorandum on joinder and the accompanying exhibit, R. 26, 27, although it remains a close question on whether the limits on joinder are satisfied by the Amended Schedule A, it is a sufficiently close question that adversarial presentation would be needed before requiring another narrowing of the Defendants. It is true that the narrower set of Defendants are accused of infringing the same trademark, but of course that alone would be insufficient. The narrowed Defendants do appear to use the same advertising image, and the advertising image apparently is somewhat unique, and some of the words used in the advertising text are unique enough to warrant a further inference of proper joinder. As noted earlier, the question is close enough that adversarial presentation would be needed before requiring further amendment. So joinder is satisfied for purposes of the early stage of the case. (2.) The Plaintiff's motion #10 for temporary restraining order and other relief is granted. An order will be entered under seal separately. Although the Court again expresses its concern about restraining assets before judgment, Grupo Mexicano de Desarrollo v. Alliance Bond Fund, 527 U.S. 308, 331 (1999), the Plaintiff does invoke a statutory remedy, namely, an accounting of profits (that is, disgorgement of profits) under 15 U.S.C. 1117(a), which is not a mere common-law equitable claim and thus could allow for pre-judgment restraint. Indeed, trademark owners need only "prove defendant's sales only; defendant must prove all elements of costs or deduction claimed." 15 U.S.C. 1117(a). To the extent that the restraint might be too broad, the Defendants may appear and file challenges to the scope of the TRO. The balance of factors tips in favor of Plaintiff being able to freeze the assets without advance warning to the Defendants, who likely would seek to transfer the money elsewhere. The Plaintiff's motion #6 for leave to file under seal is granted in light of the asset-restraint goal, and the extra-pages motion #9 is also granted. By 04/12/2023, The Plaintiff shall email a redacted version of the TRO that can be entered publicly (redacting the names of Defendants and omitting Amended Schedule A). To track the case only (no appearance is required, the case will not be called), a status hearing is set for 04/21/2023 at 8:30 a.m. The Plaintiff shall file the TRO extension motion (or a preliminary injunction motion) no later than 04/14/2023. Emailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 04/05/2023)

#9

(#28) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: (1.) On review of the memorandum on joinder and the accompanying exhibit, R. 26, 27, although it remains a close question on whether the limits on joinder are satisfied by the Amended Schedule A, it is a sufficiently close question that adversarial presentation would be needed before requiring another narrowing of the Defendants. It is true that the narrower set of Defendants are accused of infringing the same trademark, but of course that alone would be insufficient. The narrowed Defendants do appear to use the same advertising image, and the advertising image apparently is somewhat unique, and some of the words used in the advertising text are unique enough to warrant a further inference of proper joinder. As noted earlier, the question is close enough that adversarial presentation would be needed before requiring further amendment. So joinder is satisfied for purposes of the early stage of the case. (2.) The Plaintiff's motion #10 for temporary restraining order and other relief is granted. An order will be entered under seal separately. Although the Court again expresses its concern about restraining assets before judgment, Grupo Mexicano de Desarrollo v. Alliance Bond Fund, 527 U.S. 308, 331 (1999), the Plaintiff does invoke a statutory remedy, namely, an accounting of profits (that is, disgorgement of profits) under 15 U.S.C. 1117(a), which is not a mere common-law equitable claim and thus could allow for pre-judgment restraint. Indeed, trademark owners need only "prove defendant's sales only; defendant must prove all elements of costs or deduction claimed." 15 U.S.C. 1117(a). To the extent that the restraint might be too broad, the Defendants may appear and file challenges to the scope of the TRO. The balance of factors tips in favor of Plaintiff being able to freeze the assets without advance warning to the Defendants, who likely would seek to transfer the money elsewhere. The Plaintiff's motion #6 for leave to file under seal is granted in light of the asset-restraint goal, and the extra-pages motion #9 is also granted. By 04/12/2023, The Plaintiff shall email a redacted version of the TRO that can be entered publicly (redacting the names of Defendants and omitting Amended Schedule A). To track the case only (no appearance is required, the case will not be called), a status hearing is set for 04/21/2023 at 8:30 a.m. The Plaintiff shall file the TRO extension motion (or a preliminary injunction motion) no later than 04/14/2023. Emailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 04/05/2023)

#8

(#8) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Bigfoot 4x4, Inc. (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#28) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: (1.) On review of the memorandum on joinder and the accompanying exhibit, R. 26, 27, although it remains a close question on whether the limits on joinder are satisfied by the Amended Schedule A, it is a sufficiently close question that adversarial presentation would be needed before requiring another narrowing of the Defendants. It is true that the narrower set of Defendants are accused of infringing the same trademark, but of course that alone would be insufficient. The narrowed Defendants do appear to use the same advertising image, and the advertising image apparently is somewhat unique, and some of the words used in the advertising text are unique enough to warrant a further inference of proper joinder. As noted earlier, the question is close enough that adversarial presentation would be needed before requiring further amendment. So joinder is satisfied for purposes of the early stage of the case. (2.) The Plaintiff's motion #10 for temporary restraining order and other relief is granted. An order will be entered under seal separately. Although the Court again expresses its concern about restraining assets before judgment, Grupo Mexicano de Desarrollo v. Alliance Bond Fund, 527 U.S. 308, 331 (1999), the Plaintiff does invoke a statutory remedy, namely, an accounting of profits (that is, disgorgement of profits) under 15 U.S.C. 1117(a), which is not a mere common-law equitable claim and thus could allow for pre-judgment restraint. Indeed, trademark owners need only "prove defendant's sales only; defendant must prove all elements of costs or deduction claimed." 15 U.S.C. 1117(a). To the extent that the restraint might be too broad, the Defendants may appear and file challenges to the scope of the TRO. The balance of factors tips in favor of Plaintiff being able to freeze the assets without advance warning to the Defendants, who likely would seek to transfer the money elsewhere. The Plaintiff's motion #6 for leave to file under seal is granted in light of the asset-restraint goal, and the extra-pages motion #9 is also granted. By 04/12/2023, The Plaintiff shall email a redacted version of the TRO that can be entered publicly (redacting the names of Defendants and omitting Amended Schedule A). To track the case only (no appearance is required, the case will not be called), a status hearing is set for 04/21/2023 at 8:30 a.m. The Plaintiff shall file the TRO extension motion (or a preliminary injunction motion) no later than 04/14/2023. Emailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 04/05/2023)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Bigfoot 4x4, Inc. by Robert Payton Mcmurray (Mcmurray, Robert) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Bigfoot 4x4, Inc. by William Benjamin Kalbac (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Bigfoot 4x4, Inc. by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Main Document

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: In light of the continued applicability of the circumstances that justified entry of the initial TRO, the Plaintiff's extension motion on the TRO #31 is granted through 05/03/2023. The tracking status hearing of 04/21/2023 is reset to 05/05/2023 at 8:30 a.m., but to track the case only (no appearance is required, the case will not be called). Instead, the Plaintiff shall file a status report and the motion for preliminary injunction (if appropriate) by 04/28/2023. Emailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 04/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) MOTION by Plaintiff Bigfoot 4x4, Inc. for extension of time Plaintiff's Ex Parte motion to Extend the Temporary Restraining Order (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) SURETY BOND in the amount of $ 10,000 posted by Bigfoot 4x4, Inc. (Document not scanned.) (lw, ) (Entered: 04/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) SEALED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER Signed by the Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 04/05/2023. Emailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 04/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: (1.) On review of the memorandum on joinder and the accompanying exhibit, R. 26, 27, although it remains a close question on whether the limits on joinder are satisfied by the Amended Schedule A, it is a sufficiently close question that adversarial presentation would be needed before requiring another narrowing of the Defendants. It is true that the narrower set of Defendants are accused of infringing the same trademark, but of course that alone would be insufficient. The narrowed Defendants do appear to use the same advertising image, and the advertising image apparently is somewhat unique, and some of the words used in the advertising text are unique enough to warrant a further inference of proper joinder. As noted earlier, the question is close enough that adversarial presentation would be needed before requiring further amendment. So joinder is satisfied for purposes of the early stage of the case. (2.) The Plaintiff's motion #10 for temporary restraining order and other relief is granted. An order will be entered under seal separately. Although the Court again expresses its concern about restraining assets before judgment, Grupo Mexicano de Desarrollo v. Alliance Bond Fund, 527 U.S. 308, 331 (1999), the Plaintiff does invoke a statutory remedy, namely, an accounting of profits (that is, disgorgement of profits) under 15 U.S.C. 1117(a), which is not a mere common-law equitable claim and thus could allow for pre-judgment restraint. Indeed, trademark owners need only "prove defendant's sales only; defendant must prove all elements of costs or deduction claimed." 15 U.S.C. 1117(a). To the extent that the restraint might be too broad, the Defendants may appear and file challenges to the scope of the TRO. The balance of factors tips in favor of Plaintiff being able to freeze the assets without advance warning to the Defendants, who likely would seek to transfer the money elsewhere. The Plaintiff's motion #6 for leave to file under seal is granted in light of the asset-restraint goal, and the extra-pages motion #9 is also granted. By 04/12/2023, The Plaintiff shall email a redacted version of the TRO that can be entered publicly (redacting the names of Defendants and omitting Amended Schedule A). To track the case only (no appearance is required, the case will not be called), a status hearing is set for 04/21/2023 at 8:30 a.m. The Plaintiff shall file the TRO extension motion (or a preliminary injunction motion) no later than 04/14/2023. Emailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 04/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Bigfoot 4x4, Inc. Exhibit A (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MEMORANDUM by Bigfoot 4x4, Inc. Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Joinder (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Bigfoot 4x4, Inc. Amended Schedule A (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) AMENDED complaint by Bigfoot 4x4, Inc. against The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Amended Schedule A Hereto (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: On review of the complaint, R. 1, and Schedule A, R. 7, the Court raises the propriety of joinder of the 155 Defendants. The Plaintiff shall review the opinion in Estee Lauder Cosmetics Ltd. v. Schedule A, Case No. 19-cv-7878, 2020 WL 433870 (N.D. Ill. Jan. 27, 2020), and file a supplemental memorandum addressing the propriety of joinder by 03/31/2023. In lieu of the supplemental memorandum, by the same deadline, the Plaintiff may file an amended complaint with (a) one defendant or (b) a subset of the defendants along with a memo explaining why joinder of those defendants is proper. To track the case only (no appearance is required, the case will not be called), a tracking status hearing is set for 04/07/2023 at 8:30 a.m., but to track the case only (no appearance is required, the case will not be called). Emailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (ak, ) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ak, ) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Bigfoot 4x4, Inc. (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Bigfoot 4x4, Inc. Sealed Schedule A (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION by Plaintiff Bigfoot 4x4, Inc. to seal document Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Bigfoot 4x4, Inc. by Robert Payton Mcmurray (Mcmurray, Robert) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Bigfoot 4x4, Inc. by William Benjamin Kalbac (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Bigfoot 4x4, Inc. by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Bigfoot 4x4, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20377609. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less