This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 05:08:23 (UTC).

Big IP OPCO et al v. Popular Beauty et al

Case Summary

On 05/12/2020 Big IP OPCO filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Popular Beauty. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Dustin B. Pead. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00309

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dustin B. Pead

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Big IP OPCO

Elixir Cosmetics OPCO

Defendants

Cabaret Hair Salon

Brooke Richards

Popular Beauty

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Monica S. Call

Attorney at STOEL RIVES

201 S Main St Ste 1100

Salt Lake City, UT 84111-4904

Adam C. Sherman

Attorney at VORYS SATER SEYMOUR & PEASE LLC

301 E Fourth St Ste 3500, Great American Tower

Cincinnati, OH 45202

 

Court Documents

#14

#13

#12

#11

RESTRICTED

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#7

#8

6 #2

Exhibit B - Proposed Order

6 #1

Exhibit A - Application

#6

#5

4 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

#3

#2

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Big IP OPCO, Elixir Cosmetics OPCO as to Popular Beauty Waiver sent on 5/28/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. (Call, Monica) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Big IP OPCO, Elixir Cosmetics OPCO as to Cabaret Hair Salon Waiver sent on 5/28/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. (Call, Monica) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Big IP OPCO, Elixir Cosmetics OPCO as to Brooke Richards Waiver sent on 5/28/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. (Call, Monica) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Cabaret Hair Salon. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Popular Beauty. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Brooke Richards. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Adam C. Sherman for Big IP OPCO and Elixir Cosmetics OPCO.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 5/18/20. (alf) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within twenty-one (21) days after any defendant has been served or any defendant has appeared, unless any party is appearing pro se. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 5/17/20. (alf) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Adam C. Sherman , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3576999,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiffs Big IP OPCO, Elixir Cosmetics OPCO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(Call, Monica) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within twenty-one (21) days after any defendant has been served or any defendant has appeared, unless any party is appearing pro se. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 5/13/20. (alf) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3573327) filed by Big IP OPCO, Elixir Cosmetics OPCO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet ) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (Call, Monica) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (kn) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Adam C. Sherman, for Plaintiffs Big IP OPCO, Elixir Cosmetics OPCO (kn) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Plaintiffs Big IP OPCO, Elixir Cosmetics OPCO is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (kn) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adam Corey Sherman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Monica S. Call