This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/21/2022 at 09:01:39 (UTC).

BIG Creekwood Commons, LLC v. Hy-Vee, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/22/2022 BIG Creekwood Commons, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Hy-Vee, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Beth Phillips. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00192

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Beth Phillips

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BIG Creekwood Commons, LLC

Defendants

Hy-Vee, Inc.

Berry's Lock Service, LLC

A+ Communications, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shane C Mecham

Attorney at Levy Craig Law Firm, PC - MainSt

4520 Main Street, Suite 1600

Kansas City, MO 64111

Defendant Attorney

Kevin J. Breer

Attorney at Breer Law Firm LLC

4800 Rainbow Blvd., Suite 200

Westwood, KS 66205

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by BIG Creekwood Commons, LLC. Berry's Lock Service, LLC served on 4/1/2022, answer due 4/22/2022. (Mecham, Shane) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#13

(#13) RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by BIG Creekwood Commons, LLC. A+ Communications, LLC served on 3/30/2022, answer due 4/20/2022. (Mecham, Shane) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#12

(#12) ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION #2 Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction, (Doc. 2), is DENIED. Signed on 5/10/22 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#11

(#11) REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #2 MOTION for preliminary injunction filed by Shane C Mecham on behalf of Plaintiff BIG Creekwood Commons, LLC. (Related document(s) #2 ) (Mecham, Shane) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

#10

(#10) ORDER. RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 6/6/2022. Rule 26 conference due by 5/23/2022. Signed on 4/22/22 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

9 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

9 #9

Main Document

#8

(#8) Defendant's ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint on behalf of Hy-Vee, Inc..(Attorney Kevin J. Breer added to party Hy-Vee, Inc.(pty:dft))(Breer, Kevin) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

#7

(#7) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Shane C Mecham on behalf of Plaintiff BIG Creekwood Commons, LLC.(Mecham, Shane) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re #5 Amended Complaint, #2 MOTION for preliminary injunction , #1 Complaint, filed by Shane C Mecham on behalf of Plaintiff BIG Creekwood Commons, LLC. Related document: #5 Amended Complaint filed by BIG Creekwood Commons, LLC, #2 MOTION for preliminary injunction filed by BIG Creekwood Commons, LLC, #1 Complaint, filed by BIG Creekwood Commons, LLC.(Mecham, Shane) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

5 #3

Exhibit 3

5 #2

Exhibit 2

5 #1

Exhibit 1

5 #5

Main Document

#2

(#2) MOTION for preliminary injunction filed by Shane C Mecham on behalf of BIG Creekwood Commons, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/5/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Mecham, Shane) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Main Document

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by BIG Creekwood Commons, LLC. Berry's Lock Service, LLC served on 4/1/2022, answer due 4/22/2022. (Mecham, Shane) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by BIG Creekwood Commons, LLC. A+ Communications, LLC served on 3/30/2022, answer due 4/20/2022. (Mecham, Shane) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION #2 Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction, (Doc. 2), is DENIED. Signed on 5/10/22 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketNOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #2 MOTION for preliminary injunction filed by Shane C Mecham on behalf of Plaintiff BIG Creekwood Commons, LLC. (Related document(s) #2 ) (Mecham, Shane) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER. RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 6/6/2022. Rule 26 conference due by 5/23/2022. Signed on 4/22/22 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #2 MOTION for preliminary injunction filed by Kevin J. Breer on behalf of Defendant Hy-Vee, Inc.. Reply suggestions due by 5/4/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #2 ) (Breer, Kevin) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Defendant's ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint on behalf of Hy-Vee, Inc..(Attorney Kevin J. Breer added to party Hy-Vee, Inc.(pty:dft))(Breer, Kevin) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to A+ Communications, LLC, Berry's Lock Service, LLC, Hy-Vee, Inc.. (Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Shane C Mecham on behalf of Plaintiff BIG Creekwood Commons, LLC.(Mecham, Shane) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re #5 Amended Complaint, #2 MOTION for preliminary injunction , #1 Complaint, filed by Shane C Mecham on behalf of Plaintiff BIG Creekwood Commons, LLC. Related document: #5 Amended Complaint filed by BIG Creekwood Commons, LLC, #2 MOTION for preliminary injunction filed by BIG Creekwood Commons, LLC, #1 Complaint, filed by BIG Creekwood Commons, LLC.(Mecham, Shane) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Shane C Mecham on behalf of BIG Creekwood Commons, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Mecham, Shane) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT or otherwise show cause why this case should not be dismissed without prejudice for lack of jurisdiction. See Order for further information. Signed on 3/23/22 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for preliminary injunction filed by Shane C Mecham on behalf of BIG Creekwood Commons, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/5/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Mecham, Shane) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against BIG Creekwood Commons, LLC All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7856450. Service due by 6/21/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Mecham, Shane) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/24/2022: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Woods, Gloria). (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hy-Vee, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin J. Breen