This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/22/2022 at 07:42:23 (UTC).

BIESKI v. COMCAST CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 06/23/2022 BIESKI filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against COMCAST CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is GENE E.K. PRATTER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02467

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GENE E.K. PRATTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARK BIESKI

Defendant

COMCAST CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVID M. KOLLER

Attorney at KOLLER LAW PC

2043 Locust St Ste 1B

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to COMCAST CORPORATION. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 6/24/22 (JL) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MARK BIESKI. COMCAST CORPORATION waiver sent on 7/25/2022, answer due 9/23/2022. (KOLLER, DAVID) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MARK BIESKI. COMCAST CORPORATION waiver sent on 7/25/2022, answer due 9/23/2022. (KOLLER, DAVID) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to COMCAST CORPORATION. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 6/24/22 (JL) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against COMCAST CORPORATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16002283.), filed by MARK BIESKI. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KOLLER, DAVID) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMCAST CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVID M. KOLLER