This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/21/2019 at 07:20:17 (UTC).

Mackensie Biddle v. C and J Clark Retail Inc et al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 Mackensie Biddle filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against C and J Clark Retail Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are James V. Selna and Autumn D. Spaeth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-01624

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James V. Selna

Referral Judge

Autumn D. Spaeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mackensie Biddle

Defendants

DOES 1 through 100, inclusive

C & J Clark Retail Inc

C and J Clark Retail, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Edwin Aiwazian

Attorney at Lawyers for Justice PC

410 West Arden Avenue Suite 203

Glendale, CA 91203

Defendant Attorneys

Donald P Sullivan

Attorney at Jackson Lewis PC

50 California Street 9Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-4615

Mariko Mae Ashley

Attorney at Jackson Lewis PC

50 California Street 9Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-4615

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 11/18/2019 at 10:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 11/11/2019. (lb) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant C and J Clark Retail, Inc., re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #5 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #6 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 served on 08/27/2019. (Sullivan, Donald) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

#6

(#6) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (ghap) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant C & J Clark Retail Inc, identifying C & J Clark International, Ltd.. (Sullivan, Donald) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant C & J Clark Retail Inc. (Sullivan, Donald) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit A (Summons and Complaint)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Orange, case number 30-2019-01083460-CU-OE-CXC Receipt No: 0973-24312719 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant C & J Clark Retail Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Summons and Complaint)) (Attorney Donald P Sullivan added to party C & J Clark Retail Inc(pty:dft))(Sullivan, Donald) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 11/18/2019 at 10:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 11/11/2019. (lb) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant C and J Clark Retail, Inc., re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #5 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #6 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 served on 08/27/2019. (Sullivan, Donald) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (ghap) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants C and J Clark Retail, Inc., Does 1 through 100, inclusive. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Mackensie Biddle. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 7/16/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant C & J Clark Retail Inc, identifying C & J Clark International, Ltd.. (Sullivan, Donald) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant C & J Clark Retail Inc. (Sullivan, Donald) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Orange, case number 30-2019-01083460-CU-OE-CXC Receipt No: 0973-24312719 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant C & J Clark Retail Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Summons and Complaint)) (Attorney Donald P Sullivan added to party C & J Clark Retail Inc(pty:dft))(Sullivan, Donald) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where C & J Clark Retail, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edwin Aiwazian