This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/16/2022 at 07:59:23 (UTC).

Bianco v. Rubio et al

Case Summary

On 02/15/2022 Bianco filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Rubio. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert W. Gettleman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00839

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert W. Gettleman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brian Bianco

Defendants

Town of Cicero

P.O. Rueda

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gianna Gizzi

Attorney at Gregory E. Kulis & Associates Ltd

30 N. Lasalle Street, Suite 2140

Chicago, IL 60602

Vincenzo Bruno Caporale

Attorney at Gregory E. Kulis & Associates, Ltd.

30 North Lasalle Street, Suite 2140

Chicago, IL 60602

Gregory E. Kulis

Attorney at Gregory E. Kulis and Associates, Ltd.

30 North Lasalle Street, Suite 2140

Chicago, IL 60602

Defendant Attorneys

K. Austin Zimmer

Attorney at Del Galdo Law Group, LLC

1441 South Harlem Avenue

Berwyn, IL 60402

Sean Michael Sullivan

Attorney at Del Galdo Law Group, LLC

1441 S. Harlem Ave.

Berwyn, IL 60402

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Brian Bianco; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19175853.(Kulis, Gregory) (Entered: 02/21/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kulis, Gregory) (Entered: 02/21/2022)

#3

(#3) Attorney's Lien by Brian Bianco (Kulis, Gregory) (Entered: 02/21/2022)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Brian Bianco by Gregory E. Kulis (Kulis, Gregory) (Entered: 02/21/2022)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Brian Bianco by Gianna Gizzi (Gizzi, Gianna) (Entered: 02/21/2022)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Brian Bianco by Vincenzo Bruno Caporale (Caporale, Vincenzo) (Entered: 02/21/2022)

#7

(#7) FIRST AMENDED complaint by Brian Bianco against Town of Cicero, P.O. Rueda and terminating P.O. Rubio (Kulis, Gregory) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#8

(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants P.O. Rueda, Town of Cicero by K. Austin Zimmer (Zimmer, K.) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#9

(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants P.O. Rueda, Town of Cicero by Sean Michael Sullivan (Sullivan, Sean) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#10

(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Town of Cicero. Town of Cicero waiver sent on 2/21/2022, answer due 4/22/2022. (Sullivan, Sean) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#11

(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by P.O. Rubio. P.O. Rubio waiver sent on 2/21/2022, answer due 4/22/2022. (Sullivan, Sean) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 3/22/2022) (jg, ). (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#12

(#12) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Telephonic status hearing set for 5/4/22 at 9:30 a.m. Joint status report shall be filed by 4/28/22. To join the conference parties shall dial: 888-684-8852 or 215-446-0155, access code: 9582710#. Mailed notice(maf) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#13

(#13) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Docket entry #12 is vacated as entered in error. Mailed notice(maf) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Docket entry #12 is vacated as entered in error. Mailed notice(maf) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Telephonic status hearing set for 5/4/22 at 9:30 a.m. Joint status report shall be filed by 4/28/22. To join the conference parties shall dial: 888-684-8852 or 215-446-0155, access code: 9582710#. Mailed notice(maf) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by P.O. Rubio. P.O. Rubio waiver sent on 2/21/2022, answer due 4/22/2022. (Sullivan, Sean) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 3/22/2022) (jg, ). (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Town of Cicero. Town of Cicero waiver sent on 2/21/2022, answer due 4/22/2022. (Sullivan, Sean) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants P.O. Rueda, Town of Cicero by Sean Michael Sullivan (Sullivan, Sean) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants P.O. Rueda, Town of Cicero by K. Austin Zimmer (Zimmer, K.) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) FIRST AMENDED complaint by Brian Bianco against Town of Cicero, P.O. Rueda and terminating P.O. Rubio (Kulis, Gregory) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (ey, ) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ey, ) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Brian Bianco by Vincenzo Bruno Caporale (Caporale, Vincenzo) (Entered: 02/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Brian Bianco by Gianna Gizzi (Gizzi, Gianna) (Entered: 02/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Brian Bianco by Gregory E. Kulis (Kulis, Gregory) (Entered: 02/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Attorney's Lien by Brian Bianco (Kulis, Gregory) (Entered: 02/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kulis, Gregory) (Entered: 02/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Brian Bianco; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19175853.(Kulis, Gregory) (Entered: 02/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Town of Cicero is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sean Michael Sullivan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer K. Austin Zimmer