This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 11:15:26 (UTC).

Biagetti v. Johnson & Johnson et al

Case Summary

On 04/18/2019 Biagetti filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Johnson Johnson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lincoln D. Almond and William E. Smith. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00194

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rhode Island District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lincoln D. Almond

Presiding Judge

William E. Smith

 

Party Details

Defendants

Honeywell International Inc.

Columbia Boiler Company

Imerys Talc America, Inc.

Carlile Companies, Inc.

Ingersoll-Rand Company

Pfizer, Inc.

Crane Co.

Sear, Roebuck and Co.

Fisher Scientific Company, LLC

AJAX Corporation

Trane US Inc.

International Harvester

Komatsu America Corp.

The Dow Chemical

Warren Pumps Inc

Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.

Celanese Corpation

Carrier Corporation

Riley Power Inc.

Cummins, Inc.

82 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Craig R. Waksler

Attorney at Eckert Seamans Cherin and Mellott, LLC

2 International Place, 16Th Floor

Boston, MA 02110

Richard Lumley

Attorney at Burns and Levinson

1 Citizens Plaza, Suite 1100

Providence, RI 02903

Stephanie M. Batchelder

Attorney at Manning Gross + Nassenburg LLP

One Citizens Plaza, Suite 620

Providence, RI 02903

Margreta Vellucci

Attorney at Pond North LLP

99 Derby Street, Suite 100

Hingham, MA 02043

Wayne E. George

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

One Federal Street

Boston, MA 02110

James P. Ruggeri

Attorney at Shipman & Goodwin LLP

1133 Connecticut Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Lawrence G. Cetrulo

Attorney at Cetrulo, LLP

The Heritage Building, 321 South Main Street, 5Th Floor

Providence, RI 02903

Other Attorneys

Matthew C. Oleyer

Attorney at Cetrulo LLP

2 Seaport Lane, 10Th Floor

Boston, MA 02110

Tierney M. Chadwick

Attorney at Sloane and Walsh LLP

3 Center Plaza, Suite 800

Boston, MA 02108

Stephen P. Cooney

Attorney at Higgins, Cavanagh & Cooney, LLP

The Hay Building, 10 Dorrance Street, Suite 400

Providence, RI 02903

Thomas W. Lyons, III

Attorney at Strauss, Factor, Laing & Lyons

One Davol Square, Suite 305, 456-0700, Fax: 421-4730

Providence, RI 02903

Paul E. Dwyer

Attorney at McElroy, Deutsch, Mulvaney & Carpenter, LLP

Suite 1004, 117 Metro Center Boulevard

Warwick, RI 02886

Brian D. Gross

Attorney at Manning Gross Nassenburg LLP

One Citizens Plaza, Suite 620

Providence, RI 02903

Stephen J. MacGillivray

Attorney at Pierce Atwood, LLP

One Financial Plaza, 26Th Floor

Providence, RI 02903

Mark T. Nugent

Attorney at Morrison Mahoney LLP

10 Weybosset Street, Suite 900, 331-4660, Fax: 351-4420

Providence, RI 02903-7141

Kevin C. McCaffrey

Attorney at Cullen & Dykman, LLP

44 Wall Street

New York, NY 10005

R. Scott Oswald

Attorney at The Employment Law Group, P.C.

888 17Th Street Nw, Suite 900

Washington, DC 20006

Mark O. Denehy

Attorney at Adler Pollock & Sheehan P.C.

One Citizens Plaza, 8Th Floor

Providence, RI 02903

Anthony J. Sbarra, Jr.

Attorney at Hermes, Netburn, O'Connor & Spearing, P.C.

265 Franklin Street, 7Th Floor

Boston, MA 02110-3113

Rochelle Gumapac

15 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) ORDER granting #16 Motion to Remand to State Court; Certified copy of order sent to the Clerk of Court for the state court in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) (via automatic email). So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 7/15/2019. (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

23 #7

Exhibit G

23 #6

Exhibit F

23 #5

Exhibit E

23 #1

Exhibit A

#23

(#23) RESPONSE In Opposition to #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Johnson & Johnson. Replies due by 6/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Oswald, James) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

16 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A

16 #1

Supporting Memorandum Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand

#16

(#23) RESPONSE In Opposition to #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Johnson & Johnson. Replies due by 6/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Oswald, James) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

1 #9

Exhibit C - Part 7

1 #7

Exhibit C - Part 5

1 #6

Exhibit C - Part 4

1 #5

Exhibit C - Part 3

1 #4

Exhibit C - Part 2

1 #3

Exhibit C - Part 1

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

*Restricted*

#1

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet filed by Johnson & Johnson. Regarding New Case: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, . (Oswald, James) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER granting #16 Motion to Remand to State Court; Certified copy of order sent to the Clerk of Court for the state court in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) (via automatic email). So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 7/15/2019. (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) RESPONSE In Opposition to #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Johnson & Johnson. Replies due by 6/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Oswald, James) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) RESPONSE In Opposition to #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Johnson & Johnson. Replies due by 6/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Oswald, James) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • TEXT ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule: In CA19-194WES, CA19-195WES, and CA19-197WES, the Court hereby passes as moot the Motions to Remand filed by Plaintiffs on 4/24/19 (ECF Nos. 6, 4, and 6, respectively). The Court extends the deadline for the filing of a new supplemental Response in Opposition by Defendant Johnson & Johnson to each of the new Motions to Remand (filed on 5/10/19; ECF Nos. 16, 11, and 14, respectively) up to and including 5/31/19; Plaintiffs' Reply will then be due on or before 6/7/19; and finally, Defendant Johnson & Johnson's Sur-reply will be due on or before 6/12/19. In CA19-196WES, Defendant Johnson & Johnson may file a Sur-reply to Plaintiff's Reply brief five days following that filing. In CA19-198WES, the Court hereby GRANTS Plaintiff's Assented-to Motion to Extend Time to File Reply (ECF No. 14 in CA19-198WES) up to and including 5/22/19, and Defendant Johnson & Johnson may file a Sur-reply to that Reply within five days of that filing. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 5/23/2019. (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • TEXT ORDER: The Notice of Removal filed in this Court only relates to claims brought by the plaintiffs against defendants Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. The claims made by the plaintiffs against any other defendants named in the Rhode Island Superior Court action have not been removed to this Court, and remain with the Rhode Island Superior Court. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 5/23/2019. (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William E. Smith: In Chambers Conference held on 5/22/2019; counsel present: J. Deaton (via teleconference); V. Green; A. Hornstein; J. Oswald; D. Dupus; S. Gazda; M. Edwards; Orders to follow. (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • (#22) NOTICE of Hearing: In Chambers Conference scheduled for Wednesday 5/22/2019 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before Chief Judge William E. Smith; PLEASE NOTE: Only counsel for the Plaintiffs and Defendant Johnson & Johnson are required to attend this conference. (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • (#22) NOTICE of Hearing: In Chambers Conference scheduled for Wednesday 5/22/2019 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before Chief Judge William E. Smith; PLEASE NOTE: Only counsel for the Plaintiffs and Defendant Johnson & Johnson are required to attend this conference. (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole M. Matteo on behalf of Ply Gem Industries, Inc., Ply Gem (Matteo, Nicole) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole M. Matteo on behalf of American Optical Corporation (Matteo, Nicole) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Johnson & Johnson. (Oswald, James) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey M. Thomen on behalf of Piaggio Group Americas, Inc. (Thomen, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey M. Thomen on behalf of Fisher Scientific Company, LLC (Thomen, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 5/8/2019. (Deaton, John) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan R. Myhre on behalf of Packing & Insulations Corporation (Myhre, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan R. Myhre on behalf of P.I.C. Contractors, Inc. (Myhre, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Civil Cover Sheet filed by Johnson & Johnson. Regarding New Case: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, . (Oswald, James) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC2017-2761. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1350327, filed by Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C - Part 1, #4 Exhibit C - Part 2, #5 Exhibit C - Part 3, #6 Exhibit C - Part 4, #7 Exhibit C - Part 5, #8 Exhibit C - Part 6, #9 Exhibit C - Part 7, #10 Exhibit C - Part 8, #11 Exhibit C - Part 9, #12 Exhibit D)(Oswald, James) CLERKS NOTE: Remote electronic access to the document has been restricted by the Clerks Office as it contains one or more personal identifiers. Filer is directed to submit a redacted version. (Simoncelli, Michael). (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.